USA v. Lukov
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-00850-RJS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Brian New +1 212 637 1049 +1 212 637 2527 jonathan.new@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Alex Lukov, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hochheiser & Hochheiser, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Hochheiser +1 212 689 4343 +1 212 481 3424 lh@hochheiser.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 9/10/2007
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
107-mj-01089-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION OR MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-9999.F
Offense Level 4
FEDERAL STATUTES, OTHER - (Title 18 USC Section 1349 Conspiracy to commit mail & wire fraud.)
Count 2s-3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4s-5s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
Count 6s-7s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 8s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flags ECF, PRIOR
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Alex Lukov.... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-named defendant appear with counsel for sentence on Monday, 10/6/08, at 4:45pm in the U.S.D.C. for the S.D.N.Y., Courtroom 21 C for sentence. The Defendant's Pre sentence submissions shall be filed not later than 9/25/08. Government submissions shall be filed not later than 10/1/08. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/7/08)(bw)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Note to Attorney Regarding the Filing of Letters -
    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [15] as to Defendant(s) Alex Lukov: HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Lawrence Hochheiser : Other than letters filed under a cover marked Sentencing Memorandum, THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (KA)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion to Continue
      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - CONSENT MOTION to Continue sentencing(LETTER). Document filed by Alex Lukov. (Hochheiser, Lawrence) Modified on 8/1/2008 (KA).
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Alex Lukov held on 3-24-08 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (sjo)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER as to Alex Lukov addressed to Judge Sullivan from Attorney Lawrence Hochheiser dated 3/25/08 re: submitted to request an extension of Mr. Alex Lukov's bail limits to include the state of Florida, allowing him to travel to and from Florida without seeking prior permission, provided that he notifies AUSA Jonathan New and his Pre-trial Services officer in advance of each New York-Florida round trip of his departure date, intended location in Florida, and expected return date. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/26/08)(bw)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Oral Order
            ORAL ORDER as to Alex Lukov, Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Alex Lukov, As to Alex Lukov( Sentencing set for 8/18/2008 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.). (By Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/24/08)(pr)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Plea Entered
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Plea entered by Alex Lukov (1) Guilty as to Count 1s. (pr)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Change of Not Guilty Plea
                Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Alex Lukov (1) Count 1s. (pr)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Change of Plea Hearing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Change of Plea Hearing as to Alex Lukov held on 3/24/2008. Dest pres w/atty Lawrence Hochheiser; AUSA Jonathan New pres. Deft advises that he wishes to withdraw previously entered plea of not guilty. Deft sworn and advised of rights and waives rights. Deft pleads GUILTY to count #1 of the superseding indt. The court finds a factual basis for the plea and accepts the plea of GUILTY. Probation notified. Sentence set for 8/18/08 @ 4:30pm. Deft remains on bail pending sentence. (Court Reporter Alana Lynch) (pr)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Status Conference
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Alex Lukov held on 3/3/2008, as to Alex Lukov( Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) Deft Alex Lukov present with atty Lawrence Hochheiser. AUSA Jonathan New & Kathleen Goldstein present. Court reporter Martha Drevis present. Case Manager Eileen Levine present. Counsel for all sides present. Deft's motion to adjourn the trial is argued and granted. Jury selection and trial set for April 7. Exhibit list and witness list and requests to charge to be submitted by March 27. 404(b) in limine motions to be filed by March 31. Final pretrial conference set for April 3 at 11am. Speedy trial order excluding the time from 3/3/08 to 4/7/08. Entered on the record. (jw)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Supervised Release Jurisdiction Transferred Out to the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida as to Alex Lukov. (jw) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Alex Lukov addressed to Judge Sullivan from Attorney Lawrence Hochheiser dated 2/19/08 re: submitted to request for (approximately) a 30-day adjournment of the trial (and scheduled pretrial matters) in this case, currently set for 3/18/08. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. The parties are to appear for a conference on March 3, 2008 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/20/08)(bw)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          PROBATION FORM 51800 PETITION as to Alex Lukov. The Court Orders: Transfer of Jurisdiction Approved (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/26/11)(jw) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Alex Lukov: Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2008 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.(bw)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Alex Lukov held on 11/06/08 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ama) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER as to Alex Lukov., as to Alex Lukov( Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2008 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Jury Trial set for 3/18/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.)Jury selection and trial shall commence on March 18, 2008 at 9:30am. The parties shall submit joint proposed voir dire questions and a joint proposed jury charge to the Court not later than March 6, 2008. The Government shall submit to the defendant and to the Court its exhibit list and any 404(b) evidence not later than March 6, 2008. Motions in limine shall be filed no later than March 10, 2008. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/14/08)(jw)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  AMENDED JUDGMENT: As to Alex Lukov (1), Original judgment filed 11/20/2008. The Court recommended the defendant be designated to a facility in the Northeast region, specifically Otisville. The court now makes the following recommendation to the Bureau of Prisons: The court notes the defendant's request to be designated to a facility close to Florida, specifically Pensacola, due to family circumstances. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/17/2008)(D'Avanzo, Daniel) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Status Conference
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Alex Lukov held on 1/14/2008, as to Alex Lukov( Status Conference set for 3/13/2008 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan., Jury Trial set for 3/18/2008 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (jw)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Amend/Correct. Judgment(LETTER). Document filed by Alex Lukov. (Hochheiser, Lawrence) Modified on 12/5/2008 (KA). (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Plea Entered
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Plea entered by Alex Lukov (1) Count 1s,2s-3s,4s-5s,6s-7s,8s Not Guilty. (jw)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          FILED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Alex Lukov (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 8s, 2s-3s, 4s-5s, 6s-7s, are dismissed on the motion of the U.S. The defendant Alex Lukov pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1s, Imprisonment: 20 months. The Court recommends to the Bureau of Prisons that the defendant's request to be designated to a facility in the Northeast region, specifically Otisville, due to family circumstances. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2 p.m. on 1/5/09, as notified by the U.S. Marshal. Supervised Release: 5 years. SA: $100.00. Restitution: $118,921.23. The determination of restitution for BNC Bank is deferred until 12/5/08. An Amended Judgment in a Criminal Case (AO245C) will be after such determination. The defendant must pay interest on restitution and a fine of more than $2,500, unless the restitution or fine is paid in full before the fifteenth day after the date of the judgment, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3612(f). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/18/08)(ja) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Arraignment
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Arraignment as to Alex Lukov (1) Count 1s,2s-3s,4s-5s,6s-7s,8s held on 1/14/2008. Deft present with atty Lawrence Hochheiser. AUSA Jonathan New present. Court reporter Joe Quinones present. Case Manager Eileen Levine present. Case called. Deft arraigned on superseding indictment and pleads not guilty at this time. Status conference held. Motions in limine and joint proposed voir dire, exhibit list and witness list and requests to charge to be submitted by March 6. 404(b) in limine motions to be filed by March 10. Further status at March 13 at 2:30pm. Jury selection and trial set for March 18. Speedy trial order excluding the time from 1/14/08 to 3/18/08. Entered on the record. (jw)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: As to Alex Lukov. Before the Court is Defendants' letter, dated October 23, 2008, requesting a thirty-day adjournment of Defendant's sentencing date, which is currently scheduled for November 6, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. The letter indicates that the Government has not consented to this request for adjournment. The Court has granted two previous requests by Defendant to adjourn the sentencing date. By Order dated August 7, 2008, the Court adjourned Defendant's sentencing date, from August 18, 2008, to October 6, 2008. By Order dated September 24, 2008, the Court again adjourned Defendant's sentencing date, from October 6, 2008, to November 6, 2008. Given that two previous extensions have been granted, the Court sees no reason to reconsider its endorsement on the September 24, 2008 Order that "no further extensions will be granted." It is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's request to adjourn the sentencing date for a third time is DENIED. Sentencing will proceed as scheduled on November 6, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. inCourtroom 21 C, United States District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/ 28/ 2008)(D'Avanzo, Daniel) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Indictment
                                                (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Alex Lukov (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s-5s, 6s-7s, 8s. (bw)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: As to Alex Lukov. The Court is in receipt of defendant Alex Lukov's letter dated September 22, 2008, requesting a 45-day adjournment of his sentencing date, currently scheduled for October 6, 2008.The letter indicates that the Government consents to a 30-day extension. Defendant's request is granted to the extent that the Court will adjourn the sentencing for 30 days. Defendant's sentencing is hereby adjourned to November 6, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 21C United States District Court, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. No further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. As to Alex Lukov( Sentencing set for 11/6/2008 at 4:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/24/2008)(D'Avanzo, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Status Conference
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Alex Lukov held on 11/14/2007. Dft Alex Lukov present w/atty Lawrence Hochheiser, AUSA Jonathan New present, Crt rptr present. Motions if any are due by 12/17/2007; Govt's Response due by 1/7/2008; further Status Conference set for 1/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) Speedy trial order excluding the time from 11/13/08 to 1/14/08. Bail cont'd under the same terms and conditions. (Court Reporter Linda Fisher) (ja)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Continue sentencing(LETTER). Document filed by Alex Lukov. (Hochheiser, Lawrence) Modified on 9/24/2008 (KA). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Alex Lukov, addressed to Judge Sullivan, from Lawrence Hochheiser, Atty for dft, dated 11/5/07, re: confirming that the status conference has been changed from Tuesday, November 13, 2007 at 4:30 p.m. to Wednesday, November 14, 2007 at 4 p.m. AUSA Jonathan B. New consents. -- Judge endorsed: Time excluded pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(8)(A) to 11/14. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 11/14/2007 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/6/07)(ja)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Status Conference
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan :Status Conference as to Alex Lukov held on 9/26/2007. Dft Alex Lukov present w/atty Lawrence Hochheiser. AUSA Katherine Goldstein present. Discovery due by 10/12/2007. Further Status Conference set for 11/13/2007 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. T/E from 9/26/07 to 11/13/07. (ja)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Oral Order
                                                            ORAL ORDER as to Alex Lukov Time excluded from 9/26/2007 until 11/13/2007, Status Conference set for 11/13/2007 at 04:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/26/2007)(jar)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Status Conference
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan :Status Conference as to Alex Lukov held on 9/26/2007. Dft present with atty Lawrence Hochheiser, AUSA Katherine Goldstein, Court Reporter Kristin Sellin. Discovery to be turned over by 10/12/2007. Further status conference set for 11/13/2007 at 4:30 p.m. Speedy trial order excluding the time from 9/26/2007 to 11/13/2007. (jar)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank Maas : as to Alex Lukov; Status Conference set for 9/26/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (jw)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Plea Entered
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank Maas : Plea entered by Alex Lukov (1) Count 1,2 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Arraignment
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank Maas :Arraignment on Disposition Sheet as to Alex Lukov (1) Count 1,2 held on 9/17/2007. Deft present with atty Larry Hochheiser. AUSA Jonathan New present. Deft counsel to notify sureties in writing by 9/20/07 of charges in bail conditions. Time excluded through 9/26/07. Bail limits extended to include DNJ. Deft to may travel to Ma with prior approval of PTS & USAO. Conference set for 9/26/07 at 10am. (jw)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Indictment
                                                                      INDICTMENT FILED as to Alex Lukov (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                        Case Designated ECF as to Alex Lukov. (jm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Alex Lukov. Time excluded from 8/9/07 until 9/10/07. (Signed by Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 8/9/07)(vb)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                            ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Alex Lukov. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Bond
                                                                              PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Alex Lukov in amount of $1,000,000. 5 FRP'S. Secured BY $750,000 cash/property. Travel restricted to to SDNY, EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Regular pretrial supervision. Deft to be released upon following conditions: 2 co-signers: wife and brother-in-law. Three additional FRP's and remaining conditions to be met by: 7/20/07. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lawrence Hochheiser appearing for Alex Lukov. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/10/2007 as to Alex Lukov. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Initial Appearance
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz :Initial Appearance as to Alex Lukov held on 7/10/2007. Deft appears with atty Lawrence Hochheiser. AUSA Jonathan New present for the gov't. $1 Million PRB. 5 FRP. $750,000 cash/property. Travel restricted to SDNY, EDNY. Surrender travel documents (& no new applications). Regular pretrial supervision. Deft to be released upon following conditions: 2 co-signers: wife & brother-in-law. 3 additional FRP's and remaining conditions to be met by 7/20/2007. Preliminary Examination set for 8/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Arrest
                                                                                      Arrest of Alex Lukov. (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Alex Lukov (1) in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1349.. (Signed by Judge Frank Maas ) (gq)[1:07-mj-01089-UA]
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 530 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?