District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Kenyon Norbert, et al v. City & County of San Francisco, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 20-15449

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 16, 2021 at 10:18 PM DT (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Armando Carlos, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Jose Poot, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Kenyon Norbert, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Marshall Harris, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Michael Brown, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Montrail Brackens, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo Troy Mcallister, On Behalf Of Themselves Individually And Others Similarly Situated, As A Class And Subclass, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yolanda Huang +1 510 329 2140 +1 510 580 9410 yhuang.law@gmail.com
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina M. Berdux +1 415 554 3929
Space Dennis J. Herrera +1 415 554 4748 +1 415 554 3837 cityattorney@sfcityatty.org
Space Kaitlyn Mara Murphy +1 415 554 3800
No Logo Jason Jackson, Defendant,
No Logo Mcconnell, Defendant,
No Logo Paul Miyamoto, San Francisco Chief Deputy Sheriff, Defendant,
No Logo San Francisco Sheriff's Department, Defendant,
No Logo Vicki Hennessy, San Francisco Sheriff, Defendant,
Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:19-cv-02724-SK
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:19-cv-02724-SK
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032560872 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
Filed Audio recording of oral argument.
Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/
[12043278] [20-15341, 20-15449] (BJK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
    ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, SANDRA S. IKUTA and DANIEL A. BRESS. [12032126] [20-15341, 20-15449] (TG)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Ms. Yolanda Huang for Appellants Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15449, Attorney Ms. Yolanda Huang for Appellees Kenyon Norbert, Montrail Brackens, Jose Poot, Marshall Harris, Armando Carlos, Michael Brown and Troy McAllister in 20-15341. Hearing in San Francisco on 03/11/2021 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: Courtroom 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 20.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 02/22/2021. [12011545] [20-15449, 20-15341] (Huang, Yolanda)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None ?
        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Kaitlyn Mara Murphy for Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Attorney Kaitlyn Mara Murphy for Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449. Hearing in San Francisco on 03/11/2021 at 09:00 A.M. (Courtroom: 1). Filer sharing argument time: No. (Argument minutes: 20.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 02/17/2021. [12007412] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Murphy, Kaitlyn)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032411628 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None ?
          Filed (ECF) Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449 reply to response (). Date of service: 01/15/2021. [11965654] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Murphy, Kaitlyn)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032398959 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None ?
            Filed (ECF) Appellees Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15341, Appellant Montrail Brackens in 20-15449 response opposing motion ([38] Motion (ECF Filing), [38] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 01/11/2021. [11959939] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Huang, Yolanda)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 12/27/2020, Entered: None ?
              Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, March 11, 2021 - 09:00 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - Scheduled Location: San Francisco CA.
              The hearing time is the local time zone at the scheduled hearing location, even if the argument is fully remote.


              View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case here.

              NOTE: Although your case is currently scheduled for oral argument, the panel may decide to submit the case on the briefs instead. See Fed. R. App. P. 34. Absent further order of the court, if the court does determine that oral argument is required in this case, any argument may be held remotely with all of the judges and attorneys appearing by video or telephone. Travel to a courthouse will not be required. If the panel determines that it will hold oral argument, the Clerk's Office will be in contact with you directly at least two weeks before the set argument date to make any necessary arrangements for remote appearance.

              Be sure to review the GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to be available (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible).

              If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Thursday, March 11, 2021. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11945338]. [20-15341, 20-15449] (AW)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032359898 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032356590 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Filed (ECF) Appellants Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15449, Appellees Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15341 Motion to extend time to file opposition until 01/11/2021. Date of service: 12/21/2020. [11935409] [20-15449, 20-15341]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of motion. 12/21/2020 by SLM] (Huang, Yolanda)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032350708 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 12/18/2020. [11932781] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Murphy, Kaitlyn)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Received 6 paper copies of Cross-Appeal Reply Brief [35] filed by appellees/cross-appellants. [11924245] [20-15341, 20-15449] (SD)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032316590 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [35] submitted by appellees/cross-appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11916613] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KT)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032315254 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15449. Date of service: 12/04/2020. [11916001] [20-15449, 20-15341]--[COURT UPDATE: updated docket text to correct brief type. 12/07/2020 by KT] (Huang, Yolanda)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [5], [13] in 4 volume(s) (Volume 4 UNDER SEAL) filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee City and County of San Francisco. [11894530] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KWG)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Received 6 paper copies of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal [29] filed by City and County of San Francisco. [11894352] [20-15341, 20-15449] (SD)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Received 6 paper copies of First Brief on Cross-Appeal [4] filed by City and County of San Francisco. [11894346] [20-15341, 20-15449] (SD)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032262818 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Filed clerk order: The third brief on cross-appeal [29] submitted by City and County of San Francisco is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: yellow. A review of the Court's docket reflects that appellant/cross-appellee has not filed the paper copies of the first brief on cross-appeal [4] and excerpts of record [5], [13] as directed by the Court's order filed on October 15, 2020 [25]. Within 7 days of this order, appellant/cross-appellee is ordered to file 6 copies of the first brief on cross-appeal in paper format, with blue covers and accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Within 7 days of this order, appellant/cross-appellee is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with white covers and in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11893068] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KT)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [29]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellee City and County of San Francisco. Date of service: 11/13/2020. [11892699] [20-15449] (Berdux, Sabrina)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032261971 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449. Date of service: 11/13/2020. [11892661] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Berdux, Sabrina)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in San Francisco

                                        Please review the San Francisco sitting dates for March 2021 and the 2 subsequent sitting months in that location at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions. If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please file Form 32 within 3 business days of this notice using the CM/ECF filing type Response to Case Being Considered for Oral Argument. Please follow the form's instructions carefully.

                                        When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date.

                                        If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 business days of this notice, using CM/ECF (Type of Document: Correspondence to Court; Subject: request for mediation).[11892459]. [20-15341, 20-15449] (AW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Received 6 paper copies of Second Brief on Cross-Appeal [23] filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants. [11869152] [20-15341, 20-15449] (SD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [24] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants. [11869005] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KWG)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032188875 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [23] submitted by Appellees/Cross-Appellants is filed.
                                              The supplemental excerpts of record [24] submitted by Appellees/Cross-Appellants are filed.

                                              The Court previously filed the brief [4] and excerpts of record [5], [13] submitted by Appellant/Cross-Appellee City and County of San Francisco.

                                              Within 7 days of this order, the filer of each brief is ordered to file 6 copies of that brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. The Form 18 certificate is available on the Court's website at http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/forms/form18.pdf.

                                              The covers of the first brief on cross-appeal must be blue.
                                              The covers of the second brief on cross-appeal must be red.

                                              Within 7 days of this order, the filer of each set of excerpts of record is ordered to file 3 copies of that set of excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers.

                                              The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. The address for regular U.S. mail is P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939. The address for overnight mail is 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, CA 94103-1526. [11859859] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KT)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032188820 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15341, Appellants Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15449. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859843] [20-15341, 20-15449]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [23].] (KT)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032187409 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellants Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Kenyon Norbert, Troy McAllister and Jose Poot in 20-15449, Appellees Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15341. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11859257] [20-15449, 20-15341]--[COURT UPDATE: updated docket text to correct brief type, removed PDF of supplemental excerpts of record, re-entered correctly in entry [24]. 10/15/2020 by KT] (Huang, Yolanda)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032168196 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Filed order MEDIATION (SL): These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Chief Circuit Mediator by email (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov ) should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [11850623] [20-15341, 20-15449] (WL)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032092510 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: the second brief on cross-appeal is due October 14, 2020; the third brief on crossappeal is due November 13, 2020; and the optional cross-appeal reply brief is due on or before December 4, 2020.On or before October 8, 2020, counsel shall provide a status report by email to the Circuit Mediator (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov). The status report should not be filed with the court. [11816996] [20-15341, 20-15449] (WL)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031950733 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: the second brief on cross-appeal is due September 14, 2020; the third brief on crossappeal is due October 13, 2020; and the optional cross-appeal reply brief is due on or before November 3, 2020.On or before September 3, 2020, counsel shall provide a status report by email to the Circuit Mediator (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov). The status report should not be filed with the court. [11752919] [20-15341, 20-15449] (WL)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Added Attorney(s) Sabrina M. Berdux for party(s) Appellant City and County of San Francisco, in case 20-15341 Attorney(s) Sabrina M. Berdux for party(s) Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 20-15449. [11717913] [20-15449, 20-15341] (JFF)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sabrina M. Berdux (City Attorney's Office) for Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449. Date of service: 06/10/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11717859] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Berdux, Sabrina)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Terminated Margaret W. Baumgartner for City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341 and City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11704262] [20-15341, 20-15449] (RY)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031831532 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: the second brief on cross-appeal is due July 20, 2020; the third brief on cross-appeal is due August 18, 2020; and the optional cross-appeal reply brief is due on or before September 8, 2020. [11701049] [20-15341, 20-15449] (WL)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031732300 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: the second brief on cross-appeal is due June 1, 2020; the third brief on cross-appeal is due June 30, 2020; and the optional cross-appeal reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the third brief on cross-appeal. [11656826] [20-15341, 20-15449] (RT)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031729364 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal [4] and excerpts of record [5], [13] submitted by City and County of San Francisco are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11655481] [20-15341, 20-15449] (KT)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Submitted (ECF) UNDER SEAL excerpts of record Vol 4. Submitted by Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449. Date of service: 03/27/2020. (Court-entered filing, excerpts of record originally submitted in [6].) [11655313] [20-15341, 20-15449] (AF)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031728960 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031728954 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Filed Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449 motion to file Volume 4 of the excerpts of record UNDER SEAL. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/27/2020. (Court-entered filing of motion submitted under seal at [6]) [11655308] [20-15341, 20-15449] (AF)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Added Attorney(s) Kaitlyn Mara Murphy for party(s) Appellant City and County of San Francisco, in case 20-15341 Attorney(s) Kaitlyn Mara Murphy for party(s) Appellee City and County of San Francisco, in case 20-15449. [11647125] [20-15341, 20-15449] (JFF)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kaitlyn M. Murphy (City and County of San Francisco, Office of the City Attorney, 1390 Market Street, 6th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102) for Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341, Appellee City and County of San Francisco in 20-15449. Date of service: 03/31/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11646940] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Murphy, Kaitlyn)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/30/2020.
                                                                                To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
                                                                                Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11646421]. [20-15449] (AD)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031709672 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Montrail Brackens, Michael Brown, Armando Carlos, Marshall Harris, Troy McAllister, Kenyon Norbert and Jose Poot in 20-15341 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/30/2020. [11646368] [20-15449, 20-15341] (Huang, Yolanda)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341 motion to file document under seal and submit sealed document. Type of document: excerpts of record. Date of service: 03/27/2020. [11644468] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Baumgartner, Margaret)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031705442 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341. Date of service: 03/27/2020. [11644422] [20-15341, 20-15449] (Baumgartner, Margaret)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031705409 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Submitted (ECF) First Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellant City and County of San Francisco in 20-15341. Date of service: 03/27/2020. [11644408] [20-15341, 20-15449]--[COURT UPDATE: updated docket text to correct brief type. 04/08/2020 by KT] (Baumgartner, Margaret)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031689012 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/01/2020, 2:00 p.m.,; PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11637142] [20-15341, 20-15449] (VS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031682481 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): The cross-appeal filed March 13, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply to these cross-appeals. The mediation questionnaire for appeal No. 20-15449 is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The first brief on cross-appeal is due March 27, 2020; the second brief on cross-appeal is due April 24, 2020; the third brief on cross-appeal is due May 22, 2020; and the optional cross-appeal reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the third brief on cross-appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). [11634258] [20-15341, 20-15449] (RT)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009031676492 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: To be set. Preliminary injunction appeal, C.R.3-3. [11631652] [20-15449, 20-15341] (JBS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?