Derek Devine v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 21CV378214

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 5:42 AM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Devine, Derek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Daghighian, Sepehr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daghighian, Sepehr +1 310 877 1333
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by thetafirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Soheyl Tahsildoost st@thetafirm.com
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POS
Granted Def Tesla Inc's Mtn to Compel Binding Arbitration and Stay pending Arb.
    Blank 17 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Non-Opposition
      Hrg 7-22-21 D2 Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
        Blank 15 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
          Blank 14 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
          Notice of Posting Jury Fees
            Blank 13 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
            Notice of Change of Address
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
              Case Management Statement
                Blank 11 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                Case Management Statement
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Notice
                  AMENDED Notice of Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration. 7/22/21 @ 9AM, D2.
                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Motion: Compel Arbitration
                    Binding Arbitration. Hearing 7-22-21 D-2 @9
                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                      of Soheyl Tahsildoost ISO MTC Binding Arbitration.
                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                        of Raymond Kim ISO MTC Binding Arbitration.
                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None First Paper Filed - Fee
                            Taken on Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration.
                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                              Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                Complaint
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                    Summons

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?