USA v. Apte et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:21-cr-00116-CRB

Tags
Last Updated June 1, 2021 at 5:08 PM DT (3.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle F. Waldinger +1 415 436 6830 +1 415 436 7234 kyle.waldinger@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Zachary Shultz Apte, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Zachary Shultz Apte (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 3/18/2021
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1349 Conspiracy to Commit Health Care Fraud
Count 16-21
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1028A(a)(1) & 2 Aggravated Identity Theft and Aiding and Abetting
Count 2-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1347.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1347 and 2 Health Care Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 22
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 371 Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud and Securities Fraud
Count 23-32
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1343 & 2 Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 33-41
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
15 U.S.C. §§ 78j(b), 78ff
Count 42-43
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-7430.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1957 & 2 Engaging in Monetary Transactions with Proceeds of Specified Unlawful Activity and Aiding and Abetting
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Order Relating Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Order Relating Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021 indictment
                            INDICTMENT as to Zachary Shultz Apte (1) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16-21, 22, 23-32, 33-41, 42-43, Jessica Sunshine Richman (2) count(s) 1, 2-15, 16-21, 22, 23-32, 33-41, 44-47. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 68 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?