Charcas v. Marsden South, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:21-cv-00899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 20, 2021 at 3:18 PM DT (3.4 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Notification re: Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge (FORM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Order to Show Cause Concerning Removal - FORM - Judge Gilmore
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Memorandum and Order re Motions - FORM - Judge Gilmore
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?