Tesla, Inc. v. McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:21-cv-01962-BLF
District Judge Beth Labson Freeman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 3, 2021 at 5:14 PM DT (3.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tesla, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Caleb Alm +1 650 681 5000 jalm@tesla.com
v.
No Logo McKechnie Vehicle Components (USA), Inc., Defendant
No Logo MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 3/19/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1330 Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Order
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Redacted Document
      REDACTION of TRO Motion and Exhibits, Dkt. 3, Per Court Order, Dkt. 37, by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Redacted Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # (2) Declaration Redacted Version of Guh-Siesel Decl., # (3) Declaration Redacted Version of Gangaraju Decl., # (4) Declaration Redacted Version of McCabe Decl., # (5) Declaration Redacted Version of Gschwind Decl.)(Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [28] MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/21/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
        EXHIBITS re [28] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Renewed) pursuant to Court Order, Dkt. 35, filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Highlighted Unredacted Version of Dkt. 28-4 TRO Motion, # (2) Exhibit Highlighted Unredacted Version of Dkt. 28-6 Decl. of Guh-Siesel, # (3) Exhibit Highlighted Unredacted Version of Dkt. 28-8 Decl. of Gangaraju, # (4) Exhibit Highlighted Unredacted Version of Dkt. 28-10 Decl. of McCabe, # (5) Exhibit Highlighted Unredacted Version of Dkt. 28-12 Decl. of Gschwind)(Related document(s)[28]) (Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER REQUESTING TESLA TO FILE HIGHLIGHTED UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/28/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING [33] JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 stipulation
              STIPULATION Joint re Extend Answer Deadline filed by MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: 4/15/2021 Opposition/Response to Motion
                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [28] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Renewed) ) filed byMcKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING [29] STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/14/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 stipulation
                    STIPULATION Joint filed by MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021, Terminated: 5/21/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Renewed) filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit TRO Motion - Redacted, # (4) Exhibit TRO Motion - Unredacted, # (5) Declaration of Guh-Siesel - Redacted, # (6) Declaration of Guh-Siesel - Unredacted, # (7) Declaration of Gangaraju - Redacted, # (8) Declaration of Gangaraju - Unredacted, # (9) Declaration of McCabe - Redacted, # (10) Declaration of McCabe - Unredacted, # (11) Declaration of Gschwind - Redacted, # (12) Declaration of Gschwind - Unredacted)(Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: 4/1/2021 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                        ORDER DENYING [3] MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/1/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                          REPLY (re [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER STRIKING BRIEF AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES AND STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/25/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing as to [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 3/25/2021. Total Time in Court: 54 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Candace Jackman and Joseph Alm via Zoom webinar. Defendant Attorney: Georges Haddad and Jennifer Green via Zoom webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2021)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING [17] APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/25/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                  REPLY (re [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) Motion to Strike Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion to Seal filed byTesla, Inc.. (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021, Terminated: 5/21/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                    REPLY (re [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                    REPLY (re [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021, Terminated: 3/25/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15743598.) filed by MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc.. (Green, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Including Table Req'd By Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases and Dkt. 11 filed byTesla, Inc.. (Related document(s)[3]) (Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 15 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                        CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion Hearing as to [3] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 23, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Candace A Jackman (Jackman, Candace) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Certificate of service
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesla, Inc. re [10] Order (Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO AUGMENT MOTION TO SEAL IN COMPLIANCE WITH STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND, SETTING HEARING DATE, DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS WITH NOTICE OF ORDER AND FILE PROOF Of SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/22/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MVCUSA Holdings, LLC, McKechnie Vehicle Components USA, Inc... (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Georges A. Haddad (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/20/2021, Entered: 3/20/2021, Terminated: 4/1/2021 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # (3) Supplement TRO Motion - Redacted, # (4) Supplement TRO Motion - Unredacted, # (5) Declaration of Guh-Siesel - Redacted, # (6) Declaration of Guh-Siesel - Unredacted, # (7) Declaration of Gangaraju - Redacted, # (8) Declaration of Gangaraju - Unredacted, # (9) Declaration of McCabe - Redacted, # (10) Declaration of McCabe - Unredacted, # (11) Declaration of Gschwind - Redacted, # (12) Declaration of Gschwind - Unredacted, # (13) Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 3/20/2021)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc. (Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Conversion against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15729306.). Filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Alm, Joseph) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 2,021 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?