Securities and Exchange Commission v. MintBroker International, LTD., f/k/a Swiss America Securities LTD. and d/b/a SureTrader et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-21079-XXXX

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 21, 2021 at 11:54 AM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amie Riggle Berlin +1 305 982 6300 +1 305 536 4154 berlina@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Gentile, Guy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Guy Gentile"
No Logo MintBroker International, LTD., f/k/a Swiss America Securities LTD. and d/b/a SureTrader, Defendant
Office Miami
Filed 3/22/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078 Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Miami-Dade (Office - Miami)
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None extension of time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Complaint
            COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s))(Berlin, Amie)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 53 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?