District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New Jersey District Court Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit United States Supreme Court

SEC v. Guy Gentile
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 18-1242

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 22, 2021 at 5:04 PM DT (7.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gentile, Guy, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Guy Gentile"

Toggle Switch Represented by FORD O'BRIEN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ADAM C. FORD +1 212 858 0040 aford@fordobrien.com
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Sec"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy A Brown +1 212 336 1023 +1 212 336 1322 brownn@sec.gov
Space Sarah R. Prins +1 202 551 5159 prinss@sec.gov
Space Daniel Staroselsky +1 202 551 5774 staroselskyd@sec.gov
Nature of Suit 1850 - Securities Commodities Exchange
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=2-16-cv-01619
Lower Court Case https://ecf.njd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=2-16-cv-01619
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: None ?
NOTICE of U.S. Supreme Court disposition at No. 19-878. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Guy Gentile denied on 04/20/2020. (CND)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None ?
    NOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Guy Gentile on 12/23/2019. Supreme Court Case No. 19-878. (TMK)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013413564 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None ?
      MANDATE ISSUED. (LMR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013413545 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
        ORDER (HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges) denying Motion by Appellee to Stay Issuance of Mandate Pending Disposition by the Supreme Court of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Hardiman, Authoring Judge. (LMR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013401782 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None ?
          ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Guy Gentile in 18-1242 to stay mandate. Certificate of Service dated 11/08/2019. Service made by ECF.--[Edited 11/08/2019 by CJG to remove from the appeal at No. 19-2252 as it does not apply.] (ACF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013358590 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?
            JUDGMENT, Vacated. The cause is REMANDED to the District Court. All of the above in accordance with the Opinion of this Court. No costs shall be taxed. (LMR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013358582 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
              PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 32. Judge: HARDIMAN Authoring. (LMR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013329457 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                ECF FILER: Letter dated 08/23/2019 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant SEC. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [18-1242] (DS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013178157 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                  ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Guy Gentile to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/06/2019. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [18-1242] (ACF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013169714 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                    ECF FILER: Letter dated 02/26/2019 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant SEC. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [18-1242] (DS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013079431 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                      COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [18-1242, 16-3768, 16-3887, 17-2275, 17-2361, 17-3364, 17-3583, 18-1399] (PM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                        ARGUED on Tuesday, November 06, 2018. Panel: HARDIMAN, KRAUSE and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges. Adam C. Ford arguing for Appellee Guy Gentile; Daniel Staroselsky arguing for Appellant SEC. (PM)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                          TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, oral argument is rescheduled for 10:30am on Tuesday, November 6, 2018. (GPK)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                            ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Adam C. Ford, Esq. for Appellee Guy Gentile. Case Summary: The district court properly dismissed the SECs Amended Complaint as all claims were time-barred; the remedies sought are only for punitive purposes; and the SEC was attempting to penalize individuals for past conduct while avoiding the 5-year limitation. Post Video: YES. [18-1242] (ACF)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013071155 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                              ECF FILER: Letter dated 10/25/2018 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant SEC. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [18-1242] (DS)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Daniel Staroselsky, Esq. for Appellant SEC. Case Summary: Whether the district court erred in dismissing the Commission's complaint on the basis of the statute of limitations in 28 U.S.C. 2462.. Post Video: YES. [18-1242] (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013070068 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                                  Oral Argument Notification for Tuesday, 11/06/2018. Courtroom & Time: Seitz Courtroom / 10:30am. Location: Philadelphia, PA.--[Edited 11/02/2018 by GPK to updated time of argument. See Text Order of 11/2/2018.] (PM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013048093 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None ?
                                    ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Adam C. Ford, Esq. for Appellee Guy Gentile. Certificate of Service dated 10/01/2018. Service made by ECF. [18-1242] (ACF)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013047937 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None ?
                                      ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Daniel Staroselsky, Esq. for Appellant SEC. Certificate of Service dated 10/01/2018. Service made by ECF. [18-1242] (DS)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003013047440 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                                        Calendared for Tuesday, 11/06/2018. Calendar Clerk: PM. (PM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                          HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant SEC - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. Received: 10. (KEL)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012968344 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant SEC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/27/2018 by ECF. [18-1242] (DS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                              HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Guy Gentile - Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012956408 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Guy Gentile, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/14/2018 by ECF. [18-1242] (ACF)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                  HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant SEC - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (EAF)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                    HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant SEC - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. Received: 10. (KEL)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012931332 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant SEC, filed. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2018 by ECF. [18-1242] (DS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012931313 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum & Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant SEC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/15/2018 by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect all attachments] [18-1242]--[Edited 05/16/2018 by EMA] (DS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012895500 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant SEC due on or before 05/15/2018. Appendix due on or before 05/15/2018. (CJG)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012858197 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam C. Ford on behalf of Appellee(s) Guy Gentile. [18-1242] (ACF)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012857748 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                              FOLLOW UP LETTER to Adam C. Ford, Esq. for Guy Gentile requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/08/2018. (CJG)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012852098 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant SEC advising this court that no transcripts are available. [18-1242] (SP)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012847986 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant SEC, received. [18-1242] (SP)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012847977 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant SEC, filed. [18-1242] (SP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012847548 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel Staroselsky on behalf of Appellant(s) Securities and Exchange Commission. [18-1242] (DS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012847463 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Prins on behalf of Appellant(s) SEC. [18-1242] (SP)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                          RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012846238 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                            CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant SEC in District Court No. 2-16-cv-01619. (CJG)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Space Space

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?