District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New Jersey District Court Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit United States Supreme Court

SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. GENTILE
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-01619-BRM-JAD
District Judge Brian R. Martinotti, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 22, 2021 at 5:09 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy A Brown +1 212 336 1023 +1 212 336 1322 brownn@sec.gov
Space Thomas Peter Smith +1 212 336 0171 +1 212 336 1348 smithth@sec.gov
Space Simona K. Suh +1 212 336 0103 +1 212 336 1320 suhs@sec.gov
Space Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro +1 212 336 9145 tenreiroj@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Gentile, Guy, Defendant
Officially listed as "GUY GENTILE"

Toggle Switch Represented by FORD O'BRIEN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ADAM C. FORD +1 212 858 0040 aford@fordobrien.com
Office Newark
Filed 3/23/2016
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/21/2020
Origin 4
Reopened 12/18/2019
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 18-1242[Third Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,SCHEDO
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 115 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER: The Court clarifies that, in light of the Hon. Brian R. Martinotti's Order dated 10/21/20, (ECF No. 114), the telephone status conference scheduled for 11/10/20 is CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/10/2020. (tjd)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    ORDER that, in light of Plaintiff's Letter and the [109] dismissal order, the scheduling order (ECF No. 112) is moot and the Clerk is directed to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/21/20. (jc, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 letter
      Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission re [109] Order on Motion to Dismiss,. (TENREIRO, JORGE)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 112 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 OrderCourt Filing
        TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered the parties' recent letters. (ECF Nos. 110, 111). The SEC shall file its letter regarding the Requests for Admission issue on or before 10/21/20. Defendant shall respond on or before 11/4/20. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/1/2020. (tjd)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 Response (NOT Motion)
          RESPONSE re [110] Letter. (FORD, ADAM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020 letter
            Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission re [107] Transcript,,,. (TENREIRO, JORGE)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: 9/29/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [81] Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. [47] Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint, which will be the final amendment permitted by the Court, curing the deficiencies raised in the Opinion by October 20, 2020. If Plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Complaint by October 20, 2020, the [47] Amended Complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/29/20. (jc, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: 9/29/2020 OpinionCourt Filing
                OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/29/20. (jc, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/29/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                  Transcript of Status Conference via Zoom held on September 24, 2020, before Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Transcriber: KLJ Transcription Service, LLC (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (mfr)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 106 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                    TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephone status conference in this matter on 11/10/20 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 9972150# at the time of the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/25/2020. (tjd)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Status Conference
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Zoom Status Conference held on 9/24/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder: Zoom) (jbb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 105 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                        TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 9/24/20 is hereby converted into a Zoom video conference. The conference will still begin at 10:00 a.m. The Court will circulate connection information to counsel in advance of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/23/2020. (tjd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 letter
                          Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission re [103] Response (NOT Motion), [102] Order, [101] Letter, [99] Letter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(TENREIRO, JORGE)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 Response (NOT Motion)
                            RESPONSE re [101] Letter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(FORD, ADAM)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 102 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                              TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's recent letters, (ECF Nos. 99, 101), on or before 9/18/20. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/15/2020. (tjd)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 letter
                                Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                  Transcript of Zoom Status Conference held on July 14, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Transcriber: KLJ Transcription Service (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2020. (wh)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 letter
                                    Letter from Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 98 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                      TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's previously served requests for admission on or before 8/28/20. The Court will conduct a telephone status conference on 9/24/20 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 9972150# at the time of the Conference. The parties shall raise any outstanding written discovery issues on or before 10/13/20. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended through and including 11/13/20. The parties shall serve opening expert reports on or before 12/14/20. The parties shall serve responsive expert reports on or before 1/8/21. The deadline for completion of expert discovery is extended through and including 2/5/21. On or before 2/19/21, any party that wishes to file a dispositive motion shall file a letter requesting leave to do so. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/22/2020. (tjd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Zoom Video Status Conference held on 7/14/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder: Zoom Video) (jbb)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 letter
                                          Letter from Adam C Ford re [95] Letter. (FORD, ADAM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice - other
                                            NOTICE by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION of Withdrawal of Appearance (FORTINO, PHILIP)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 letter
                                              Letter from Jorge G Tenreiro re [93] Response (NOT Motion). (TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Notice - other
                                                NOTICE by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION of Withdrawal of Appearance (BUTLER, ELIZABETH)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Response (NOT Motion)
                                                  RESPONSE re [91] Letter. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated 6/29/20. (ECF No. 91). The Court will conduct the status conference scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on 7/14/20 on the record, via the Zoom conferencing platform. The Court will address the other issues described in Plaintiff's letter at that time. The Court will distribute connection information for the conference directly to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/30/2020. (tjd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 letter
                                                      Letter from Jorge G. Tenreiro re [74] Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the TIME of the Telephone Status Conference set for 7/14/20 has been changed to 9:30 a.m. The parties are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 9972150# at the time of the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/16/20. (jbb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GUY GENTILE re [81] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (FORD, ADAM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, (ECF No. 87), the telephone conference scheduled for 4/23/20 is hereby adjourned to 7/14/20 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall kindly coordinate the call to chambers (973-645-2580). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/21/2020. (tjd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 letter
                                                              Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [81] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer
                                                                  CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The [85] AFFIDAVIT in Opposition submitted by Nancy Brown on 4/3/20 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user (Jorge Tenreiro) is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE OR WET SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [81] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Declaration of Nancy A. Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [81] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's opposition to [81] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint shall be filed on April 3, 2020. Defendant's reply shall be filed on April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/19/20. (jc, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [81] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION and proposed Order re Briefing Schedule by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020, Terminated: 9/29/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by GUY GENTILE. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Gentile's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Adam Ford, # (3) Exhibit Petition for Certiorari, # (4) Exhibit Declaration of Adam Ford June 30, 2017, # (5) Exhibit Affidavit of Adam Ford July 14, 2016, # (6) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Discovery Confidentiality OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                Stipulation and Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/10/20. (jc, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION and proposed Confidentiality Order by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 letter
                                                                                    Letter from Jorge G. Tenreiro re [77] Letter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 letter
                                                                                      Letter from Adam C. Ford. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Redacted Disclosure, # (2) Exhibit Redacted Supp. Disclosure)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on 4/23/20 will now take place before Magistrate Judge Dickson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall kindly coordinate the call to chambers (973-645-2580). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/29/2020. (tjd)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                          TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez, Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/27/20. (ak, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 1/24/2020. (jr)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Joint Discovery Plan
                                                                                                Joint Discovery Plan by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP ANDREW FORTINO on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (FORTINO, PHILIP)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 letter
                                                                                                    Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Transcript of Status (Via Telephone) held on December 17, 2019, before Judge John M. Vazquez. Court Reporter: Lisa Larsen (630-338-5069). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter Agency due, but not filed, by 1/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2020. (bt, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER: Please be advised that the in-person scheduling conference before the Undersigned on 1/15/20 is hereby rescheduled to January 24, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The same requirements stated in the Court's prior order apply.Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 1/7/20.(LM, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 letter
                                                                                                          Letter from Adam C. Ford re [67] Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/19/19. (LM, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Order Reopening CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall reinstate this matter to its active docket; Defendant shall move or otherwise answer [47] Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before February 14, 2020; Discovery is not stayed, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/17/19. (jc, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status Conference held on 12/17/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Lisa A. Larsen.) (ro, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 letter
                                                                                                                  Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER: Scheduling a status phone conference for December 17, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall circulate dial-in information for this call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/11/19. (ro, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk for all further proceedings. Judge Jose L. Linares, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/4/19. (ak, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA as to [58] Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Finance notified) (Attachments: # (1) Clerk's letter to District Court, # (2) Opinion)(lr)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Mandate Notice
                                                                                                                          Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 09/26/2019. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (dam, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 USCA Judgment (Use if Mandate will follow)
                                                                                                                            USCA JUDGMENT as to [58] Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, Vacated. The cause is REMANDED to the District Court. (lr)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 18-1242 for [58] Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. USCA Case Manager Caitlyn (CJG) (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3cjg)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018, Terminated: 11/22/2019 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [57] Order on Motion to Dismiss, by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Defendant's [50] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by GUY GENTILE. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff;s First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 47 is hereby Dismissed and it is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this matter closed. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/13/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/13/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GUY GENTILE re [50] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [50] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by JORGE G TENREIRO on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (TENREIRO, JORGE)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the November 13, 2017 Telephone Conference is rescheduled to January 16, 2018 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/9/2017. (ld, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                              Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines as to [50] First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by GUY GENTILE. Responses due by 11/17/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Motion, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION & ORDER it is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-entitled action, that Defendant Guy Gentile intends to file a motion to dismiss the amended Complaint and the parties agree to the following motion briefing schedule; Defendant is to file his motion to dismiss the amended complaint on or before 10/27/2017. Plaintiff is to file any opposition on or before 11/17/2017. Defendant is to file any reply on or before 12/8/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/19/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule by GUY GENTILE. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against GUY GENTILE, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          OPINION AND RDER, that defendants 's motion[34] First MOTION to Dismiss is administratively terminated without prejudice and it is further Ordered that the Plaintiff is Directed to file an amended complaint, in a manner that is consistent with this Court's opinion and Order by 10/6/2017 and it is further Ordered that the Defendant is Granted leave to move to dismiss the forthcoming amended complaint when it is filed, if appropriate, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/18/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the telephone status conference scheduled for 9/8/17 has been adjourned to 11/13/17 at 11:30 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/7/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [34] First MOTION to Dismiss (BUTLER, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER ORDER re: [40] Letter from Nancy A. Brown. The plaintiff is Granted leave to file a sur-reply, not to exceed ten (10) pages in the total, by 8/16/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/7/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GUY GENTILE re [34] First MOTION to Dismiss (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [34] First MOTION to Dismiss (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [34] First MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Nancy A. Brown (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V)(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re [34] First MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Simona K. Suh (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  QC - Updating Account
                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The change of address request submitted by Adam C. Ford, on 7/12/2017 can not be process by the Clerk's office, please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by ADAM C. FORD (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines as to [34] First MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/7/2017 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 9/18/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Brief, # (2) Declaration Adam C. Ford Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (14) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the telephone status conference previously scheduled for 6/27/17 (ECF #17) has been rescheduled to 9/8/17 at 10:30 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/26/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed the parties' recent letters. (ECF Nos. 30-31). Defendant shall file any motion to dismiss on or before 6/30/17. Plaintiff shall file any opposition on or before 7/21/17. Defendant shall file any reply on or before 8/4/17. The parties shall not conduct any discovery in this matter prior to the resolution of Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/12/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Adam C. Ford. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Kokesh Decision)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER: Correction to previous TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, 5/30/17 at 3:00 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/30/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/30/2017. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that a telephone status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, 5/31/17 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/26/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Adam C. Ford. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN BUTLER on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (BUTLER, ELIZABETH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: 5/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER The Court has carefully reviewed the parties recent submissions. (20-22). The Court hereby continues the stay in this matter through and including 6/9/17 so as to permit consideration of the United States Supreme Courts forthcoming decision in Kokesh v. Securities & Exchange Commission. Counsel for Defendant shall file a status update letter on or before 6/7/17.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/12/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS PETER SMITH, JR on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (SMITH, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Adam C. Ford. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (SUH, SIMONA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Adam C. Ford. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: 5/1/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: there shall be a Telephone Status Conference set for 6/27/2017 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2017. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2017. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/26/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/12/2017. (JB, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER - Counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission shall file a status letter on or before 4/26/17. Counsel for Defendant shall file a response on or before 5/5/17. This matter shall remain stayed (with the exception of the parties' exchange of initial disclosures) pending further Order of the Court.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/12/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 4/12/2017. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the in person conference scheduled for 4/4/17 has been rescheduled to 4/12/17 at 11:30 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/17/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: 3/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the parties' recent letters. (ECF Nos. 12-13). The conference scheduled for 4/4/17 will proceed as scheduled. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint shall remain stayed pending that conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/16/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Adam C. Ford. (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM C. FORD on behalf of GUY GENTILE (FORD, ADAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that an in person conference is scheduled for 4/4/17 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is hereby ordered to notify defense counsel of the time and date of the conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/9/17. (nm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (SUH, SIMONA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION/ORDER STAYING CASE pending the entry of a judgment in the Parallel Criminal Proceeding. Defendant shall have sixty (60) days after such judgment is entered in the Parallel Criminal Proceeding to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/13/16. (DD, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GUY GENTILE waiver sent on 4/27/2016, answer due 6/27/2016. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/6/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by SIMONA K. SUH on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (SUH, SIMONA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Nancy A. Brown. (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY ANDREWS BROWN on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (BROWN, NANCY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to GUY GENTILE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Robin Newman* (rn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against GUY GENTILE, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(rn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?