Gentile v. Cohodes
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Sonoma, Case No. SCV-265069

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 22, 2021 at 5:16 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gentile, Guy, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cohodes, Marc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Sealy Corp
No Logo Cohodes, Marc, Respondent
Unknown Role, Sealy Corp
No Logo Gentile, Guy, Respondent
No Logo Cohodes, Marc, Appellant
Unknown Role, Sealy Corp
No Logo Gentile, Guy, Appellant
No Logo Cohodes, Marc, Judgment Creditor
Unknown Role, Sealy Corp
No Logo Gentile, Guy, Judgment Debtor
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 126 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Certificate of Mailing / Transmittial of Record on Appeal
**Amended to reflect the new mailing date. Appeal was returned and remailed.
    Blank 125 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 Correspondence
    Re: Proposed Judgment and Case Status
      Blank 124 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Judgment - Entire Action
      Costs and Attorney Fees
        Blank 123 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Trust Withdrawal Request
        $281.12 released to State (AP) - cert copy to accts
          Blank 122 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021 Trust Withdrawal Request
          $140.56 released to State (RS)- cert copy to accts
            Blank 121 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Notice of
            Proposed Judgment
              Blank 120 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021 Case Management Conference
              Case Status and Status of Appeal
                Blank 119 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Transmittal Letter to DCA
                **Amended**
                  Blank 118 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 DCA File Number
                  A161721 D2
                    Blank 117 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                    By E-mail - Joint Case Management Statement
                      Blank 116 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Notice of Estimate for Respondent's Copy of Clerk's Trans
                      $140.56 due by 1/20/21 from Respondent G Gentile
                        Blank 115 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Ntc of Estimate for Appellant's Copy of Clerk's Transcript
                        $181.12 due by 1/20/21 from Appellant M Cohodes
                          Blank 114 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Notice of
                          Submission of Proposed Judgment
                            Blank 113 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 Proof of Service to the DCA
                            re: Appellant's notice of designations
                              Blank 112 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Certified Transcript of Designated Proceedings
                              K Langstaff 10/21/20
                                Blank 111 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 Designations of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
                                Respondent's counter designations due 12/21/20
                                  Blank 110 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020 Notice of Default on Appeal
                                  $100 from Appellant Cohodes for clerks due 12/21/20
                                    Blank 109 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: 11/30/2020 Notice of appeal
                                    Appellant's designations due 12/10/20
                                      Blank 108 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Motion
                                      Objecting to Sufficiency of Security Undertaking
                                        Blank 107 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling
                                        Order After Hearing
                                          Blank 106 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Ruling Issued on Submitted Matter
                                          Order After Hearing October 21, 2020
                                            Blank 105 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Attorney's Fees
                                            Hearing Time: 3:00 PM
                                              Blank 104 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling
                                              Order denying motion to dismiss
                                                Blank 103 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                by electronic service of reply documents
                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Reply Declaration
                                                  Declaration of Fred Norton
                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Proof of Service of Motion/OSC
                                                    Proof of Service
                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Declaration Re:
                                                      Declaration of Amanda Wetzel in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Fees
                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: 10/7/2020 Opposition
                                                        PLAINTIFF GUY GENTILE S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARC COHODES S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY S FEES AND COSTS
                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Notice of Rescheduled Hearing
                                                          Resetting 9/30 L&M Hearing to 11/13
                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 Certificate of Mailing / Transmittial of Record on Appeal
                                                            **Amended** to F Norton obo RS Cohodes via UPS
                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: 10/1/2020 Email Correspondence Received
                                                              F Norton obo Respondent- requests record be shipped to his Berkeley address
                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Reply Memo of P&A in Support
                                                                Reply Memo of P&A in Support of Objection to Sufficiency of Plaintiff Guy Gentile's Security Undertaking for Attorneys' Fees and Costs
                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Trust Withdrawal Request
                                                                  $145.60 refunded to Northern Calif Legal Supp Serv obo AP Gentile- cert copy to accts
                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Trust Withdrawal Request
                                                                    $1464.25 released to State (for RS's clerks XC)- cert copy to accts
                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Trust Withdrawal Request
                                                                      $2928.50 released to State (for AP's clerk XC)- cert copy to accts
                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Certificate of Mailing / Transmittial of Record on Appeal
                                                                        DCA, M Axelbaum, W Norton records shipped via UPS
                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Reporter's Request for Payment
                                                                          K Langstaff $179.40 from Appellant G Gentile- cert copy to accts
                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Designated Transcript Deposited by Reporter
                                                                            K Langstaff 5/20/20
                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                                              Filed Document
                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 Opposition
                                                                                Opposition
                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: 9/16/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  Hearing Time: 3:00 PM
                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Declaration in Support of MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE Section 1030(d)
                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020 Reply Memo of P&A in Support
                                                                                      Reply Memo of P&A in Support of MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1030(d)
                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Proof Of Service By Mail
                                                                                        Proof of Service by electronic transmission
                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                          Declaration of Khyrstyn R. Mcgarry in Support of Opposition To Defendant Marc Cohodes s Motion to Enter Dismissal Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Pro. 1030(D)
                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                            Declaration of Katherine Jaskot In Support of Opposition to Defendant Marc Cohodes s Motion To Enter Dismissal Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Pro. 1030(D)
                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                              Declaration of Guy Gentile in Support of Opposition to Defendant Marc Cohodes s Motion To Enter Dismissal Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Pro. 1030(D)
                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/2/2020 Memorandum of P&A's in Opposition
                                                                                                Plaintiff Guy Gentile s Opposition to Defendant Marc Cohodes s Motion to Enter Dismissal Pursuant to Cal. Code Civ. Pro. 1030(D)
                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript
                                                                                                  K Langstaff 5/20/20 due 9/24/20
                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Notice of Estimate for Respondent's Copy of Clerk's Trans
                                                                                                    $1464.25 from Respondent due 9/9/20
                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Ntc of Estimate for Appellant's Copy of Clerk's Transcript
                                                                                                      $2828.50 from G Gentile due 9/9/20
                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 DCA File Number
                                                                                                        A160747-D2
                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Appeal Document Filed
                                                                                                          *Supplemental Appellant's notice designating record on appeals*
                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Proof of Service to the DCA
                                                                                                            re: Appellant's designations
                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Notice of Default on Appeal
                                                                                                              $325 + $50 Reporter's deposit due 9/3/20
                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Proof of Service of Process
                                                                                                                Appellant's designations
                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Designations of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
                                                                                                                  Respondent's counter designations due 8/24/20
                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                    Settled Pleadings
                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Proof of Service of Process
                                                                                                                      Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                        Appellant's designations due 8/13/20
                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Proof of Service of Motion/OSC
                                                                                                                          Proof of Service of Motion/OSC
                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Matt Turetzky in support of Motion for Award of Mandatory Fees and Cost
                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Fred Norton in support of Motion for Award of Mandatory Fees and Costs
                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                Motion for Award of Mandatory Fees and Costs
                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: 7/29/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                                                                                                  Electronic Svc: CMS
                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION OF TYLER M. LAYTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MARC COHODESS MOTION OBJECTING TO THE SUFFICIENCY OF PLAINTIFF GUY UNDERTAKING FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Motion
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENTER DISMISSAL
                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 Civil Undertaking
                                                                                                                                        via Surety - Mint Global Insurance
                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 Ruling Issued on Submitted Matter
                                                                                                                                          Order After Hearing May 20, 2020
                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Anti-SLAPP_____A
                                                                                                                                            Hearing Time: 3:00 PM
                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: 5/20/2020 Demurrer_____B
                                                                                                                                              Hearing Time: 3:00 PM
                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Proof of Service of Process
                                                                                                                                                Proof of Service of Process
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                  HRG 5-20-2020 Response
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Objections To Evidence
                                                                                                                                                    HRG 5-20-2020 Objections to Evidence
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                      Turetzky Decl ISO Suppl Authority
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Notice of
                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Authority ISO Cohodes's Mtn to Strike
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                          of Rescheduled Hearing due to Emergency Closure
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 Notice
                                                                                                                                                            of Zoom appearances
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing Date (3 Motions continued from 3/11 to 5/20/20 3:00 #17)
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration iso Urgent Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service by Electronic Transmission (of Ex Parte Application)
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    of Adam Ford iso Urgent Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Ex Parte Application For
                                                                                                                                                                      Urgent Ex Parte Application to Continue March 11 Hearing Date
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        DENIED on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on March 11, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                          by Electronic Transmission - Ex Parte Documents
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                            of Adam Ford in Support of Plaintiff's Urgent Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Ex Parte Application For
                                                                                                                                                                              Urgent Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff Guy Gentile to Continue Hearing Date
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                of Urgent Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Proof of Service of Motion/OSC
                                                                                                                                                                                  re: Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    of Fred Norton re DF Attorney's Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Memo of P&A in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Cohodes's Motion for a Security Undertaking
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Objections To Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                        to Affidavit of Edward Cooper
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Objections Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                          to Dec. of Guy Gentile ISO Oppo to DF Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Objections To Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                            to Decl of K. Millett
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Objections To Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                              to Nancy Goldstein
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Objections To Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                to Karen Barker
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                  of Matthew Turetzky ISO of Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Alejandro Soto ISO of Motion for Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Declaration of Neal McConnell
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Reply Memo of P&A in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Proof of Service of Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration Re:
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF KAREN BARKER GENTILE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF KATHERINE MILLET
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NANCY B. GOLDSTEIN, ESQ.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GUY GENTILE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EDWARD COOPER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of GUY GENTILE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Time: 3:00 PM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jointly Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Continue Hearing Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees/Demand for Jury
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              just fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Continuing Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Pending Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granting Unopposed Verified Application for Adam C. Ford to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Granting Unopposed Verified Application for Anjula Prasad to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      for Pro Hac Vice of Ajula Prasad
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        for Pro Hac Vice for Adam C Ford
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jim Hunt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Proof of Service of Motion/OSC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            3 motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fred Norton
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                for a Security Undertaking re attorney fees & costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Marc Cohodes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Matthew Turetzky
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        GUY GENTILE'S UNOPPOSED VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR ANJULA PRASAD TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          GUY GENTILE'S UNOPPOSED VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR ADAM C. FORD TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Complaint filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Does 1-20

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?