Huntsman v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-02504

Tags
Last Updated April 16, 2021 at 7:39 PM DT (6.6 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Huntsman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lavely & Singer APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Binder Jonelis +1 310 556 3501 +1 310 556 3615 djonelis@lavelysinger.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Summons Request
            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff James Huntsman. (Jonelis, David)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Huntsman. (Jonelis, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Huntsman, (Jonelis, David)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                  COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30963334 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff James Huntsman. (Attorney David Binder Jonelis added to party James Huntsman(pty:pla))(Jonelis, David)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 66 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?