Cordero, et al v. AMR Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06966-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Christine K. Fisher, Plaintiff

Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Paul Nolan +1 212 661 0011 +1 212 953 6483 kpn@ny.speiserkrause.com
No Logo Irene M. Golinski, Plaintiff

Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Paul Nolan +1 212 661 0011 +1 212 953 6483 kpn@ny.speiserkrause.com
No Logo Julia P. Shontere, Plaintiff

Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Paul Nolan +1 212 661 0011 +1 212 953 6483 kpn@ny.speiserkrause.com
No Logo Shirley N. Willcher, Plaintiff

Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Represented by Speiser, Krause, Nolan & Granito

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Paul Nolan +1 212 661 0011 +1 212 953 6483 kpn@ny.speiserkrause.com
v.
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securicor PLC, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Air Lines, Inc. United Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Airlines"
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/10/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 9/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric)
    LREF
    Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Notice of Adoption to Flight 77 Fourth Amended MLC. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Crowley, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint (Document No. 1301 in 21MC97 (AKH)). Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wayland, Joseph)
        LREF
        Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Adoption by Defendant Airtran Airways, Inc.. Document filed by Airtran Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of service)(Coster, James)
          LREF
          Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Adoption of Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Flight 77 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint (21-MC-00097))(Barry, Desmond)
              LREF
              Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER that the captioned actions be removed from the damages-only trial calendar. The parties shall proceed to conclude the settlements promptly in accordance with the procedures heretofore established in this litigation and as required by the applicability to these actions of the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act, Pub. L. No. 107-42 115 Stat. 230 (2001)... and as further set forth in said order. This Document relates to 02-7150, 03-6966, 03-6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/1/07) (rjm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 104 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 103 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Motion for Administrative Order (this document relates to 03cv6966). ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied. The four plaintiffs shall promptly and no later than 9/28/2007, comply with my Order of 8/1/2006, by four separate filings of separate complaints, nunc pro tunc as of their original filing and service of process dates, in four separate actions, each with separately purchased index number. The Clerk shall close 03cv6966, effective 9/28/2007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/21/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 2:03-cv-06966-AKH(kkc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER REGARDING DAMAGES TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. This Document relates to 21MC97, 02-7912 (Driscoll), 03-6966 (Houtz), 02-7153 (Carstanjen), 03-6968 (Wiswe), 02-7150 (Ambrose), 02-456 (Marcin). That Driscoll case be Ready for Trial by 9/24/2007, Ambrose case be made ready for trial of damages only to begin on 10/15/07; that Plaintiffs identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/6/07; Plaintiffs provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/6/07; and Plaintiffs provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/10/07; further ordered that Defendants identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/24/07; Defts. provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/24/07; and Defts. provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 9/10/07; and it is further ordered that Ptffs. identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/17/07; Ptffs. provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/17/07; and Ptffs. provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/24/07; and it is further ordered that Defts. identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 9/7/07; Defts. provide a reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 9/24/07; that the parties submit proposed jury instructions for the Driscoll case by 9/17/07. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this order regarding damages trial and pre-trial proceedings. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/3/07) (rjm).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007, Terminated: 9/21/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        FIRST MOTION docket the Second Amended and Segregated Complaints of each of the Plaintiffs and assign each case with its' own case number. Document filed by Julia P. Shontere(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela M. Houtz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Angela M. Houtz), Shirley N. Willcher(individually), Shirley N. Willcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ernest M. Willcher, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Ernest M. Willcher), Christine K. Fisher(individually), Christine K. Fisher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerald P. Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Gerald P. Fisher), Irene M. Golinski(individually), Irene M. Golinski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald F. Golinski, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Ronald F. Golinski), Julia P. Shontere(individually). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - pages 1 - 10# (2) Exhibit A - pages 11 - 20# (3) Exhibit A - pages 21 - 29# (4) Exhibit B - pages 1 - 10# (5) Exhibit B - pages 11 - 20# (6) Exhibit B pages 21 - 29# (7) Exhibit C - pages 1 - 10# (8) Exhibit C - pages 11 - 19# (9) Exhibit C - pages 20 - 29# (10) Exhibit D - pages 1 - 10# (11) Exhibit D - pages 11 - 20# (12) Exhibit D - pages 21 - 29# (13) Exhibit E# (14) Exhibit F# (15) Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORDER)(Azrael, Jonathan)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 96 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 95 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC101. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government. Memorandum of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey in Support of Focused Discovery from the Government. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Jacob, Beth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                      DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 ~Motion to Sever
                                                CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(sn)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                    NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al. This Document also relates to 21MC101.(rjm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that deft. AirTran Airways, Inc. is dismissed w/out prejudice and w/out costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97) and in any other actions involving United Airlines Flight 175 departing from Logan Airport in Boston... 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-7153, 02-2802, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-7152, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365. Ptffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 6/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                        COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                          DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                            DECLARATION of Richard A Williamson in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES, formally known as MIDWEST EXPRESS AIRLINES, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the following individual action consolidated in the: In Re: September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 1. Feller v AMR Corporation, etal: 04 CV 09627... and as further set forth in said Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that Defts. UAL Corporation and United Airlines, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11th Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-8918, 04-7291, 03-7076, 02-8916, 02-7156, 02-7155, 03-6803, 03-7040, 02-3676, 03-7022, 03-7070, 02-7289, 03-7071, 02-7144... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Remark
                                                                        Plaintiff Shirley N. Willcher's First Segregated and Amended Flight 77 Pentagon Ground Victim Complaint. Document filed by Shirley N. Willcher(individually), Shirley N. Willcher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ernest M. Willcher, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Ernest M. Willcher). (jmi, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Remark
                                                                          Plaintiff Julia P. Shontere's First Segregated and Amended Flight 77 Pentagon Ground Victim Complaint. Document filed by Julia P. Shontere(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela M. Houtz, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Angela M. Houtz). (jmi, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Remark
                                                                            Plaintiff Christine K. Fisher's First Segregated and Amended Flight 77 Pentagon Ground Victim Complaint. Document filed by Christine K. Fisher(individually), Christine K. Fisher(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerald P. Fisher, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Gerald P. Fisher). (jmi, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Remark
                                                                              Plaintiff Irene M. Golinski's First Segregated and Amended Flight 77 Pentagon Ground Victim Complaint. Document filed by Irene M. Golinski(individually), Irene M. Golinski(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald F. Golinski, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors of Ronald F. Golinski). (jmi, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 90212 PARTIALLY GRANTING & PARTIALLY DENYING Defts' Motions re: [463] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, [460] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., [467] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc. This Document relates to 02-7272, 03-7019, 04-1857, 02-7143, 02-7244, 04-2519, denied. 02-7267, 03-6183, 03-6966, 03-6968, 03-7028, 03-7070, granted. The Original of this Document is entered as Document No. 549 under Case No. 21-mc-97. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/10/04) (rjm, ) Modified on 6/14/2004 (rjm,). (Entered: 06/10/2004). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/10/04) (rjm, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Keith S. Franz. Document filed by Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Julia P. Shontere. (sac, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (dfe, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                          NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Atlantic Coast Airlines. (dfe, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE of adoption of Master Answer to plaintiffs Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Northwest Airlines Inc.. (jp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS SECONDED AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines. (ps, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines. (ps, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines. (ps, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines. (ps, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (dfe, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (jp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF DEFENDANT US AIRWAYS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. Document filed by US Airways, Inc. (ae, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. plaintiffs dismiss, with prejudice, all claims asserted in this action against these individual defendants ONLY: L-3 Communications Corp.; L-3 Communications Holdings Inc; L-3 Communications Security and detection systems corporation; invision technologies, Inc.; Quantum Magnetics, Inc.; Smiths Heiman GmbH f/k/a Heimann Systems GmbH, a division of smiths aerospace of smiths group PLC and heimann Systems Corp. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. as to individual defendants further set forth in said order. Each of those defendants will be terminated from the docket accordingly. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/04) (db, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery. Document filed by Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski. (cd, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard A. Williamson dated 3/24/2004; counsel for the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and World Trade Center Properties LLC write to propose the following schedule: plaintiffs are to provide the documents requested by 4/23/2004. By 5/24/2004, defendants will decide whether defendants need to take any depositions before they are able to move to dismiss. If defendants need any depositions, defendants will first contact the plaintiffs' counsel whose case it is and ask whether plaintiffs consent. Defendants will then ask for a conference with Your Honor to determine whether defendants may take such deposition(s) before moving. If depositions are conducted, defendants will move to dismiss within 30 days of the last deposition. Opposing papers will be served within two weeks after the motion(s) to dismiss are served, and reply papers will be served within one week after the opposition papers are served. If defendants do not need any depositions, defendants will serve motion(s) to dismiss by 5/24/2004. Opposing papers will be served by 6/7/2004, and reply papers will be served by 6/14/2004. Counsel also request that plaintiff Madeleine Zuccala's action (the Fiedelberg action) be added to the cases listed in the 3/18/2004 Order which are subject to motions to dismiss at this time. So Ordered. This document relates to 03cv7018, 03cv6966, 03cv7051, 03cv7022, 03cv7019, 02cv7152, 02cv6362, 02cv7244, 03cv7134, 02cv7231, 03cv6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #328.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. as pertains to pltffs Valecia L. Parker, Kathy A. Cordero, and David Cordero. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) (jp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER; the parties appeared before me on 3/17/2004 to show cause why plaintiffs, who had claims pending in the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), as listed on Appendix A attached to my Order of 3/1/2004, should be granted more time to dismiss their cases... I hereby Order the following: A. Cases or plaintiffs listed immediately below shall be dismissed for the reasons as set forth in this Order: 02cv7031, 02cv7032, 02cv6363, 02cv7185, 02cv10054, 03cv194, 03cv195, 03cv5139, 03cv7043 as to plaintiffs Katja Tatjana Bothe and Costanze Menzel, 03cv7051 as to plaintiffs Steven Feidelberg, Kathleen Lozier, Meredith Anne Fry, Meg Glasser, Jay Michelstein, Helene Passaro, Midori Takahashi, Gregory Stevens, 03cv7064, 03cv6968 as to plaintiff Beth Ann Faragher, 03cv7022 as to plaintiffs Carol Waldie, Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster. B. The following cases or plaintiffs were incorrectly identified on Appendix A to my 3/1/2004 Order as having claims before the VCF; these cases may proceed in their normal course as active cases: 02cv1727, 02cv7145, 03cv6863. C. Plaintiffs listed immediately below had filed claims with the VCF but withdrew such claims in favor of litigation. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' counsel will propose a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss based on waiver by 3/24/2004, as as further set forth in this Order: 02cv6362, 02cv7231, 03cv6966, 03cv6968, 03cv7018, 03cv7019, 03cv7022. D. The following 3 cases concern individuals on whose behalf another family member has filed a claim with the VCF. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. The briefing schedule defendants' counsel submit on 3/24/2004 shall also apply to any motions based on waiver that defendants file concerning these cases: 02cv7152, 02cv7244, 03cv7134. E. Plaintiffs in the following cases are German insurance companies who allege subrogation claims for insureds who died in the September 11th attacks. Personal representatives for such insureds have filed claims in the VCF, raising an issue of whether the right to file suit has been waived. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit contentions and supporting documentation to defendants liaison counsel by 4/2/2004 as to their rights to sue. Defendants who then wish to bring a motion to dismiss shall describe any discovery they believe to be necessary, and a briefing schedule: 03cv7043, 04cv1382, 04cv1912. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #316.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                  CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [49] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $75.00, paid on 3/24/04, Receipt Number 501149. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., without prejudice as to JetBlue Airways Corp. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/04) (cd, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                                                                                                                      Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [49] Motion for Jonathan A. Azrael, Keith S. Franz and Judson H. Lipowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Securicor PLC served on 1/19/2004, answer due 2/9/2004. Service was accepted by Mr. B Davis, Legal Director. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Jonathan A. Azrael, keith S. Franz, and Judson H. Lipowitz of Azrael, Gann & Franz, L.L.P. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs. Document filed by Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher. Certificates of Good Standing are attached.(tp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Grupa Taca served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, c/o Secretary of State. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Grupa Taca. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, c/o Secretary of State. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Air Canada served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, c/o Secretary of State. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Air Canada. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Grupa Taca served on 1/30/2004, answer due 2/19/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Grupa Taca. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft served on 1/30/2004, answer due 2/19/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Deutsche Lufthansa Aktiengesellschaft. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Air Canada served on 1/30/2004, answer due 2/19/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Air Canada. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 inCase#21mc97,Plaintiff Valecia L. Parker, Individually hereby elects to dismiss the lawsuit. Document filed by Valecia L. Parker. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case#21mc97,Plaintiff Kathy A. Cordero, Individually and as spouse and David Cordero, as spouse hereby elect to dismiss the lawsuit. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case#21mc97,Plaintiff Christine K. Fisher, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gerald P. Fisher, Deceased and onbehalf of allsurvivors of Gerald P. Fisher, hereby elects to activate the lawsuit and proceed with the litigation. Document filed by Christine K. Fisher. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case #21mc97,Plaintiff Irene M. Golinski, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald F. Golinski, Deceased and on behalf of allsurvivors of Ronald F. Golinski, hereby elects to activate the lawsuit and proceed with the litigation. Document filed by Irene M. Golinski. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case #21mc97,Plaintiff Julia P. Shontere, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Angela M. Houtz, Deceased and on behalf of allsurvivors of Angela M. Houtz, hereby elects to activate the lawsuit and proceed with the litigation. Document filed by Julia P. Shontere. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case #21mc97, Plaintiff Shirley N. Willcher, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ernest M. Willcher, Deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Ernest M. Willcher, hereby elects to activate the lawsuit and proceed with the litigation. Document filed by Shirley N. Willcher. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Gregory Borgese. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; AMR Corporation. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Jonathatn E.Wilson. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Heimann Systems Corp.. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk in the office of the Secretary of State of NY. Document filed by David Cordero; Kathy A. Cordero; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; US Airways, Inc.. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Office of the Secretary of State of State of New York re: Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Airtran Airways, Inc.. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Office of the Secretary of State of State of New York re: Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, Clerk in the office of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. BWIA West Indies Airways Limited served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Austrian Airlines Oesterreichische Luftverkehrs-Aktiengesellshaft served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Airlines served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Societe Air France served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler/Secy State of NY. Document filed by Kathy Cordero. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Northwest Airlines Inc. served on 1/22/2004, answer due 2/11/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. Document filed by Kathy A. Cordero. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler in the Office of the Secretary of the State of New York. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Saudi Arabian Airlines Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler at the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; Saudi Arabian Airlines Corporation. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Aeroflot-Russian International Airlines served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Scandinavian Airlines of North America, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. British Midland Airways, Ltd. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Blake Hodge, process agent. Document filed by Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, Secy. of State. Document filed by Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Jonathan E. Wilson, Registered Agent. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. America West Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; America West Airlines, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Smiths Heimann GmbH served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Jonathan E. Wilson, Registered Agent. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. British Airways PLC served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher ; British Airways PLC. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by the Secretary of State, State of New York leaving with Norah Radler, Clerk. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Swiss International Air Lines Ltd. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. Document filed by David Cordero ; Kathy A. Cordero ; Christine K. Fisher ; Irene M. Golinski ; Valecia L. Parker ; Julia P. Shontere ; Shirley N. Willcher. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time. Plntfs' will have until 3/5/04 to serve process. . (Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Part I on 1/14/04) copies sent by chambers.(cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 1/21/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to serve process. Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.. All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 1/6/2004, answer due 3/8/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Argenbright Security, Inc.. Argenbright Security, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2003, answer due 2/20/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority waiver sent on 12/19/2003, answer due 2/17/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. KLM Royal Dutch Airlines waiver sent on 12/14/2003, answer due 2/12/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Invision Technologies, Inc.. Invision Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/19/2003, answer due 2/17/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, JetBlue Airways Corporation. JetBlue Airways Corporation waiver sent on 12/2/2003, answer due 2/2/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by David Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited. Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited waiver sent on 12/4/2003, answer due 2/2/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Kathy A. Cordero, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Valecia L. Parker, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Atlantic Coast Airlines. Atlantic Coast Airlines waiver sent on 12/16/2003, answer due 2/16/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Kenneth P. Nolan . (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 1:21-mc-97. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Theodore H.Katz is so designated. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case accepted as related to 1:21mc97. Notice of assignment to follow. (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; granting [2-1] motion to be placed on the suspense docket referred to in the Court's July 22, 2003 Order. Purs. to the Order issued 7/22/03 in In re 9/11 Litigation, 21 MC 97 (AKH), and applicable to this case, the pltff's motion to place this action on the suspense docket is granted. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Kathy A. Cordero, Kathy A. Cordero, David Cordero, Valecia L. Parker, Christine K. Fisher, Christine K. Fisher, Irene M. Golinski, Irene M. Golinski, Julia P. Shontere, Julia P. Shontere, Shirley N. Willcher, Shirley N. Willcher to be placed on the suspense docket referred to in the Court's July 22, 2003 Order . Return Date Not Indicated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484461. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly similar 1:21mc97. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?