Golinski v. AMR Corporation, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-08398-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Irene M. Golinski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com

Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

v.
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "AMR Corporation, Inc."
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securicor PLC., Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/27/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 3/19/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, RELATED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 07 CV 8398(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/08) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Desmond Barry to RE-FILE Document [12] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Party omission error. Each party associated with a filing must be selected as a filer in the Select Filer page. (jar)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Desmond Barry to RE-FILE Document [11] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. ERROR(S): Party omission error. Each party associated with a filing must be selected as a filer in the Select Filer page. (jar)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
      ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Desmond Barry to RE-FILE Document [10] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. ERROR(S): Party omission error. Each party associated with a filing must be selected as a filer in the Select Filer page. (jar)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [10] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. (Barry, Desmond) Modified on 3/17/2008 (jar).
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [10] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond) Modified on 3/17/2008 (jar).
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 ~Motion for Judgment
            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. (Barry, Desmond) Modified on 3/17/2008 (jar).
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Notice of Adoption to Flight 77 Fourth Amended MLC. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Crowley, Michael)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint (Document No. 1301 in 21MC97 (AKH)). Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wayland, Joseph)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint served on All Parties on 11/13/2007. Document filed by United Airlines Inc.. (Sexton, Brian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Adoption by Defendant Airtran Airways, Inc.. Document filed by Airtran Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of service)(Coster, James)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Adoption of Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint# (2) Affidavit of Service of Answer to Fourth Amended Master Liability Complaint)(Sexton, Brian)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Flight 77 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint (21-MC-00097))(Barry, Desmond)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                          Emailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Case Designation
                              Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (laq)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Case Accepted as Related
                                CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against The Boeing Company, Airtran Airways, Inc., Atlantic Coast Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Inc., Northwest Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Inc., AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Securicor PLC., Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 628231)Document filed by Irene M. Golinski.(jpo)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 21mc97. (jpo)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                      Case Designated ECF. (jpo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Boeing Company, Airtran Airways, Inc., Atlantic Coast Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Inc., Northwest Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Inc., AMR Corporation, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Securicor PLC., Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (jpo)
                                          LREF

                                          Space Space

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?