Tesla Inc. v. National Highway Traffic Safet
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 21-593

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 27, 2021 at 10:38 PM DT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary S. Guzy +1 202 662 5978 +1 202 778 5978 gguzy@cov.com
Space Joseph Mendelson +1 703 244 1724
v.
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
Buttigieg, Pete Buttigieg, Pete, Respondent
Officially listed as "Pete Buttigieg, In His Official Capacity As Secretary Of The United States Department Of Transportation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
No Logo Steven Cliff, Doctor, In His Official Capacity As The Deputy Administrator Of The National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
Nature of Suit
Case Type Agency
Lower Court Case
Lower Court Case
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208179948 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None ?
SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3064312] [21-593]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 00208177862 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None ?
    MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg, Steven Cliff and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, FILED. Service date 03/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3063543] [21-593]
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
      ATTORNEY, Courtney L. Dixon, [5], in place of attorney Benjamin Torrence, SUBSTITUTED.[3057570] [21-593]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208162227 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg, Steven Cliff and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by CM/ECF. [3057473] [21-593]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208161222 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
          PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [3057051] [21-593]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208161214 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
            AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3057046] [21-593]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 00208161194 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
              PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc., FILED. [3057038] [21-593]
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 31 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?