Tesla Inc. v. National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 21-593

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2021 at 10:31 PM DT (4.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary S. Guzy +1 202 662 5978 +1 202 778 5978 gguzy@cov.com
Space Joseph Mendelson +1 703 244 1724
v.
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
Buttigieg, Pete Buttigieg, Pete, Respondent
Officially listed as "Pete Buttigieg, In His Official Capacity As Secretary Of The United States Department Of Transportation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
No Logo Steven Cliff, Doctor, In His Official Capacity As The Deputy Administrator Of The National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Dixon courtney.l.dixon@usdoj.gov
Space Courtney Dixon +1 202 353 8189
Nature of Suit
Case Type Agency
Lower Court Case
Lower Court Case
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 00208440894 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None ?
REPLY TO OPPOSITION [3160094-2], [46], on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc. in 21-139, 21-593, FILED. Service date 08/27/2021 by CM/ECF.[3164229][51] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None ?
    ATTORNEY, Steven C. Wu [3163170-2], [3163174-2], in place of attorney Caroline Olsen, SUBSTITUTED.[3163608] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
      LREF
      Legal Document 00208429499 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None ?
      OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for___relief [38], on behalf of Intervenor Alliance for Automotive Innovation in 21-139, FILED. Service date 08/20/2021 by CM/ECF. [3159944] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208425852 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None ?
        NEW CASE MANAGER, Sarah Jean-Charles, ASSIGNED.[3158540] [21-593, 21-139, 21-339]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None ?
          ATTORNEY, Nicholas M. Vaz [40], in place of attorney Tricia K. Jedele, SUBSTITUTED.[3157970] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208422047 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None ?
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner State of Rhode Island in 21-139, 21-339, FILED. Service date 08/16/2021 by CM/ECF. [3157060] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 00208414157 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None ?
              MOTION, to lift abeyance, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc. in 21-139, 21-593, FILED. Service date 08/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3154031] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]--[Edited 08/13/2021 by HT]
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                ATTORNEY, Christopher H. Reitz [36], in place of attorney Emily C. Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[3140023] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208375096 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner State of Washington in 21-139, 21-339, FILED. Service date 07/15/2021 by CM/ECF. [3138990] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                    CURED DEFECTIVE Stay Status letter [3116806-2], on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration in 21-593, FILED.[3119950] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208315736 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [3115470-2], on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration in 21-139, FILED.[3116179] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208215339 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                        PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc., USCA receipt # B09-106879-407, FILED.[3077869] [21-593]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208210225 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                          FORM C/A, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc., FILED. Service date 04/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3075869] [21-593]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208210222 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc., FILED. Service date 04/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3075868] [21-593]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                              NOTE: See lead case, 21-139 (Lead), containing complete set of docket entries.[3072151] [21-339, 21-139, 21-593]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208200520 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                CAPTION, pursuant to FRAP43(c)(2), AMENDED.[3072150] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  LANA HURDLE, RESPONDENT, replaced by Pete Buttigieg, Respondent, SUBSTITUTED.[3072148] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208200490 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 04/06/2021, to Department of Transportation, ISSUED.[3072140] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208200484 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      ORDER, granting cross-motion to hold the petition in abeyance, by GC, BDP, SJM, FILED.[3072138] [21-139, 21-339, 21-593]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208200478 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208200133 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [8] filed by Respondent National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Pete Buttigieg and Steven Cliff, by GC, BDP, SJM, FILED. [3072001][19] [21-593]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208197464 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            ORDER, dated 04/06/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/20/2021, unless Petitioner Tesla Inc, submits form C/A, FILED.[3070959] [21-593]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208197445 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              ORDER, dated 04/06/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/20/2021, unless Petitioner Tesla Inc, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[3070953] [21-593]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208197427 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                ORDER, dated 04/06/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/20/2021, unless Petitioner Tesla Inc submits, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[3070945] [21-593]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208179948 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3064312] [21-593]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 00208177862 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg, Steven Cliff and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, FILED. Service date 03/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3063543] [21-593]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                      ATTORNEY, Courtney L. Dixon, [5], in place of attorney Benjamin Torrence, SUBSTITUTED.[3057570] [21-593]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208162227 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Pete Buttigieg, Steven Cliff and National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by CM/ECF. [3057473] [21-593]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208161222 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                          PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [3057051] [21-593]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208161214 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                            AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3057046] [21-593]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 00208161194 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                              PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Tesla Inc., FILED. [3057038] [21-593]
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?