NICOLETTE v. TESLA ENERGY OPERATIONS, INC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:21-cv-02186

Tags
Last Updated June 11, 2021 at 2:06 PM DT (6 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK ROBERT NICOLETTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Wiener and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Francis Brennan +1 818 249 5291 +1 818 249 4329 rbrennan@brennanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services LLC, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Office Oakland
Filed 3/29/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Proposed Summons
                  Proposed Summons. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Proposed Summons
                    Proposed Summons. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                      Civil Cover Sheet by JACK ROBERT NICOLETTE . (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15765481.). Filed byJACK ROBERT NICOLETTE. (Brennan, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                          Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev.10/20. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:[2] Civil Cover Sheet filed by JACK ROBERT NICOLETTE (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?