Kyne et al v. Wolfowitz et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02041-RJS-JCF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:36 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amber Tejada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo Charles Duncan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo DANIEL GROSS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo Dennis Kyne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo Dustin Langley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo John Francis Mulligan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo Julien Boisvert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
No Logo Stephane Lahoud, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oliver & Oliver (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gideon Orion Oliver +1 646 602 9242 +1 646 602 9242 gideon@oliverandoliverlaw.com
Space Lewis B. Oliver, Jr. +1 646 602 9242
v.
No Logo Assistant Chief Bruce H. Smolka, Defendant
No Logo Assistant Chief Terence Monahan, Defendant
No Logo Bruce H. Smolka, Defendant
No Logo Captain Eugene Montchal, Defendant
No Logo Captain John Scolaro, Defendant
No Logo Captain Ronald Mercandetti, Defendant
No Logo Charles DeRienzo, Defendant
No Logo Commander Thomas Graham, Defendant
No Logo Connie Fishman, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Albano, Defendant
No Logo David Cohen, Defendant
No Logo Detective Christopher Ambrose, Defendant
No Logo Director Robert Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Edward Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Montchal, Defendant
No Logo Executive Officer John J. Colgan, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Hudecek, Defendant
No Logo HRPT Prersident Connie Fishman, Defendant
No Logo HRPT President Connie Fishman, Defendant
No Logo James Capaldo, Defendant
No Logo JAMES O'NEILL, Defendant
No Logo James Roscher, Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 Through 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "John and Jane Does"
No Logo John J. Colgan, Defendant
No Logo John Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Sweet, Defendant
No Logo LT. Daniel Albano, Defendant
No Logo Martin Horn, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Wohl, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "NYC Mayor Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael Deckert, Defendant
No Logo Michael Holmes, Defendant
No Logo NYCDOC Commissioner Martin Horn, Defendant
No Logo NYCDOC Warden Jorge Ocasio, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Bicycle Sgt. Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant"), Defendant
No Logo NYPD Chief of Dept. Joseph Esposito, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Deputy Insp. Kerry Sweet, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Lieutenant Joe Maher, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Lieutenant Raymond Spinella, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer John Martinez, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officier John Martinez, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Sergeant Edward Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Officer Michael Deckert, Defendant
No Logo Paul Wolfowitz, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Richard and Mary Roe, Defendant
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Roland Betts, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Mercandetti, Defendant
No Logo Ruby Marin-Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Stephen G. Hughes, Defendant
No Logo Stephen L Hammerman, Defendant
No Logo Task Force Officer Matthew Wohl, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York ("NYC")"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Space Jeffrey Anthony Dougherty +1 212 788 8342 +1 212 788 9776 jdougher@law.nyc.gov
Space James Mirro +1 212 788 8026 +1 212 788 9776 jmirro@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT"), Defendant
No Logo The New York City Department of Corrections ("NYCDOC"), Defendant
No Logo The New York City Host Committee 2004, Defendant
No Logo The New York City Police Department ("NYPD"), Defendant
No Logo The Republican National Committee, Defendant
No Logo The Republican National Convention Host Committee ("RNCHC"), Defendant
No Logo The Republican National Host Committee, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Doepfner, Defendant
No Logo Thomas, Graham, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Ridge, Defendant
No Logo Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/15/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-09216-RJS-JCF
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, ECF, RELATED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(ii), all plaintiffs and defendant City of New York stipulate to the dismissal with prejudice, without costs, of all claims and causes of action as to defendant Roland Betts. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/20/08) (cd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Anthony Dougherty on behalf of The City of New York ("NYC") (Dougherty, Jeffrey)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Telephone Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Telephone Conference and Discovery held on 10/9/2007 at 11:00 am. (jmi)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (fk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas' White Plains Docket. (fk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Amended Complaint
            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [16] Amended Complaint, against The New York City Host Committee 2004, Thomas Doepfner, Thomas Doepfner, Kerry Sweet, Kerry Sweet, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Ruby Marin-Jordan, James Capaldo, James Capaldo, Eugene Montchal, Eugene Montchal, John and Jane Does, Richard and Mary Roe, The City of New York ("NYC"), The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT"), The Republican National Committee, Thomas Ridge, Stephen G. Hughes, Robert Mueller(of the Federal Bureau of Investigation), David Cohen(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters), David Cohen(individually), James O'Neill(NYPD Deupty Inspector), James O'Neill(individually), Michael Holmes(NYPD Sergeant), Connie Fishman(individually, jointly and severally), Michael Holmes(individually), Glenn Hudecek(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx Courth Task Force Officer Shield No. 18059), Glenn Hudecek(individually), Michael Deckert(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force Officer, Shield No. 27304), Michael Deckert(individually), Thomas Ridge(individually), Stephen G. Hughes(individually), Robert Mueller(individually), Connie Fishman(in her official capacity, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, individually, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(individually, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(individually, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, Individually, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, individually, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit,Shield No. 1502, individually, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, individually, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, individually, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, in his offcial capacity, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally).Document filed by Daniel Gross, John Francis Mulligan, Amber Tejada, Julien Boisvert, Stephane Lahoud, Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley, Charles Duncan. Related document: [16] Amended Complaint, filed by Daniel Gross, Charles Duncan, Dustin Langley, Amber Tejada, Stephane Lahoud, Dennis Kyne, Julien Boisvert, John Francis Mulligan. (jco)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Telephone Conference
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2007. (Discovery) (jar)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that the action be, and the same hereby is, dismissed with prejudice and without costs against all remaining defendants... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/29/09) (cd) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Thomas Ridge served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Stephen G. Hughes served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Robert Mueller(of the Federal Bureau of Investigation) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Thomas Ridge(individually) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Stephen G. Hughes(individually) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Robert Mueller(individually) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Daniel Gross; John Francis Mulligan; Amber Tejada; Julien Boisvert; Stephane Lahoud; Dennis Kyne; Dustin Langley; Charles Duncan. (Oliver, Gideon)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Thomas Ridge served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Robert Mueller(of the Federal Bureau of Investigation) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Thomas Ridge(individually) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Robert Mueller(individually) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007; Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 8/21/2007, answer due 9/10/2007. Service was accepted by VARIOUS. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Daniel Gross; John Francis Mulligan; Amber Tejada; Julien Boisvert; Stephane Lahoud; Dennis Kyne; Dustin Langley; Charles Duncan. (Oliver, Gideon) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Letter
                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Gideon Orion Oliver dated 7/27/07 re: counsel for plaintiffs oppose defendants application for a protective order. Document filed by Daniel Gross, John Francis Mulligan, Amber Tejada, Julien Boisvert, Stephane Lahoud, Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley, Charles Duncan. Original filed in 04cv7922 (KMK)(JCF), document # 250.(db)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Daniel Gross, John Francis Mulligan, Amber Tejada, Julien Boisvert, Stephane Lahoud, Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley, Charles Duncan. (Oliver, Gideon) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/2007 at 12:00 p.m. (db)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE: As to the City Defendants, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, expenses or fees except as provided in paragraph "2" herein. The City of New York hereby agrees to pay each Plaintiff in this action Twenty Five Thousand Dollars, ($25,000.00), for a total of two hundred thousand dollars, to be allocated amongst Plaintiffs and their lawyers in accordance with their own agreement, in full satisfaction of their claims, including claims for costs, expenses, attorney's fees and interest. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/5/09) (tro) Modified on 3/3/2009 (tro). (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Amended Complaint
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, against The Republican National Committee, The Republican National Host Committee, Thomas Ridge, Stephen G. Hughes, Robert Mueller, David Cohen, David Cohen, James O'Neill, James O'Neill, Michael Holmes, Michael Holmes, Glenn Hudecek, Glenn Hudecek, Michael Deckert, Michael Deckert, Thomas Ridge, Stephen G. Hughes, Robert Mueller, The City of New York ("NYC"), The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT"), Connie Fishman(individually, jointly and severally), Connie Fishman(in her official capacity, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, individually, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(individually, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(individually, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman (NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, Individually, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman (NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka (NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka (NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, individually, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan (NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan (NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti (NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano (NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano (NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, individually, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy (Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl (NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, individually, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl (NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Martinez (112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, individually, jointly and severally), John Martinez (112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(individually, jointly and severally), Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(in their official capacities, jointly and severally), Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(including One Such "Mary Roe" individual, individually and in their official capacities, jointly and severally, Paul Wolfowitz (Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz (Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally). Document filed by Daniel Gross, John Francis Mulligan, Amber Tejada, Julien Boisvert, Stephane Lahoud, Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley, Charles Duncan. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by Charles Duncan, Dustin Langley, Dennis Kyne.(jco)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Curt P. Beck dated 9/30/08 re: Defendants writes to respectfully request additional time for the parties to complete the non-party depositions in the two RNC cases herein. With the consent of plaintiffs' counsel, defendants request that Your Honor extend the time for the parties to conclude the depositions of non-parties to and including 11/17/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further extensions. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/1/08) (tro) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: Counsel in the consolidated RNC cases having failed to cooperate in the scheduling of depositions as anticipated by Discovery Order #2, it is hereby ordered as follows: The defense witnesses scheduled to be deposed on dates on or after June 19, 2007 as set forth in the letters of Jeffrey A. Rothman dated May 14, 2007, Michael L. Spiegel dated May 23, 2007, and Jonathan Moore and Clare Norins dated June 7, 2007 shall appear on the dates indicated in those letters. Counsel shall have until June 29, 2007 to agree on specific deposition dates for any other defense witnesses identified by then and for all plaintiffs. the agreed upon dates shall not extend beyond November 16, 2007. After June 29, 2007, no additional fact witnesses shall be noticed for deposition absent: (a) agreement of the parties or (b) a showing that the witness could not reasonably have been identified prior to that date. On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall provide a letter to the Court listing all dates agreed upon pursuant to paragraph 2 of this order, which letters shall be "So Ordered." On July 2, 2007, counsel for each party noticing depositions shall also provide a separate letter identifying all witnesses for whom no date has been agreed upon. i will then schedule all such depositions. That schedule shall, by necessity, be arbitrary and inflexible. Following the pretrial conference scheduled for June 29, 2007, counsel may utilize my Courtroom to discuss the master deposition schedule among themselves. This order applies to all RNC cases consolidated for discovery. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 6/15/07) (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Pretrial Conference held on 4/27/2007. (jco)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/16/2007. (djc)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Peter G. Farrell dated 1/10/07 re: Attorney for defendants request an order that the documents shall be subject to attorneys eyes only designation and shall be used in the litigation of the RNC cases consolidated before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 1/12/07) (js) (Entered: 01/16/2007)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-7922-KMK-JCF et al.(rag)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 LetterCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Francis from Gideon Oliver dated 10/11/06: re all documents covered by the Stipulation & Order of Confidentiality et al. Document filed by Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley et al.(cd, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                          DISCOVERY ORDER #2: It is hereby ordered as follows: counsel for any party seeking to take a deposition may serve a notice on counsel for the party to be deposed at any time in advance of the deadline for doing so as set forth in the case management order governing each individual action. All other rulings as set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 11/13/2006) Copies Mailed By Chambers (lb, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/20/2006) (lb, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The New York City Police Department ("NYPD") served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; The New York City Department of Corrections ("NYCDOC") served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT") served on 6/2/2006, answer due 6/22/2006; Connie Fishman(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/2/2006, answer due 6/22/2006; Connie Fishman(in her official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/2/2006, answer due 6/22/2006; The Republican National Convention Host Committee ("RNCHC") served on 6/28/2006, answer due 7/18/2006; Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/28/2006, answer due 7/18/2006; Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/28/2006, answer due 7/18/2006; Michael Bloomberg(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Michael Bloomberg(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Martin Horn(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Martin Horn(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Jorge Ocasio(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Jorge Ocasio(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Raymond Kelly(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Raymond Kelly(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Joseph Esposito(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Joseph Esposito(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/8/2006, answer due 6/28/2006; Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/8/2006, answer due 6/28/2006; Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Conrol Unit, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; John Scolaro(78th Precinct, individually, jointly and severally) served on 5/31/2006, answer due 6/20/2006; John Scolaro(78th Precinct, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 5/31/2006, answer due 6/20/2006; Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/2/2006, answer due 6/22/2006; Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/2/2006, answer due 6/22/2006; Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Raymond Spinella(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/8/2006, answer due 6/28/2006; Raymond Spinella(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/8/2006, answer due 6/28/2006; Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit,Shield No. 1502, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, in his official capacity, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, individually, jointly and severally) served on 5/31/2006, answer due 6/20/2006; John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, in his offcial capacity, jointly and severally) served on 5/31/2006, answer due 6/20/2006; James Roscher served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(in their official capacities, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(including One Such "Mary Roe" Unidentifed Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent Wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), individually, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006; Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(including One Such "Mary Roe" unidentified Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), in their official capacities, jointly and severally) served on 6/1/2006, answer due 6/21/2006. Service was accepted by VARIOUS PEOPLE. Document filed by Dennis Kyne; Dustin Langley; Charles Duncan. (Oliver, Gideon)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Pretrial Conference held on 7/10/2006 at 11:00 am. (jmi, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV from James Mirro dated 4/26/06 re: Application GRANTED. The attached Discovery Order # 1 and Protective Order # 1 are to be entered in the cases listed on pages 2 and 3 of said Order. Original filed in 04cv7922, document # 59. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/27/06) (db, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of The City of New York ("NYC") (Beck, Curt)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge James C. Francis from James Mirro dated 4/3/06 re: a request for an enlargement of defendant's time to answer by 60 days. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 4/4/06) (kco, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Mirro on behalf of The City of New York ("NYC") (Mirro, James)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER; this case is consolidated with 04cv7922 for discovery purposes as realted to the protest activity and arrests during the 2004 Republican National Convention and is referred to Mag. Judge Francis for discovery. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/28/06) (kco, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes schedualing, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/28/06) (js, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                                                              Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Case Designation
                                                                  Magistrate Judge James C. Francis is so designated. (laq, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                    CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 1:04-cv-9216. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against The City of New York ("NYC"), The New York City Police Department ("NYPD"), The New York City Department of Corrections ("NYCDOC"), The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT"), Connie Fishman(individually, jointly and severally), Connie Fishman(in her official capacity, jointly and severally), The Republican National Convention Host Committee ("RNCHC"), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, individually, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(individually, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(individually, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Jorge Ocasio(individually, jointly and severally), Jorge Ocasio(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Joseph Esposito(individually, jointly and severally), Joseph Esposito(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, Individually, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, individually, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Conrol Unit, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, individually, jointly and severally), Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, individually, jointly and severally), Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Scolaro(78th Precinct, individually, jointly and severally), John Scolaro(78th Precinct, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Spinella(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Spinella(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Joe Maher(individually, jointly and severally), Joe Maher(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit,Shield No. 1502, individually, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(individually, jointly and severally), Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, individually, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, individually, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, in his offcial capacity, jointly and severally), James Roscher, Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(individually, jointly and severally), Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(in their official capacities, jointly and severally), Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(including One Such "Mary Roe" Unidentifed Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent Wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), individually, jointly and severally), Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(includingOne such "Mary Roe" unidentified Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), in their official capacities, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally). (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 573082)Document filed by Dennis Kyne, Dustin Langley, Charles Duncan.(jbe, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2006 (mbe, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                        CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 04-9216 (KMK). (jbe, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                          Case Designated ECF. (jbe, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City of New York ("NYC"), The New York City Police Department ("NYPD"), The New York City Department of Corrections ("NYCDOC"), The Hudson River Park Trust ("HRPT"), Connie Fishman(individually, jointly and severally), Connie Fishman(in her official capacity, jointly and severally), The Republican National Convention Host Committee ("RNCHC"), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, individually, jointly and severally), Roland Betts(Co-Vice Chair of the RNCHC, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(individually, jointly and severally), Michael Bloomberg(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(individually, jointly and severally), Martin Horn(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Jorge Ocasio(individually, jointly and severally), Jorge Ocasio(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Kelly(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Joseph Esposito(individually, jointly and severally), Joseph Esposito(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, Individually, jointly and severally), Stephen L Hammerman(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Legal Matters, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Bruce H. Smolka(NYPD Manhattan South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Control Unit, individually, jointly and severally), Thomas Graham(NYPD Disorder Conrol Unit, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, individually, jointly and severally), Terence Monahan(NYPD Bronx Borough Command, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), John J. Colgan(NYPD Counter-Terrorism Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, individually, jointly and severally), Charles DeRienzo(NYPD Deputy Commissioner of Administration, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, individually, jointly and severally), Ronald Mercandetti(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South Task Force, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Scolaro(78th Precinct, individually, jointly and severally), John Scolaro(78th Precinct, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Christopher Ambrose(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, individually, jointly and severally), Daniel Albano(NYPD Legal Bureau, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Raymond Spinella(individually, jointly and severally), Raymond Spinella(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Joe Maher(individually, jointly and severally), Joe Maher(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit,Shield No. 1502, individually, jointly and severally), Edward Murphy(Patrol Boro Bronx Anti-Crime Unit, Shield No. 1502, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(individually, jointly and severally), Male First Name and Last Name Unknown ("Unidentified Bicycle Sergeant")(in his official capacity, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, individually, jointly and severally), Matthew Wohl(NYPD Patrol Boro Bronx South, Shield No. 6956, in his official capacity, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, individually, jointly and severally), John Martinez(112th Precinct, Shield No. 23496, in his offcial capacity, jointly and severally), James Roscher, Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(individually, jointly and severally), Unidentified NYPD Supervisors and Officers John and Jane Does(in their official capacities, jointly and severally), Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(including One Such "Mary Roe" Unidentifed Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent Wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), individually, jointly and severally), Unidentified Richard and Mary Roe Federal, State, and/or City Law Enforcement Agents(includingOne such "Mary Roe" unidentified Federal, State, or City Law Enforcement Agent wearing a light-blue T-shirt ("Blue"), in their official capacities, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, individually, jointly and severally), Paul Wolfowitz(Secretary of the Department of Defense of the United States of America, in his official capacity, jointly and severally). (jbe, )
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?