USA v. Peltz
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00154-NGG

Tags
Last Updated April 1, 2021 at 3:28 PM DT (5.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaitlin Teresa Farrell +1 718 254 6072 +1 718 254 6076 kaitlin.farrell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jason Peltz (1), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Hugh Temkin +1 212 880 9470 +1 212 856 9494 jtemkin@magislaw.com
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 motion to modify conditions of release
Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Jason Peltz. (Temkin, Jeremy)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Scheduling Order
    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jason Peltz. An Arraignment will be held by video on 4/12/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. The parties will be provided with a video link separately. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/30/2021. (Proujansky, Josh)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Notice of Related Case
      Notice of Related Case pursuant to Local Rule 50.4 (Farrell, Kaitlin)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 indictment
        INDICTMENT as to Jason Peltz (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6-8, 9, 10. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Marziliano, August)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jason Peltz Time excluded from 2/17/2021 until 3/19/2021.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/18/2021. (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 1/3/2021 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jason Peltz Time excluded from 1/4/21 until 2/4/21. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/29/20. (Chin, Felix)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Redacted Document
              REDACTED $100,000 BOND as to Jason Peltz to [6] Order Setting Conditions of Release (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 1 - Sealed Document CRCourt Filing
                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jason Peltz (1) $100,000 bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/21/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeremy Hugh Temkin appearing for Jason Peltz (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Redacted Document
                    REDACTION by USA as to Jason Peltz to [1] Complaint (Sealed) (Chin, Felix)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Order to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                      Order to Unseal Case as to Jason Peltz. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/21/2020. (Chin, Felix)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  arraignment
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon VIA WEBEX video and audio:Arraignment as to Jason Peltz on the Complaint held on 12/21/2020, Initial Appearance as to Jason Peltz held on 12/21/2020.(FTR Log #3;46-4;15pm.) AUSA Kaitlan Farrell and Sarah Evans. Defendant present w/ retain counsel Jeremy Temkin. Clerk SM Yuen. Bond on consent set in the amount of $100,000 with conditions. Defendant and 1 suretor advised of bond obligations and gave permission for the Court to sign bond on their behalf. Defendant released. Preliminary hearing set 1/4/2021 at 2:30pm before Judge Scanlon. Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f)was stated on the record. (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:20-mj-01238-LB]
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 74 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?