M.M. v. Department of Education of the City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-08640-DLC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo m, m, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Education of the City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
Space Jesse Ira Levine +1 212 442 3329 +1 212 788 0300 jlevine@law.nyc.gov
No Logo AB, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo #AC, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo AD, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Al, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo BC-, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo C.p. 38 Succursale D, Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "C.P."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo DA 5, ASHLAND CHEMICAL Company, Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "D.A."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo DC 37 Municiple Employee Legal Svcs Plan, Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "D.C."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo D.O., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Dr., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo EF, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo H D, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo HM, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Ho, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo I.O., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo J.B., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo J.c, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo JD, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Jr., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo K, + K., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo K, & P., Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "K.P."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo L.D., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Ma, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo M.E., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo m, m, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Mp 65, S.a., Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "M.P."

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo M, R, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo N.K., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo P.B., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo P.C., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo S.S., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Ts, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo V.K., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo V.L., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Vo, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
No Logo Ye, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayerson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY S. MAYERSON +1 212 265 7200 +1 212 265 1735 mauricio@mayerslaw.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/5/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $25000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 20 U.S.C. § 1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-08640-DLC None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, ECF, LEAD
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jesse I. Levine dated 6/11/08 re: Counsel writes to request that the briefing schedule submission endorsed by the Court on 6/24/08 be adjusted by an increment of two weeks. Pursuant to the current schedule there is to be a telephonic conference with Magistrate Judge Maas on 9/3/08 with respect to the progress on settlement. If there is no settlement defendant is to submit its motion with respect to common issues on 9/8/08. Counsel requests that the telephonic conference with Judge Maas be adjourned until the week of 9/15/08, and that defendant's time to file its motion on common issues be adjusted to 9/22/08 with the remainder of the briefing scheduled adjusted accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: Motion is due Sept. 22. There shall be no further adjournment. Opposition is due October 10; reply is due October 17. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(tro)
    LREF
    Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jesse I. Levine dated 9/2/2008 re: I am writing to request an adjournment of the telephonic settlement conference in the above captioned and related cases which is currently scheduled for September 3, 2008 at 4 :00 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 9/16/2008 at 4 p.m. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 9/2/2008) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(jpo)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      PROPOSAL FOR SUBMISSION DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION: Therefore on mutual consent of the parties, it is proposed that defendant's be submitted on or before September 8, 2008, plaintiff's opposition shall be submitted on or before September 22, 2008, and defendant's reply papers, if any, be submitted on or before September 25, 2008. ENDORSED: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/24/2008) (jfe)
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Proposal for Revised Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Department of Education of the City of New York. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(Levine, Jesse)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Note Regarding Deleted Document
          ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [18] Memo Endorsement. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jesse L. Levine dated 6/16/08 re: Counsel writes to apologize to the court for not filing his motion on or before May 30, 2008, and asks that the court not impose any sanction, and to permit the settlement process to go forward. ENDORSEMENT: The parties must submit a proposal for revised dates for the submissions on defendants motion on common issues by July 24, 2008. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/17/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(mme)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER: Pursuant to a conference held earlier today, it is hereby ordered that a further telephone conference shall be held on September 3, 2008, at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call by dialing Chambers at (212)805-6727. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 6/12/08) (js)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse Ira Levine on behalf of New York City Department of Education, New York City Department of Education, New York Department of Education, New York City Department of Education Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(Levine, Jesse)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jesse I. Levine dated 6/11/08 re: Defendant request that the return date of the Order to Show Cause be adjourned until Tuesday, June 17, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. In the future, any application should indicate whether it is made with Consent. The June 17 submission must address why no submission was made on May 30, and why no request for an extension was made well in advance of May 30. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/11/08) (pl)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                    ORDER filed by M.M.. Department of Education of the City of New York shall show cause as to why the plaintiffs' applications in the related actions should not be granted in full. Defendant should make its submission in writing, by letter no longer than two pages. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2008 at 12:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/10/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(mme)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, That the above captioned actions are consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. They shall be referred to collectively as In re Attorneys' Fees Consolidated Cases, Master File No. 07 Civ. 8640 (DLC).It is further ordered that when a pleading is intended to be applicable to all actions to which this order applies, the words "All Actions" shall appear immediately after the words "This Document Relates To;" in the caption. When a pleading is intended to apply to fewer than all of such actions, the docket number for each individual action to which it is intended to apply and the same plaintiff in said action shall appear immediately after the words "This Document Relates To;" in the caption. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/10/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-08640-DLC et al.(mme)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas from Jesse I. Levine dated 5/22/08 re: Counsel request an adjournment of the settlement conference in the above captioned case and related cases which is currently scheduled for 5/29/08 at 4:00pm. ENDORSEMENT: The settlement conference is adjourned to 6/12/08 at 4pm. ( Settlement Conference set for 6/12/2008 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 5/22/08) (tro)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: By Order dated April 18, 2008, the parties were to provide the Court, by April 25, with a letter outlining the universe of cases, the common issues of which the parties request this Court to resolve. The parties having failed to do so, it is hereby ORDERED that all such actions filed by June 27, 2008, the date defendant's motion shall be fully submitted, shall be automatically consolidated for pretrial purposes and for resolution of the common issues. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall promptly provide notice to this Court of the filing of any such actions so that they may be transferred to this Court's docket. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/7/08) (rw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                            ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/10/08) (js)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the parties contact Magistrate Judge Maas no later than Tomorrow, April 11, to arrange settlement discussions. The defendant shall provide its reply to plaintiffs plaintiffs' demands no later than May 2. It is further ordered that the parties shall provide the Court, by April 25, with a letter outlining the Universe of cases, the common issues of which the parties request this Court to resolve. It is further ordered that defendant's motion on the common issues among no more than five of the related actions shall be due no later than May 30, 2008. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be due June 20; defendant's reply shall be due June 27. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/10/08) (js)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Gary S. Mayerson dated 3/14/08 re: Request for an adjournment of the scheduled 3/21/08 initial conference. ENDORSEMENT: Conference is adjourned to 4/10/08 at 9:00 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 4/10/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/17/08) (db)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If such a consent order is not filed within the time provided. Initial Conference set for 3/21/2008 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 11B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/6/2008) (jmi)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Department of Education of the City of New York.(Conway, Kimberly)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Department of Education of the City of New York served on 10/9/2007, answer due 10/29/2007. Service was accepted by Tamekia Mendes Gammon, Clerk. Document filed by M.M.. (Mayerson, Gary)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against Department of Education of the City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 628828)Document filed by M.M.(jeh)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Case Designation
                                          Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (jeh)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                            Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Education of the City of New York. (jeh)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?