District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Rudwall v. Blackrock, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 06-17372

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 5, 2021 at 9:14 PM DT (1.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blackrock, Inc., Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Goodman +1 310 556 8861
Space J. Susan Graham +1 310 556 8861
No Logo Thomas H. Rudwall, Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy G. Chen +1 415 433 4949
Space Karl Olson +1 415 409 8900 +1 415 409 8904 kolson@cofalaw.com
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CV-06-02992-MHP
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=CV-06-02992-MHP
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009013988695 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None ?
MANDATE ISSUED.(EES, MMM and CMC) (GV)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 009013381810 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None ?
    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (EUGENE E. SILER, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. (DD)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None ?
      SUBMITTED ON THE BRIEFS TO EUGENE E. SILER, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN (RY)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None ?
        Filed Appellee Blackrock, Inc. opposition to appellants additional citations filed on 08/04/08. Served on 08/07/2008. (faxed to panel) (RL)
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None ?
          Filed Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall additional citations. Served on 08/04/2008. (panel) (EL)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009012047451 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None ?
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None ?
              Filed Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall motion for brief continuance of oral argument. Served on 06/27/2008. (faxed to panel) (EL)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009011501944 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None ?
                Hearing Notice for AUGUST Calendar on 8/14/2008. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Attention: The Notice of Docket Activity may not list your case number. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [06-17327, 06-17372, 06-17397, 06-17080, 06-17302, 07-15038] (AM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None ?
                  CALENDARED: 08/14/2008 9:00 AM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 (AM)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None ?
                    Calendar materials being prepared. (AM)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None ?
                      Calendar check performed. (MW)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None ?
                        Rec'd notice of change of address from attorneys Jenny Susan Graham, James A. Goodman for Appellee Blackrock, Inc., dated 12/19/07: EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN PC, 1925 Century Park East, 5th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067, telephone (310) 556-8861, fax: 310-553-2165. (CASEFILE) [06-17372] (RT)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None ?
                          Filed original and 15 copies Thomas H. Rudwall reply brief, (Informal: no ) 22 pages; served on 5/25/07 [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None ?
                            14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall's reply brief. [06-17372] appellants' reply brief due 5/31/07; (XX)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None ?
                              Filed original and 15 copies appellee Blackrock, Inc.'s 29 pages brief, 1 Exc. vols: ; served on 4/30/07 [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None ?
                                Received Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall satisfaction of (minor) brief deficiency. Rcvd stmt of related cases. (CASEFILE) [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None ?
                                  Filed original and 15 copies Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall's opening brief ( Informal: no ) 32 pages; 5 excerpts of record ( 1 Exc.vol );served on 4/11/07 ( minor defcy: no stmt of rel cases) Notified counsel. [06-17372] (CW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None ?
                                    Received Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall's satisfaction of (major) brief deficiency (replacement opn br) [06-17372] (CW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None ?
                                      Received Appellant Thomas H. Rudwall's brief in 15 copies 32 pages ( Informal: no) deficient footnotes too small: notified counsel. Excerpts of record in 1 volumes. Served on 3/30/07 [06-17372] respnse to brief deficiency notice due 4/13/07; (Walker, Synitha)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None ?
                                        Filed certificate of record on appeal RT filed in DC 2/1/07 [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None ?
                                          Filed order CONFATT (CLB) The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Progam. All further inquiries regarding this appeal including request for ext. of time should be directed to the Clerks office. Csl are requested to contact the undersigned should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None ?
                                            Filed order CONFATT (bls) This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. A settlement assessment conference will be held by telephone on February 13, 2007, at 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC (SF) Time. THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE PREVIOUSLY SET BY THE COURT REMAINS IN EFFECT. [06-17372] (HC)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None ?
                                              Rec'd notice of appearance of Karl Olson and Amy Chen (Withdrew as counsel: attorney Charles O. Morgan for Thomas H. Rudwall) CASEFILE) [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None ?
                                                Filed attorney for Appellant Civil Appeals Docketing Statement served on 12/20/06 (to CONFATT) [06-17372] [06-17372] (Walker, Synitha)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None ?
                                                  recd notice of substitution of counsel from Charles O. Morgan. Notices does not provide court with addresses of new counsel. Advised atty by phone to resubmit substitution. [06-17372] (GR)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None ?
                                                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. CADS SENT (Y/N): y. setting schedule as follows: CADS is past due; CADS must be filed no later than 1/2/07; appellant's designation of RT is due 12/26/06; appellee's designation of RT is due 1/3/07; appellant shall order transcript by 1/16/07; court reporter shall file transcript in DC by 2/13/07; certificate of record shall be filed by 2/20/07 ; appellant's opening brief is due 4/2/07; appellees' brief is due 5/1/07; appellants' reply brief is due 5/15/07; [06-17372] (GR)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?