KPM Analytics North America Corporation v. Blue Sun Scientific, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:21-cv-10572

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2021 at 4:47 PM DT (4.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Expedite
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?