Djemil et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:21-cv-05251-JCC
District Judge John C. Coughenour, presiding

Tags
Last Updated Today at 5:34 PM (4.4 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fatiha Djemil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 16

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Harlan Slavik +1 970 457 1011 dslavik@slavik.us
No Logo Hacene Djemil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 16

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Harlan Slavik +1 970 457 1011 dslavik@slavik.us
No Logo Rania Djemil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 16

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Harlan Slavik +1 970 457 1011 dslavik@slavik.us
v.
No Logo Does 1 through 50, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office Tacoma
Filed 4/7/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 355 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside District
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag JURYDEMAND
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None JCC-Set Status Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Discovery and Depositions OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Summons issued
                  Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Tesla Inc. (SP)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                    U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SP)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Praecipe for a Summons
                      PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re [1] Complaint by Plaintiffs A. D., Fatiha Djemil, Hacene Djemil, Rania Djemil (Slavik, Donald) Modified on 4/7/2021 correct link to correct image of Complaint (CDA).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                        CIVIL COVER SHEET re [1] Complaint ; filed by Plaintiffs A. D., Fatiha Djemil, Hacene Djemil, Rania Djemil. (Slavik, Donald)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Complaint
                          DISREGARDCOMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7031361), filed by Hacene Djemil, Fatiha Djemil, A. D., Rania Djemil.(Slavik, Donald) Modified on 4/7/2021 Image/ Document moved to Dkt [1], fee refunded by Finance as this was a duplicate payment (CDA).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7031314) Attorney Donald H Slavik added to party A. D.(pty:pla), filed by Hacene Djemil, Fatiha Djemil, A. D., Rania Djemil.(Slavik, Donald) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/7/2021 with correct image of Complaint) (CDA).
                              LREF
                              Blank  Notice of Docket Text Modification
                              NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re [2] Complaint, [4] Praecipe for a Summons, [1] Complaint, : Correct image of Complaint moved to Dkt [1], Dkt [2] stricken as duplicate and duplicate filing fee refunded by Finance, Dkt [4] corrected link to docket entry for Complaint (CDA)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 112 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?