Painchaud v. DXC Technology Services, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:21-cv-40039

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 14, 2021 at 12:36 PM DT (3.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?