USA v. Josue Rivera Rodriguez
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-10107

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2021 at 12:26 PM DT (3.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order of Detention
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Release from Custody
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Detention
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Excludable Delay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Unseal Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?