Bhattacharya v. Murray, Jr., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00054-NKM-JCH
District Judge Norman K. Moon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 8, 2021 at 12:24 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Angela Hucles Mangano, Defendant
No Logo Babur B. Lateef, Defendant
No Logo Barbara J. Fried, Defendant
No Logo C. Evans Poston, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Christine Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Defendant
No Logo Frank M. Conner, III, Defendant
No Logo James B. Murray, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James V. Reyes, Defendant
No Logo Jim B. Tucker, Defendant
No Logo John A. Griffin, Defendant
No Logo John J. Densmore, Defendant
No Logo L. D. Britt, Defendant
No Logo Louis S. Haddad, Defendant
No Logo Mark T. Bowles, Defendant
No Logo Maurice A. Jones, Defendant
No Logo Melissa Fielding, Defendant
No Logo Nora Kern, Defendant
No Logo Peter C. Brunjes, Defendant
No Logo Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Defendant
No Logo Robert D. Hardie, Defendant
No Logo Robert M. Blue, Defendant
No Logo Sara K. Rasmussen, Defendant
No Logo Thomas A. DePasquale, Defendant
No Logo Timonty Longo, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Whittington W. Clement, Defendant
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 134 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
    LREF
    Blank 133 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 Motion HearingCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: 4/6/2021 FTR Log Notes with CertificateCourt Filing
        Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 129 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 reply
              Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 127 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
                  Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                    Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: 3/11/2021, Terminated: 4/6/2021 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                      MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 123 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
                        Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw)
                          LREF
                          Blank 122 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Notice (NextGen)
                            IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Notice (NextGen)
                              IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Notice - other
                                IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 121 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: 6/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling HearingCourt Filing
                                  Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/24/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 119 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville:TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing NOW SET for June 24, 2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties will receive an email with dial in instructions. (hnw) 120 Filed & Entered: 06/24/2020 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw) 121 Filed & Entered: 06/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Brown, Calvin)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 117 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) 118 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Brown, Calvin) 119 Filed & Entered: 06/16/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville:TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing NOW SET for June 24, 2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties will receive an email with dial in instructions. (hnw) 120 Filed & Entered: 06/24/2020 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw) 121 Filed & Entered: 06/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
                                              Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 letter
                                                Letter submitting a thumb drive to accompany Exhibit coversheets filed with the First Amended Complaint on 2/19/2020 (ECF. Dkt. 33). by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (jcj) Available for viewing in the Clerk's office.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Support re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020, Terminated: 3/31/2021 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Maurice A. Jones on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on John A. Griffin on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Barbara J. Fried on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert M. Blue on 3/11/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Whittington W. Clement on 3/10/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya of Service of Process for John A. Griffin, Maurice A. Jones, Angela Hucles Mangano, and James V. Reyes on March 20, 2020 (Haake, Jack)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Electronic Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj) (Main Document 104 replaced on 3/20/2020) (hnw). Modified on 3/20/2020 (hnw).Replaced deficient pdf document with corrected pdf document 105 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya of Service of Process for John A. Griffin, Maurice A. Jones, Angela Hucles Mangano, and James V. Reyes on March 20, 2020 (Haake, Jack) 106 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Whittington W. Clement on 3/10/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 107 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert M. Blue on 3/11/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 108 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Barbara J. Fried on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 109 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on John A. Griffin on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 110 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Maurice A. Jones on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 111 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Gibson, Madeline) 112 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020Terminated: 03/31/2021 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline) 113 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 114 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Letter Letter submitting a thumb drive to accompany Exhibit coversheets filed with the First Amended Complaint on 2/19/2020 (ECF. Dkt. 33). by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (jcj) Available for viewing in the Clerk's office. 115 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael) 116 Filed & Entered: 04/14/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 117 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) 118 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Brown, Calvin) 119 Filed & Entered: 06/16/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville:TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing NOW SET for June 24, 2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties will receive an email with dial in instructions. (hnw) 120 Filed & Entered: 06/24/2020 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw) 121 Filed & Entered: 06/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                      Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Nora Kern, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Christine Peterson, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Jim B. Tucker, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Melissa Fielding on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Timothy Longo Sr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Peter C. Brunjes on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on C. Evans Poston Jr. on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Babur B. Lateef, M.D. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert D. Hardie on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Louis S. Haddad on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Thomas A. DePasquale on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Elizabeth M. Cranwell on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Frank M. Conner III on 03/03/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Mark T. Bowles on 03/04/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: 3/17/2020 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on James B. Murray Jr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Whittington W. Clement NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Jim B. Tucker NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara K. Rasmussen NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to C. Evans Poston, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                      Electronic Summons Issued as to Christine Peterson NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        Electronic Summons Issued as to James B. Murray, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to Angela Hucles Mangano NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Timonty Longo, Sr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Babur B. Lateef NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Nora Kern NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Maurice A. Jones NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to Melissa Fielding NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas A. DePasquale NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert D. Hardie NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to Louis S. Haddad NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to John A. Griffin NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Barbara J. Fried NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to John J. Densmore NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Cranwell NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter C. Brunjes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Summons Issued as to L. D. Britt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Summons Issued as to Frank M. Conner, III. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark T. Bowles NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert M. Blue NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons for Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons for Nora Kern, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons for Christine Peterson, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons for Jim B. Tucker, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons for John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Summons for Melissa Fielding by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons for Timothy Longo Sr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons for Peter C. Brunjes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons for C. Evans Poston Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons for Angela Hucles Mangano by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons for Babur B. Lateef, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons for Maurice A. Jones by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Summons for Robert D. Hardie by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons for Louis S. Haddad by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons for John A. Griffin by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons for Barbara J. Fried by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons for Thomas A. DePasquale by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons for Elizabeth M. Cranwell by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons for Frank M. Conner III by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons for L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Summons for Mark T. Bowles by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Summons for Robert M. Blue by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Summons for Whittington W. Clement by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Summons for James B. Murray Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/21/2020. (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against James B. Murray, Jr., Whittington W. Clement, Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Frank M. Conner, III., Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Babur B. Lateef, Angela Hucles Mangano, C. Evans Poston, Jr., James V. Reyes, Peter C. Brunjes, Timonty Longo, Sr., Melissa Fielding, John J. Densmore, Jim B. Tucker, Christine Peterson, Nora Kern, Sara K. Rasmussen, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 48, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [31] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/19/2020. (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020, Terminated: 2/19/2020 motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: The Court recently granted the parties' consent motion to stay Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of its pending motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 27, based on Plaintiff's representations that he planned to file a motion seeking leave to amend the pleading, ECF No. 26. On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff's counsel docketed a 270-page amended complaint, ECF No. 28, but did not seek leave in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and the presiding District Judge's pretrial order, ECF No. 4, at 6. An amended pleading filed without the Court's leave or the opposing party's written consent has no legal effect. Accordingly, the parties are directed to confer and, on or before Monday, February 10, 2020, to file a report stating whether Defendant consents to Plaintiff's proposed amendment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). If Defendant does not consent in writing, Plaintiff must file a motion seeking leave to amend his complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/4/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against University Defendants, UVA Med School Defendants, and Individual Co-Conspirators filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(Lockerby, Michael) SEE ORDER ENTERED 2/19/2020 Modified on 2/20/2020 (hnw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral ORDER granting [26] Motion to Stay Case. For the reasons stated in the motion to stay, the time for defendant to file its reply to the motion to dismiss is stayed pending further order of the court. No other action or deadline in the case is stayed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/10/20. (JCH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020, Terminated: 1/10/2020 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion)(Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss is due by January 6, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/16/19. (JCH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/14/2019, Entered: 12/14/2019, Terminated: 12/16/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Continunance)(Lockerby, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/14/2019, Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Gabriel Haake on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/2019, Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lockerby on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Lockerby, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Roseboro Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Roseboro Notice re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief / Memorandum in Support re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 2/21/2020 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [11] Motion for access to the Court's Case Management /Electronic Case Filing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/7/19. (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER granting [5] Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and STAYING Discovery Deadlines and [4] Pretrial Order Deadlines pending the filing of Motion to Dismiss. If after the filing of the Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff determines he needs discovery he may make a request specifying the discovery he needs.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2019 re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, [11] MOTION request for access to CM/ECF System filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (FTR Operator: H. Wheeler) (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 FTR Log Notes with CertificateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FTR Log Notes for Telephonic Motion Hearing in the Charlottesville Division in CR3 held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: H. Wheeler (hnw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Notice of hearing on motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email dial in information to counsel. Clerk gave dial in info to Mr. Bhattacharya.(kld) 14 Filed & Entered: 11/05/2019 FTR Log Notes with Certificate FTR Log Notes for Telephonic Motion Hearing in the Charlottesville Division in CR3 held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: H. Wheeler (hnw) 15 Filed & Entered: 11/05/2019 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2019 re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, [11] MOTION request for access to CM/ECF System filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (FTR Operator: H. Wheeler) (hnw) 16 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2019 Order on Motion to Stay ORAL ORDER granting [5] Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and STAYING Discovery Deadlines and [4] Pretrial Order Deadlines pending the filing of Motion to Dismiss. If after the filing of the Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff determines he needs discovery he may make a request specifying the discovery he needs.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. (hnw) 17 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2019 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ORDER granting [11] Motion for access to the Court's Case Management /Electronic Case Filing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/7/19. (hnw) 18 Filed & Entered: 11/25/2019Terminated: 02/21/2020 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline) 19 Filed & Entered: 11/25/2019 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline) 20 Filed & Entered: 11/27/2019 Roseboro Notice Roseboro Notice re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (hnw) 21 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lockerby on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Lockerby, Michael) 22 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Gabriel Haake on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 23 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Continunance)(Lockerby, Michael) 24 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Oral ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss is due by January 6, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/16/19. (JCH) 25 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael) 26 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2020Terminated: 01/10/2020 Motion to Stay Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion)(Gibson, Madeline) 27 Filed & Entered: 01/10/2020 Order on Motion to Stay Oral ORDER granting [26] Motion to Stay Case. For the reasons stated in the motion to stay, the time for defendant to file its reply to the motion to dismiss is stayed pending further order of the court. No other action or deadline in the case is stayed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/10/20. (JCH) 28 Filed & Entered: 02/03/2020 Amended Complaint PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against University Defendants, UVA Med School Defendants, and Individual Co-Conspirators filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(Lockerby, Michael) SEE ORDER ENTERED 2/19/2020 Modified on 2/20/2020 (hnw). 29 Filed & Entered: 02/04/2020 Order ORAL ORDER: The Court recently granted the parties' consent motion to stay Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of its pending motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 27, based on Plaintiff's representations that he planned to file a motion seeking leave to amend the pleading, ECF No. 26. On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff's counsel docketed a 270-page amended complaint, ECF No. 28, but did not seek leave in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and the presiding District Judge's pretrial order, ECF No. 4, at 6. An amended pleading filed without the Court's leave or the opposing party's written consent has no legal effect. Accordingly, the parties are directed to confer and, on or before Monday, February 10, 2020, to file a report stating whether Defendant consents to Plaintiff's proposed amendment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). If Defendant does not consent in writing, Plaintiff must file a motion seeking leave to amend his complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/4/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jcj) 30 Filed & Entered: 02/07/2020 Status Report STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 31 Filed & Entered: 02/07/2020Terminated: 02/19/2020 Motion for Leave to File MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Haake, Jack) 32 Filed & Entered: 02/19/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File ORDER granting [31] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/19/2020. (hnw) 33 Filed: 02/19/2020Entered: 02/20/2020 Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against James B. Murray, Jr., Whittington W. Clement, Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Frank M. Conner, III., Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Babur B. Lateef, Angela Hucles Mangano, C. Evans Poston, Jr., James V. Reyes, Peter C. Brunjes, Timonty Longo, Sr., Melissa Fielding, John J. Densmore, Jim B. Tucker, Christine Peterson, Nora Kern, Sara K. Rasmussen, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 48, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(hnw) 34 Filed & Entered: 02/21/2020 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/21/2020. (hnw) 35 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James B. Murray Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 36 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Whittington W. Clement by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 37 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Robert M. Blue by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 38 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Mark T. Bowles by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 39 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 40 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Frank M. Conner III by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 41 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Elizabeth M. Cranwell by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 42 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Thomas A. DePasquale by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 43 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Barbara J. Fried by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 44 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for John A. Griffin by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 45 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Louis S. Haddad by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 46 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Robert D. Hardie by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 47 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Maurice A. Jones by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 48 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Babur B. Lateef, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 49 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Angela Hucles Mangano by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 50 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for C. Evans Poston Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 51 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 52 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Peter C. Brunjes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 53 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Timothy Longo Sr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 54 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Melissa Fielding by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 55 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 56 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Jim B. Tucker, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 57 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Christine Peterson, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 58 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Nora Kern, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 59 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 60 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert M. Blue NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 61 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark T. Bowles NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 62 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Frank M. Conner, III. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 63 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to L. D. Britt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 64 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter C. Brunjes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 65 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Cranwell NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 66 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to John J. Densmore NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 67 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Barbara J. Fried NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 68 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to John A. Griffin NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 69 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Louis S. Haddad NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 70 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert D. Hardie NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 71 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas A. DePasquale NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 72 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Melissa Fielding NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 73 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Maurice A. Jones NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 74 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Nora Kern NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 75 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Babur B. Lateef NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 76 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Timonty Longo, Sr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 77 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Angela Hucles Mangano NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 78 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James B. Murray, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 79 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Christine Peterson NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 80 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to C. Evans Poston, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 81 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara K. Rasmussen NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 82 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 83 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Jim B. Tucker NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 84 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Whittington W. Clement NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 85 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on James B. Murray Jr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 86 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Mark T. Bowles on 03/04/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 87 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 88 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Frank M. Conner III on 03/03/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 89 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Elizabeth M. Cranwell on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 90 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Thomas A. DePasquale on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 91 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Louis S. Haddad on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 92 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert D. Hardie on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 93 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Babur B. Lateef, M.D. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 94 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on C. Evans Poston Jr. on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 95 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Peter C. Brunjes on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 96 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Timothy Longo Sr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 97 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Melissa Fielding on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 98 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 99 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Jim B. Tucker, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 100 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Christine Peterson, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 101 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Nora Kern, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 102 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 103 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 104 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj) (Main Document 104 replaced on 3/20/2020) (hnw). Modified on 3/20/2020 (hnw).Replaced deficient pdf document with corrected pdf document 105 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya of Service of Process for John A. Griffin, Maurice A. Jones, Angela Hucles Mangano, and James V. Reyes on March 20, 2020 (Haake, Jack) 106 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Whittington W. Clement on 3/10/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 107 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert M. Blue on 3/11/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 108 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Barbara J. Fried on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 109 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on John A. Griffin on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 110 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Maurice A. Jones on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 111 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Gibson, Madeline) 112 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020Terminated: 03/31/2021 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline) 113 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 114 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Letter Letter submitting a thumb drive to accompany Exhibit coversheets filed with the First Amended Complaint on 2/19/2020 (ECF. Dkt. 33). by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (jcj) Available for viewing in the Clerk's office. 115 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael) 116 Filed & Entered: 04/14/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 117 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) 118 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Brown, Calvin) 119 Filed & Entered: 06/16/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville:TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing NOW SET for June 24, 2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties will receive an email with dial in instructions. (hnw) 120 Filed & Entered: 06/24/2020 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw) 121 Filed & Entered: 06/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION/ Request for access to CM/ECF System by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLAINTIFF KIERAN RAVI BHATTACHARYA'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES (FRCP 26(a)(1) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-4)(jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya re [7] Response in Opposition to Motion (jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for July 22-24, 2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) 9 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2019 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya re [7] Response in Opposition to Motion (jcj) 10 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2019 Docket Annotation PLAINTIFF KIERAN RAVI BHATTACHARYA'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES (FRCP 26(a)(1) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-4)(jcj) 11 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2019Terminated: 11/07/2019 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief MOTION/ Request for access to CM/ECF System by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (jcj) 12 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2019 Response in Support of Motion RESPONSE in Support re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline) 13 Filed & Entered: 11/05/2019 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email dial in information to counsel. Clerk gave dial in info to Mr. Bhattacharya.(kld) 14 Filed & Entered: 11/05/2019 FTR Log Notes with Certificate FTR Log Notes for Telephonic Motion Hearing in the Charlottesville Division in CR3 held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: H. Wheeler (hnw) 15 Filed & Entered: 11/05/2019 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2019 re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, [11] MOTION request for access to CM/ECF System filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (FTR Operator: H. Wheeler) (hnw) 16 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2019 Order on Motion to Stay ORAL ORDER granting [5] Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and STAYING Discovery Deadlines and [4] Pretrial Order Deadlines pending the filing of Motion to Dismiss. If after the filing of the Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff determines he needs discovery he may make a request specifying the discovery he needs.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/5/19. (hnw) 17 Filed & Entered: 11/07/2019 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ORDER granting [11] Motion for access to the Court's Case Management /Electronic Case Filing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/7/19. (hnw) 18 Filed & Entered: 11/25/2019Terminated: 02/21/2020 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline) 19 Filed & Entered: 11/25/2019 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline) 20 Filed & Entered: 11/27/2019 Roseboro Notice Roseboro Notice re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (hnw) 21 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lockerby on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Lockerby, Michael) 22 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Gabriel Haake on behalf of Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 23 Filed & Entered: 12/14/2019Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion for Continunance)(Lockerby, Michael) 24 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Oral ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss is due by January 6, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/16/19. (JCH) 25 Filed & Entered: 01/06/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [18] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael) 26 Filed & Entered: 01/09/2020Terminated: 01/10/2020 Motion to Stay Consent MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Dismiss by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion)(Gibson, Madeline) 27 Filed & Entered: 01/10/2020 Order on Motion to Stay Oral ORDER granting [26] Motion to Stay Case. For the reasons stated in the motion to stay, the time for defendant to file its reply to the motion to dismiss is stayed pending further order of the court. No other action or deadline in the case is stayed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/10/20. (JCH) 28 Filed & Entered: 02/03/2020 Amended Complaint PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against University Defendants, UVA Med School Defendants, and Individual Co-Conspirators filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(Lockerby, Michael) SEE ORDER ENTERED 2/19/2020 Modified on 2/20/2020 (hnw). 29 Filed & Entered: 02/04/2020 Order ORAL ORDER: The Court recently granted the parties' consent motion to stay Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of its pending motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 27, based on Plaintiff's representations that he planned to file a motion seeking leave to amend the pleading, ECF No. 26. On February 3, 2020, Plaintiff's counsel docketed a 270-page amended complaint, ECF No. 28, but did not seek leave in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and the presiding District Judge's pretrial order, ECF No. 4, at 6. An amended pleading filed without the Court's leave or the opposing party's written consent has no legal effect. Accordingly, the parties are directed to confer and, on or before Monday, February 10, 2020, to file a report stating whether Defendant consents to Plaintiff's proposed amendment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). If Defendant does not consent in writing, Plaintiff must file a motion seeking leave to amend his complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/4/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jcj) 30 Filed & Entered: 02/07/2020 Status Report STATUS REPORT Regarding Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 31 Filed & Entered: 02/07/2020Terminated: 02/19/2020 Motion for Leave to File MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Haake, Jack) 32 Filed & Entered: 02/19/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File ORDER granting [31] Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/19/2020. (hnw) 33 Filed: 02/19/2020Entered: 02/20/2020 Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against James B. Murray, Jr., Whittington W. Clement, Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Frank M. Conner, III., Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Babur B. Lateef, Angela Hucles Mangano, C. Evans Poston, Jr., James V. Reyes, Peter C. Brunjes, Timonty Longo, Sr., Melissa Fielding, John J. Densmore, Jim B. Tucker, Christine Peterson, Nora Kern, Sara K. Rasmussen, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 48, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51, # (52) Exhibit 52, # (53) Exhibit 53, # (54) Exhibit 54, # (55) Exhibit 55, # (56) Exhibit 56, # (57) Exhibit 57, # (58) Exhibit 58, # (59) Exhibit 59, # (60) Exhibit 60, # (61) Exhibit 61, # (62) Exhibit 62, # (63) Exhibit 63, # (64) Exhibit 64, # (65) Exhibit 65, # (66) Exhibit 66)(hnw) 34 Filed & Entered: 02/21/2020 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing as moot [18] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/21/2020. (hnw) 35 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James B. Murray Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 36 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Whittington W. Clement by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 37 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Robert M. Blue by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 38 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Mark T. Bowles by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 39 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 40 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Frank M. Conner III by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 41 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Elizabeth M. Cranwell by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 42 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Thomas A. DePasquale by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 43 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Barbara J. Fried by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 44 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for John A. Griffin by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 45 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Louis S. Haddad by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 46 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Robert D. Hardie by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 47 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Maurice A. Jones by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 48 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Babur B. Lateef, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 49 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Angela Hucles Mangano by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 50 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for C. Evans Poston Jr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 51 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 52 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Peter C. Brunjes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 53 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Timothy Longo Sr. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 54 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Melissa Fielding by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 55 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 56 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Jim B. Tucker, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 57 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Christine Peterson, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 58 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Nora Kern, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 59 Filed & Entered: 02/27/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 60 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert M. Blue NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 61 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark T. Bowles NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 62 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Frank M. Conner, III. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 63 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to L. D. Britt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 64 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter C. Brunjes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 65 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Cranwell NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 66 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to John J. Densmore NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 67 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Barbara J. Fried NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 68 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to John A. Griffin NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 69 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Louis S. Haddad NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 70 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert D. Hardie NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 71 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas A. DePasquale NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 72 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Melissa Fielding NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 73 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Maurice A. Jones NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 74 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Nora Kern NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 75 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Babur B. Lateef NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 76 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Timonty Longo, Sr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 77 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Angela Hucles Mangano NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 78 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James B. Murray, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 79 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Christine Peterson NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 80 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to C. Evans Poston, Jr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 81 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara K. Rasmussen NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 82 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 83 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Jim B. Tucker NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 84 Filed & Entered: 02/28/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to Whittington W. Clement NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw) 85 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on James B. Murray Jr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 86 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Mark T. Bowles on 03/04/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 87 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on L.D. Britt, M.D., M.P.H. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 88 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Frank M. Conner III on 03/03/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 89 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Elizabeth M. Cranwell on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 90 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Thomas A. DePasquale on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 91 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Louis S. Haddad on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 92 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert D. Hardie on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 93 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Babur B. Lateef, M.D. on 3/9/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 94 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on C. Evans Poston Jr. on 3/7/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 95 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Peter C. Brunjes on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 96 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Timothy Longo Sr. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 97 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Melissa Fielding on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 98 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on John J. Densmore, M.D., Ph.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 99 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Jim B. Tucker, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 100 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Christine Peterson, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 101 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Nora Kern, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 102 Filed & Entered: 03/17/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Sara K. Rasmussen, M.D. on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 103 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for James V. Reyes by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (Haake, Jack) 104 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Electronic Summons Issued Electronic Summons Issued as to James V. Reyes NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj) (Main Document 104 replaced on 3/20/2020) (hnw). Modified on 3/20/2020 (hnw).Replaced deficient pdf document with corrected pdf document 105 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya of Service of Process for John A. Griffin, Maurice A. Jones, Angela Hucles Mangano, and James V. Reyes on March 20, 2020 (Haake, Jack) 106 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Whittington W. Clement on 3/10/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 107 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Robert M. Blue on 3/11/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 108 Filed & Entered: 03/20/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint and Exhibits served on Barbara J. Fried on 3/4/2020, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(Haake, Jack) 109 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on John A. Griffin on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 110 Filed & Entered: 03/23/2020 Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Maurice A. Jones on 3/16/20, filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya.(jcj) 111 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Gibson, Madeline) 112 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020Terminated: 03/31/2021 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline) 113 Filed & Entered: 03/24/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 114 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Letter Letter submitting a thumb drive to accompany Exhibit coversheets filed with the First Amended Complaint on 2/19/2020 (ECF. Dkt. 33). by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya (jcj) Available for viewing in the Clerk's office. 115 Filed & Entered: 04/07/2020 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Lockerby, Michael) 116 Filed & Entered: 04/14/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 117 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) 118 Filed & Entered: 04/22/2020 Notice of Appearance NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker (Brown, Calvin) 119 Filed & Entered: 06/16/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing on Motion NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville:TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing NOW SET for June 24, 2020 11:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties will receive an email with dial in instructions. (hnw) 120 Filed & Entered: 06/24/2020 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 re [112] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint filed by Christine Peterson, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Whittington W. Clement, Mark T. Bowles, Sara K. Rasmussen, John A. Griffin, Robert M. Blue, John J. Densmore, Timonty Longo, Sr., Peter C. Brunjes, Louis S. Haddad, James V. Reyes, Barbara J. Fried, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr., Melissa Fielding, L. D. Britt, Jim B. Tucker, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw) 121 Filed & Entered: 06/30/2020 Notice Rescheduling Hearing Notice Rescheduling Hearing pursuant to Standing Order No. 2020-14 entered June 8, 2020 in the matter of Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by COVID-19: Phase I Reopening, (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial previously set for July 22-24, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Jury Trial RESET for March 1-3, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw) Filed & Entered: 09/21/2020 Notice (Other) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800-676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI) Filed & Entered: 09/29/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at https://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc) Filed & Entered: 10/05/2020 Notice (NextGen) IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking your account can be found by clicking here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGen October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc) 122 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Order Oral ORDER cancelling the jury trial currently set for March 1-3, 2021 at 9:30 AM, in light of W.D. Va. Second Amended Standing Order No. 2020-10 and 2020-14. Courtroom Deputy Heidi Wheeler will contact the parties to reschedule a trial in this case. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 02/08/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(dg) 123 Filed & Entered: 02/08/2021 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of March 1-3, 2021 Jury Trial (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw) 124 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021Terminated: 04/06/2021 Motion for Discovery MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Haake, Jack) 125 Filed & Entered: 03/11/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Support Brief / Memorandum in Support re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 126 Filed & Entered: 03/25/2021 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule . filed by Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Peter C. Brunjes, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Conner, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John J. Densmore, Melissa Fielding, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Louis S. Haddad, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Nora Kern, Babur B. Lateef, Timonty Longo, Sr, Angela Hucles Mangano, James B. Murray, Jr, Christine Peterson, C. Evans Poston, Jr, Sara K. Rasmussen, James V. Reyes, Jim B. Tucker. (Gibson, Madeline) 127 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Hearing on Motion NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 128 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Reply Reply re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule, [125] Brief / Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Haake, Jack) 129 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Memorandum Opinion MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 130 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2021 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ORDER granting in part and denying in part [112] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts II, III, and IV and DISMISSES Counts II, III, and IV with prejudice. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion to dismiss Count I. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (hnw) 131 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 FTR Log Notes with Certificate Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson (kld) 132 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Motion Hearing Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2021 re [124] MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Discovery Stay and Issue New Discovery Schedule filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld) 133 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Notice of Hearing NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 5/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld) 134 Filed & Entered: 04/06/2021 Order on Motion for Discovery Oral ORDER granting [124] Motion for Discovery. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss. filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief / Memorandum in Support re [5] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss . filed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 11/7/2019 Motion To StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Filing And Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/1/19. (jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia (Gibson, Madeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/2/2019.(jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-300003211.), filed by Kieran Ravi Bhattacharya. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibits 1-25, # (3) Exhibits 26-56; Exhbits 9 and 46b are audio recordings on a thumb drive located in the Clerk's office)(jcj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?