Maslic et al v. ISM Vuzem d.o.o. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:21-cv-02556-LB
Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler, presiding

Tags
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 7:13 PM DT (1 week ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DARKO SINCEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo DAVID STANTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo ELVIS KOSCAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo GOGO REBIC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Ivan Drzaic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo LEON HUDOLDETNJAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Leopold Hubek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo MITJA POGOREVC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo NEDELJKO ZIVANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Robert Hernaus, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Sasa Maslic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo Stjepan Papes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo TOMICA PANIC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
No Logo ZELJKO PULJKO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Dresser +1 408 279 7529 +1 408 298 3306 loofwcd@aol.com
v.
No Logo Eisenmann Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Justin Holtzman +1 415 293 6800 aholtzman@bsfllp.com
No Logo HRID-MONT d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo ISM Vuzem d.o.o., Defendant
No Logo ISM Vuzem USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ivan Vuzem, Defendant
No Logo Robert Vuzem, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vuzem USA, Inc.,, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 4/8/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Outside US
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case HG20072866[Alameda County Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Appendix
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Remand
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                        Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting [4] Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Aaron M. Bernay representing Defendant Eisenmann Corporation. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021, Terminated: 4/8/2021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Aaron M. Bernay ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15812965.) filed by Eisenmann Corporation. (Holtzman, Alexander) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Eisenmann Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eisenmann SE, Corporate Parent Eisenmann Bblingen Verwaltung GmbH, Corporate Parent Eisenmann Beteiligungen GmbH for Eisenmann Corporation. (Holtzman, Alexander) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 notice of removal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?