USA v. Martel
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-10110

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2021 at 4:47 PM DT (4.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Procedural Order re sentencing hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Plea Agreement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Information - Felony
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?