Neef v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-07677-RJS-JCF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 2, 2016 at 11:31 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Craig Andrew Neef, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clare Rivka Norins +1 212 277 5882 +1 212 557 0565 cnorins@blhny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net
v.
No Logo David Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Jack McManus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Colgan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Kevin Ward, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City UNDER COVER Police Officer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Richard Gioia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Richard Roes, Defendant
No Logo Ruby Marin-Jordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Russell, John, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Sean O'Connor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Stephen Hammerman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas DiRusso, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas Doepfner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas, Graham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX Out of State
Terminated 4/30/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-09216-RJS-JCF
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, ECF, RELATED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE: It is hereby stipulated and agreed to by and between the parties that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, expenses or fees except as provided herein. The City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Craig Andrew Neef the sum of Twelve Thousand Five Hundred Dollars ($12,500.00), in full satisfaction of his claims including all claims for costs, expenses, attorneys fees and interest. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/29/2008) (jpo)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
    CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: All written discovery, including document requests and interrogatories, shall have been served by 12/17/07, see document for other discovery deadlines. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2008. All dispositive motions shall have been served on or before 8/29/08; oppositions due 9/30/08; replies, if any, due 10/31/08. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/11/07) (cd)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Answer
      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Graham, John Colgan, Stephen Hammerman, Thomas Doepfner, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Jack McManus, Sean O'Connor, Richard Gioia, New York City UNDER COVER Police Officer, Kevin Ward, Thomas DiRusso, Russell John, The City of New York, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, David Cohen, Joseph Esposito.(Beck, Curt)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Thomas DiRusso served on 10/12/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by Mail after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to defendant Inspector Thomas DiRusso with Sergeant Daniel Chirantal at the Firearms Suppression Division, 104 E. 107th Street, 3rd Floor, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Russell John served on 9/25/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was accepted by defendant Officer Russell John at his actual place of business, that being the Management and Information Systems Division at One Police Plaza, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Kevin Ward served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by Mail after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to defendant Inspector Kevin Ward with Cadet Charsel Anthony in the Organized Crime Control Bureau at One Police Plaza, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Richard Gioia served on 10/18/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by Mail after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to defendant P.O. Richard Gioia with P.A.A. Verte at the 120th Precinct, 78 Richmond Terrace, Staten Island, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. New York City UNDER COVER Police Officer served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by Mail after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to defendant Under Cover Police Officer No. 2406 with Cadet Dalica Matos in Room 1100 (Narcotics Division) at One Police Plaza, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Sean O'Connor served on 9/25/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to Sergeant O'Connor with Detective Singh in Room 1109 (Joint Terrorist Task Force) at One Police Plaza, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Thomas Graham served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; John Colgan served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Stephen Hammerman served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Thomas Doepfner served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Ruby Marin-Jordan served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Jack McManus served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Raymond Kelly served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; David Cohen served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Joseph Esposito served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was made by on each of the foregoing defendants after leaving a copy of the Summons and Complaint addressed to each defendant with Agency Attorney Intern Lesa Moore in Room 1406 of One Police Plaza, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. The City of New York served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007; Michael Bloomberg served on 9/21/2007, answer due 11/15/2007. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana on the 4th Floor of 100 Church Street, New York, New York. Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef. (Norins, Clare)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/23/2007) (jar)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          CONSOLIDATION ORDER: The above-captioned case is hereby consolidated with 04cv7922 Schiller v. City of New York, for discovery purposes as related to the protest activity and arrests during the 2004 Republican National Convention and is referred to Magistrate Judge Francis for discovery. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/23/2007) (jar)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (fk)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Raju Sundaran dated 10/9/07 re: Attorney for Defendant City of New York requests an extension of time up to and including 12/11/07 to respond to plaintiffs' complaints. ENDORSEMENT: The time to answer is extended to November 15, 2007, provided that the defendants immediately begin participating in discovery. (Signed by Judge James C. Francis on 10/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-07922-RJS-JCF, 1:07-cv-07741-UA, 1:07-cv-7495-JCF, 1:07-cv-7677-JCF, 1:07-cv-7494-JCF.(tro)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of The City of New York (Beck, Curt)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas' White Plains Docket. (fk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
                                      Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Case Designation
                                          Magistrate Judge James C. Francis is so designated. (laq)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Case Accepted as Related
                                            CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:04-cv-09216-KMK-JCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Statement of Relatedness
                                              STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 04-cv-9216 (KMK)(JCF). Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against Thomas Graham, John Colgan, Stephen Hammerman, Thomas Doepfner, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Jack McManus, Sean O'Connor, Richard Gioia, New York City UNDER COVER Police Officer, Kevin Ward, Thomas DiRusso, Russell John, John Does, Richard Roes, The City of New York, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, David Cohen, Joseph Esposito. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 625719)Document filed by Craig Andrew Neef.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                  Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 1:04-cv-9216. (laq)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Summons Issued
                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Graham, John Colgan, Stephen Hammerman, Thomas Doepfner, Ruby Marin-Jordan, Jack McManus, Sean O'Connor, Richard Gioia, New York City UNDER COVER Police Officer, Kevin Ward, Thomas DiRusso, Russell John, John Does, Richard Roes, The City of New York, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, David Cohen, Joseph Esposito. (laq)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?