Thomas v. City of Boston et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-10596

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 1:42 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Scheduling Conference
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Removal
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?