Barnstable County Mutual Insurance Company v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-10597

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2021 at 2:46 PM DT (4.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Joint statement re scheduling conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Notice of Scheduling Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?