PURDUE PHARMA, LP et al v. Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-10598

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 11, 2021 at 4:42 PM DT (2.4 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?