USA v. Abouammo et al
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cr-00621-EMC

Tags
Last Updated April 9, 2021 at 11:48 PM EDT (9.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin J. Hawk +1 202 307 5176 benjamin.hawk@usdoj.gov
Space Colin Christopher Sampson +1 415 436 7020 +1 415 436 7009 colin.sampson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Ahmad Abouammo, Defendant

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela Chuang +1 415 436 7700 +1 415 436 7706 angela_chuang@fd.org
Space Jodi Linker +1 415 436 7700 +1 415 436 7706 Jodi_Linker@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Ahmad Abouammo (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/19/2019
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
319-mj-71824-MAG
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18951 Acting as Agent of Foreign Government Without Notice to Attorney General
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519 Falsification of Records to Obstruct Investigation
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C §§ 951 and 2 - Acting as an Agent of a Foreign Government Without Notice to the Attorney General
Count 20s-22s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4601.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1956(a)(2)(B)(i) - Money Laundering
Count 23s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1519 - Falsification of Records to Obstruct Investigation
Count 4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1349 - Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud and Honest Services Fraud
Count 5s-19s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1343, 1346, and 2 - Wire Fraud and Honest Services Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Count 1ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 951 and 2 - Acting as an Agent of a Foreign Government Without Notice to the Attorney General
Count 20ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1956(a)(2)(B)(I) - Money Laundering
Count 21ss-22ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1956(a)(2)(B)(i) - Money Laundering
Count 23ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1519 - Falsification of Records to Obstruct Investigation
Count 4ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. § 1349 - Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud and Honest Services Fraud
Count 5ss-19ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. §§ 1343, 1346, and 2 - Wire Fraud and Honest Services Wire Fraud and Aiding and Abetting
Defendant Custody Status Not in Custody
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 4/3/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 3/31/2021. Defendant's motion to compel to be filed by 4/15/2021; opposition due by 4/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. See pdf image for further details.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Responses due by 4/22/2021. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 115 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
    CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY as to Ahmad Abouammo:. Status Conference re: Discovery set for 3/31/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 3/31/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
      LREF
      Blank 114 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
      CLERK'S NOTICE as to Ahmad Abouammo: Status Conference set for 6/9/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/19/2021. Replies due by 6/2/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
        ORDER GRANTING [112] STIPULATION SETTING SUPPRESSION HEARING DEADLINES AND EXCLUDING TIME PURSUANT TO THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Status Conference set 3/24/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 6/9/2021 at 2:30PM. Any motions to suppress evidence shall be filed no later than 5/5/2021. Oppositions due 5/19/2021; replies due 6/2/2021; hearings on said motions set for 6/9/2021 at 2:30 p.m. Time excluded from 3/23/2021 to 5/5/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021, Terminated: 3/23/2021 stipulation
          Stipulated Motion To Set Suppression Hearing Deadlines And For Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act as to Ahmad Abouammo filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 3/19/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 2/24/2021. Further Status Conference re: Motions Setting set for 3/24/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              ORDER Denying [84] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/2021. (emcsec, COURT STAFF)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 109 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING 2/24/2021 STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING [85] MOTIONS RE GOVERNMENTS CLASSIFIED DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT 22 WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Ahmad Abouammo re [105] Notice (Other) filed by USA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/30/2021, Entered: 1/30/2021 Notice - other
                      NOTICE of Bill of Particulars Re: Count 21 by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/30/2021) Modified on 2/1/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Notice - other
                        NOTICE of Dismissal of Count 22 Without Prejudice by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Proposed Order
                          Proposed Order re [97] Transcript by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ali Alzabarah, Ahmed Almutairi Re: Classified Discovery Obligations (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                            Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [102] Stipulation as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Status Conference scheduled for 2/3/2021 is continued to 2/24/2021 at 2:30PM. It is further ORDERED THAT time under the Speedy Trial Act is excluded from the date of this Order until 2/24/2021.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021, Terminated: 1/25/2021 stipulation
                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Joint Motion To Continue Status Conference And Stipulation To Exclude Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act and [proposed] Order filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [103] Order on Stipulation. Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                  Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [100] Stipulation to Exclude Time Pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 1/6/2021 to 2/3/2021.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021, Terminated: 1/14/2021 stipulation
                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Ahmad Abouammo (Chuang, Angela) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/06/2021 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Belle Ball (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                          *** THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES ECF DOCUMENT NO. 96 *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo held on January 6, 2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                            *** SEE CORRECT EXHIBIT AT [97]. *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo held on January 6, 2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (Related documents(s) [94]) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/06/2021 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Belle Ball (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motions Hearing re: [82][83][84][85] and Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 1/6/2021 held on 1/6/2021. Status Conference set for 2/3/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 2/3/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                  CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING RE: [82][83][84][85] AND STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference/Trial Setting Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. [82] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-THREE FOR LACK OF VENUE, [84] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FOUR THROUGH TWENTY-TWO FOR FAILURE TO STATE AN OFFENSE, [83] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FIVE THROUGH FOURTEEN AND TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-TWO AS TIME BARRED, [85] MOTION RE. GOVERNMENTS CLASSIFIED DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS. Status Conference/Trial Setting Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Reply to Response
                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ahmad Abouammo re [88] Memorandum in Opposition COUNTS FOUR THROUGH TWENTY-TWO FOR FAILURE TO STATE AN OFFENSE (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Reply to Response
                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ahmad Abouammo re [87] Memorandum in Opposition COUNTS FIVE THROUGH FOURTEEN AND TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-TWO AS TIME-BARRED (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Reply to Response
                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ahmad Abouammo re [86] Memorandum in Opposition COUNTS TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-THREE FOR LACK OF VENUE (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo re [85] MOTION RE. GOVERNMENTS CLASSIFIED DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo re [84] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FOUR THROUGH TWENTY-TWO FOR FAILURE TO STATE AN OFFENSE (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo re [83] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FIVE THROUGH FOURTEEN AND TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-TWO AS TIME BARRED (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo re [82] MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-THREE FOR LACK OF VENUE (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 2/4/2021 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                  MOTION RE. GOVERNMENTS CLASSIFIED DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS by Ahmad Abouammo. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 2/24/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FOUR THROUGH TWENTY-TWO FOR FAILURE TO STATE AN OFFENSE by Ahmad Abouammo. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 1/8/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS FIVE THROUGH FOURTEEN AND TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-TWO AS TIME BARRED by Ahmad Abouammo. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 1/2/2021 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS TWENTY THROUGH TWENTY-THREE FOR LACK OF VENUE by Ahmad Abouammo as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [80] STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING AND EXCLUDING TIME PURSUANT TO THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 10/21/2020 to 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020, Terminated: 10/28/2020 stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulated Motion To Continue And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/24/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held via Zoom on 10/21/2020. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Defendant's Motions due by 11/18/2020. Government's Responses due by 12/7/2020. Defendant's Replies due by 12/16/2020. Motion Hearing, Status Conference, and Trial Setting Hearing set for 1/6/2021, 02:30 PM, by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcCourt Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at EMCCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Not less than 3 court days in advance of the hearing.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [77] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document as to Ahmad Abouammo (1).(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020, Terminated: 10/16/2020 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                  MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Exhibit B to Document 74) and Proposed Order by Ahmad Abouammo. (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 Exhibit(s)
                                                                                    Exhibits B by Ahmad Abouammo re [74] Status Report, (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING AND CHANGING TIME FROM 2:30 PM TO 3:00 PM. Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 03:00 PM by Videoconference before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 03:00 PM Videoconference before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Status report
                                                                                        *** EXHIBIT B FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** STATUS REPORT Status Conference Statement by Ahmad Abouammo (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of ELLEN LEONIDA, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/15/2020 (fff, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 Status report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 10/4/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 9/30/2020 re [66] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by Ahmad Abouammo. Motion denied conditioned upon the Government providing the information as stated at the hearing. See pdf image for further details. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Reply to Response
                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Ahmad Abouammo as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah re [68] Memorandum in Opposition (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colin Christopher Sampson appearing for USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah re [55] Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo re [66] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF MOTION HEARING [66] AND CONVERTING TO ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing re: [66] Motion for Bill of Particulars set for 9/30/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. as to [66] MOTION for Bill of Particulars . Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: 9/16/2020, Terminated: 12/30/2020 Motion for Bill of ParticularsCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Ahmad Abouammo. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ellen Leonida, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [62] Stipulation For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 9/2/2020 to 10/21/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020, Terminated: 9/8/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulated Motion To Continue And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 9/2/2020. Further Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: Arraignment as to Ahmad Abouammo (1) Count 1ss,4ss,5ss-19ss,20ss,21ss-22ss,23ss held on 9/2/2020, Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo not held on 9/2/2020. Advised of charges. Arraigned on Superseding Indictment. Plead not guilty. This proceeding was held via Zoom video conference. Defendant consents to proceed by video conference. Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Total Time in Court: 4 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Colin Christopher Sampson. Defendant Attorney: Ellen Valentik Leonida. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 8/30/2020, Entered: 8/30/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF STATUS CONFERENCE SET 9/2/2020 AND CONVERTING TO ZOOM HEARING. Time is changed from 2:30PM to 4:00PM. Status Conference reset for 9/2/2020 04:00 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 04:00 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2020)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                    NOTICE Arrest Warrant by USA as to Ali Alzabarah (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      NOTICE Arrest Warrant by USA as to Ahmed Almutairi (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [57] Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Exclude Time as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Status Conference set 8/19/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 9/2/2020 at 2:30 PM. Time is excluded.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [53] Indictment, Arraignment on Superseding Indictment set for 9/2/2020 at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Video Conference, before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [58] Order on Stipulation. Status Conference set for 9/2/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Hearing conducted via Zoom webinar. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020, Terminated: 8/13/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulated Motion To Continue And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF HEARING FROM 2:30 TO 3:30 PM as to Ahmad Abouammo: Time for Status Conference is changed from 2:30 PM to 3:30 PM. Status Conference reset for 8/19/2020 03:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Hearing will be conducted by Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [53] Indictment: Arraignment on Superseding Indictment set for 8/19/2020 at 10:30 a.m., by Zoom Video Conferencing, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Governments Motion For A Pretrial Conference Pursuant To The Classified Information Procedures Act And Supporting Memorandum Of Law by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/29/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah granting [52] Notice of Dismissal of Superseding Information filed by USA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 indictment
                                                                                                                                        SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1) count(s) 1ss, 4ss, 5ss-19ss, 20ss, 21ss-22ss, 23ss, Ali Alzabarah (2) count(s) 3ss, 4ss, 5ss-19ss, Ahmed Almutairi (3) count(s) 2ss, 4ss, 5ss-19ss. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet, # (2) Penalty Sheet, # (3) Penalty Sheet, # (4) Penalty Sheet) (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/28/2020 (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal of Superseding Information by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah re [42] Information - Felony, (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/19/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [49] Stipulation Excluding Time as to Speedy Trial Act as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 7/15/2020 to 8/19/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 7/15/2020. Further Status Conference to schedule motion dates set for 8/19/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Government to file proposed order excluding time. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020, Terminated: 7/17/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulation And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. Case participants will enter as attendee and thereafter promoted to panelists.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619911861?pwd=TjVma1lnMlJlNHR3ZE9QMkFjNkFndz09Meeting ID: 161 991 1861Password: 912881Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ellen Valentik Leonida appearing for Ahmad Abouammo (Leonida, Ellen) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Order Excluding Time Pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [45] Stipulation as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 4/22/2020 thru 7/15/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020, Terminated: 4/24/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulation And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Telephonic Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 4/22/2020. Further Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. If not live, will be converted to telephonic. Time excluded from 4/22/2020 to 7/15/2020. Government to file proposed order excluding time. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING IMPORTANT CALL-INFORMATION as to Ahmad Abouammo: Call in information is as follows for Status Conference set 4/22/2020 at 2:30 PM: 1-888-684-8852 / access code: 6662706. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: 4/7/2020 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Ahmad Abouammo (1) count(s) 1s, 4s, 5s-19s, 20s-22s, 23s, Ali Alzabarah (2) count(s) 3s, 4s, 5s-19s, Ahmed Almutairi (3) count(s) 2s, 4s, 5s-19s. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [39] Stipulation for Exclusion of Time as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 2/19/2020 to 4/22/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020, Terminated: 2/21/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulation And [proposed] Order For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 2/19/2020. Further Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Government to prepare exclusion order. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Order on Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [37] Motion for Ex Parte Application For Alternative Victim Notification Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3771(d)(2) as to Ahmad Abouammo (1), Ali Alzabarah (2), Ahmed Almutairi (3).(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020, Terminated: 2/6/2020 Motion for Ex Parte Application
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11-21-2019, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2020. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo held on November 19, 2019, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (Related documents(s) [34]) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Belle Ball (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/2019 before Judge Edward M. Chen for Court Reporter Debra Pas (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/12/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Protective Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [30] Stipulation as to Ahmad Abouammo (1).(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 1/15/2020 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo for Protective Order filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [28] Stipulation to continue hearing and excluding time pursuant to the speedy trial act as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/19. (cl, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo. Status Conference previously set for 1/15/2020 has been continued to 2/19/2020 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/21/2019, Entered: 12/21/2019, Terminated: 12/23/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo tTo Continue Hearing and Exclude Time filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah held on 11/12/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [25] Stipulation to Exclude Time as to Ahmad Abouammo (1). Time excluded from 11/21/2019 to 1/15/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo Stipulation For Exclusion Of Time Pursuant To The Speedy Trial Act filed by USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 warrant returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Warrant Returned Executed on 11/5/19. as to Ahmad Abouammo. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Appeal of magistrate judge decision to District Court by USA held. Motion Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/21/2019. Court grants defendant's request for reasons stated on record. Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Total Time in Court 32 mins. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond Entered Unsecured $50,000.00 as to Ahmad Abouammo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/21/19. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: # (1) Release Bond with additional surety signatures) (mklS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Bond Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/21/2019. FTR Time 10:41-10:46,12:20-12:24. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo: Bond Hearing set for 11/21/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo Bond Hearing set for 11/21/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Ahmad Abouammo (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ahmad Abouammo (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference re: Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Initial Appearance as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/20/2019, ID of Counsel Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/20/2019, attorney is Jodi Linker. Arraignment as to Ahmad Abouammo (1) Count 1,4 held on 11/20/2019 plead not guilty. Defendant remanded to custody. Prev. set 11/20/19 2:30 before Judge Chen. FTR Time 11:15-11:19. The Court may ask the defendant to contribute to his defense at a later time. Defendant's assertion of rights filed. The Court has reviewed the papers relating to the detention proceedings before Judge Alsup and will not override his decision to release the defendant under the conditions imposed by the Magistrate Judge in Oregon. The Government may take this matter up to Judge Chen. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/20/2019 (lskS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo Appeal taken from case Sallie Kim. 18 U.S.C. s. 3145(a)(1) (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Detention Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/19/2019. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall be released from custody on conditions provided by the Magistrate Judge in Seattle. Effectiveness of ruling is STAYED, to expire on Monday, 11/25/2019 at Noon. Defendant remanded to custody. Arraignment set for 11/20/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Status Conference set for 11/20/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Total Time in Court: 10 minutes.) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Benjamin Kingsley, Colin Sampson. Defendant Attorney: Jodi Linker (special appearance). Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah re [11] Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6, # (2) Exhibit 7)(Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1) count(s) 1, 4, Ali Alzabarah (2) count(s) 3, Ahmed Almutairi (3) count(s) 2. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Jodi Linker in Support of [11] Memorandum in Opposition by Ahmad Abouammo as to Ahmad Abouammo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Linker, Jodi) (Filed on 11/18/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by Ahmad Abouammo Defendant's Opposition to United States' Motion to Revoke Release Order (Linker, Jodi) (Filed on 11/18/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Detention Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/12/2019. Government is ordered to make appropriate arrangements for defendant to be present at next hearing. Pretrial Officer is directed to look into the possibility of a halfway house for defendant. Further Detention Hearing set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (Total Time in Court: 27 minutes.) Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Colin Sampson, Halie Hoffman. Defendant Attorney: Jodi Linker (special appearance). Pretrial Officer: Denise Mancia. Defendant Present: No. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/12/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER [6] PENDING RULING ON MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER OF RELEASE ON BOND CONDITIONS as to Ahmad Abouammo. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/8/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo Appeal taken from case Paula L. McCandlis, Western District of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5)(Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/8/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [7] Order: Detention Hearing set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 warrant returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/5/2019 as to Ahmad Abouammo. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG] (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colin Christopher Sampson appearing for USA. Benjamin Kingsley appearing for the USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/6/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Seal Case as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/5/19. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to seal case as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1), Ahmed Almutairi (2), Ali Alzabarah (3). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).[3:19-mj-71824-MAG]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?