Pete Deutschman v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2021-01194911-CU-FR-CJC

Tags
Last Updated April 13, 2021 at 2:29 PM DT (4.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pete Deutschman, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021
    CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 04/09/2021.
      Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021
      PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12871566 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12699245.
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021
        SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEUTSCHMAN, PETE ON 04/09/2021
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021
          COMPLAINT FILED BY DEUTSCHMAN, PETE ON 04/09/2021
            Blank 1 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021
            E-FILING TRANSACTION 1833637 RECEIVED ON 04/09/2021 01:11:12 PM.

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 175 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?