Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Superior Court of California, County of Alameda California Court of Appeals CA Supreme Court

Hothi v. Musk
Appeal California Court of Appeals, Case No. A162400

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 14, 2021 at 6:07 PM DT (6.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant and Appellant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Hothi, Randeep, Plaintiff and Respondent
Officially listed as "Randeep Hothi"
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None
Request for oral argument filed by: Michael Lifrak shall appear for appellant.
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None
    Filed proof of service.: Appellant's proof of service of ROA on respondent.
      Blank 29 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None
      Request for oral argument filed by: D. Gill Sperlein shall appear for respondent Hothi.
        Blank 28 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None
        Oral argument waiver notice sent.
          Blank 27 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None
          Case on conference list.: 21-18
            Blank 26 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None
            Case fully briefed.
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None
              Appellant's reply brief.: Defendant and Appellant: Elon Musk Attorney: Michael Timothy Lifrak
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None
                Respondent's brief.
                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None
                  Pro hac vice granted: BY THE COURT: The application of respondent Randeep Hothi for permission for Lawrence J. Fossi and Michael F. Smith to appear pro hac vice is granted.
                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None
                    Pro hac vice application: Application for admission of Lawrence J. Fossi and Michael F. Smith as counsel, Pro Hac Vice for appellee Randeep Hothi.
                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None
                      Stipulation of extension of time filed to: Respondent's brief. Due on 08/02/2021 By 21 Day(s)
                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None
                        Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by: Respondent
                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None
                          Pro hac vice granted: BY THE COURT: Alex Spiro's application to appear pro hac vice as counsel for appellant Elon Musk is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40(c)(2).)
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                            Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 8 of 8 Pages 764 - 850
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                              Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 7 of 8 Pages 600 - 763
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 6 of 8 Pages 538 - 599
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                  Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 5 of 8 Pages 391 - 537
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                    Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 4 of 8 Pages 326 - 390
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                      Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 of 8 Pages 259 - 325
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                        Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 8 Pages 151 - 258
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                          Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 8 Pages 1 - 150
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                            Appellant's opening brief.: Defendant and Appellant: Elon Musk Attorney: Michael Timothy Lifrak
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None
                                              Pro hac vice application: Application for Admission of Alex Spiro as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Appellant Elon Musk; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Verified Application of Alex Spiro
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None
                                                Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None
                                                  Certificate of county clerk filed.: Filed 05/11/2021 by A. Enciso. Appellant elected to proceed per CRC 8.124 without RT. No further record shall be forth coming from Superior Court.
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None
                                                    Filing fee.: appellant; check no. 76494
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by: Filed by appellant
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None
                                                        Civil case information statement filed.: Defendant and Appellant: Elon Musk Attorney: Michael Timothy Lifrak
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None
                                                          Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None
                                                            Notified parties of local rules and procedures.
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of appeal lodged/received.

                                                                Space Space

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 774 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?