Rabbani v. Tesla Motors Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2021-00004478-CU-BC-NC

Tags
Last Updated April 16, 2021 at 6:49 PM DT (4.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rabbani, Tawfic, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc"
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None
Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.
    Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
    Request for Judicial Notice (5/21/2021) filed by Tesla Motors Inc.
      Blank 11 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
      Proposed Order (5/21/2021) submitted by Tesla Motors Inc received but not filed on 03/08/2021.
        Blank 10 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
        Declaration - Other (of Soheyl Tahsildoost 5/21/2021) filed by Tesla Motors Inc.
          Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
          Declaration - Other (of Raymond Kim 5/21/2021) filed by Tesla Motors Inc.
            Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
            Motion - Other (5/21/2021) filed by Tesla Motors Inc.
              Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None
              Case initiation form printed.
                Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None
                Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/02/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.
                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None
                  Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.
                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None
                    Summons issued.
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None
                      Original Summons filed by Rabbani, Tawfic. Refers to: Tesla Motors Inc
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None
                        Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rabbani, Tawfic. Refers to: Tesla Motors Inc
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None
                          Complaint filed by Rabbani, Tawfic. Refers to: Tesla Motors Inc

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?