City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System v. Credit Suisse Group AG et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-03385

Tags
Last Updated Today at 4:14 PM (45.5 minutes ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Group AG, Defendant
No Logo David R. Mathers, Defendant
No Logo Lara J. Warner, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Gottstein, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/16/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Suisse Group AG, Thomas Gottstein, Lara J. Warner and David R. Mathers, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System..(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT against Credit Suisse Group AG, Thomas Gottstein, David R. Mathers, Lara J. Warner. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24413493)Document filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System..(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 236 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?