District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 20-17285
    Filed 11/20/2020
  2. Case No. 21-15813
    Filed 5/4/2021
  3. Case No. 21-15822
    Filed 5/6/2021
United States Supreme Court

CoreCivic, Inc. v. Candide Group, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 20-17285

Tags
Last Updated April 17, 2021 at 3:37 AM DT (5.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Candide Group, Llc, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
Space Selina MacLaren +1 213 633 8617
No Logo Morgan Simon, Defendant - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
Space Selina MacLaren +1 213 633 8617
CoreCivic, Inc. CoreCivic, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Locke +1 202 682 7400
Space Michael Brandon McClellan +1 949 854 7000 +1 949 854 7099 michael.mcclellan@ndlf.com
Space C. Kendie Schlecht +1 949 854 7000
Nature of Suit 3320 - Assault Libel and Slander
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:20-cv-03792-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:20-cv-03792-WHA
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None ?
Added Attorney(s) Selina MacLaren for party(s) Appellee Morgan Simon Appellee Candide Group, LLC, in case 20-17285. [12066569] (NAC)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None ?
    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Selina Jessie MacLaren (Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, 865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2400, Los Angeles, CA 90017) for Appellees Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon. Date of service: 04/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12066162] [20-17285] (MacLaren, Selina)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032543246 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
      MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/25/2021. See order for details. [12029669] (VS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032543171 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
        MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/15/2021. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [12029648] (VS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032533433 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None ?
          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference with counsel for appellant, March 5, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12025478] (VS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032524562 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None ?
            MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Video Conference w/ counsel for appellees only, 03/09/2021, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12021530] (VS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032523564 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None ?
              MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellees, 03/02/2021, 11:30 a.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12021080] (VS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032512899 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant's opening brief is due March 15, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due April 14, 2021; appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12016552] (JPD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032433486 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                  MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 02/03/2021. See order for details. [11981114] (VS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032379847 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                    MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 01/22/2021. See order for details. [11950963] (VS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032346423 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee's counsel, 01/04/2021, 09:00 a.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [11930961] (VS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032307562 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                        MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/17/2020 Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 12/10/2020 ). [11912522] (VS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032306533 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                          MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/10/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11911937] (VS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032297991 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/27/2020. [11908233] [20-17285] (Burke, Thomas)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                              The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/27/2020.
                              To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
                              Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11907826]. [20-17285] (AD)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032296313 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Filed (ECF) Appellant CoreCivic, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/27/2020. [11907576] [20-17285] (Locke, Elizabeth)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Added Attorney(s) Elizabeth Locke for party(s) Appellant CoreCivic, Inc., in case 20-17285. [11907475] (NAC)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth M. Locke, P.C. (Clare Locke LLP, 10 Prince Street, Alexandria, VA 22314) for Appellant CoreCivic, Inc.. Date of service: 11/27/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11907460] [20-17285] (Locke, Elizabeth)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032283013 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant CoreCivic, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/27/2020. Transcript ordered by 12/21/2020. Transcript due 01/19/2021. Appellant CoreCivic, Inc. opening brief due 03/01/2021. Appellees Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon answering brief due 03/30/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11901854] (JMR)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?