Lemack v. AMR Services Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06803-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Danielle Lemack, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
No Logo Air Transport Association, Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Amr Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Delta Airlines"
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Frontier Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Globe Aviation Services, Defendant
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/8/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 10/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 107 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File Document
MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
    LREF
    Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 105 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 104 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
          LREF
          Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 6803(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
          LREF
          Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 9/25/07 re: request that you direct that the enclosed documents be accepted for filing under seal by endorsing this letter as set forth, confirming that the parties' interest in preserving the confidentiality of the terms of their settlement agreements outweighs any public interest in knowing the amounts of each settlement. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. This Document relates to 21mc97, 21mc101 and 03-6803. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/07) (rjm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
            DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (97 in 2:03-cv-06803-AKH, 1206 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 2:03-cv-06803-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
              LREF
              Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (97 in 2:03-cv-06803-AKH, 1206 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Judgment. Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 2:03-cv-06803-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                LREF
                Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 ~Motion for Judgment
                MOTION for Judgment Approving the Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 2:03-cv-06803-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 4/4/2008 Terminate Motions
                          Motions terminated: (1058 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 61 in 1:05-cv-07243-AKH) CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC101. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government. Memorandum of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey in Support of Focused Discovery from the Government. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Jacob, Beth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 87 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                      DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 86 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 85 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                          DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                            DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 ~Motion to Sever
                                              CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(sn)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                  NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al. This Document also relates to 21MC101.(rjm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that deft. AirTran Airways, Inc. is dismissed w/out prejudice and w/out costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97) and in any other actions involving United Airlines Flight 175 departing from Logan Airport in Boston... 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-7153, 02-2802, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-7152, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365. Ptffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 6/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                        DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                          DECLARATION of Richard A Williamson in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES, formally known as MIDWEST EXPRESS AIRLINES, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the following individual action consolidated in the: In Re: September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 1. Feller v AMR Corporation, etal: 04 CV 09627... and as further set forth in said Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that Defts. UAL Corporation and United Airlines, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11th Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-8918, 04-7291, 03-7076, 02-8916, 02-7156, 02-7155, 03-6803, 03-7040, 02-3676, 03-7022, 03-7070, 02-7289, 03-7071, 02-7144... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) (Orig. doc. Filed in case no. 21 MC 97, as doc. #949)(ae)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 72 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                            STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE that defendant AirTran Airways, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice... without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) and in any other actions involving American Airlines Flight 11 departing from Logan Airport in Boston or damages arising from the World Trade Center site or the surrounding areas: 02-3676, 02-8918, 03-7076, 03-6809, 02-8916, 02-7156, 03-6803, 02-7155, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7070, 03-7071, 02-7144, 02-7290, 02-7289, 03-7032. This Document relates to All Cases. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 1/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/06) (Original document filed in 21mc97 as doc. #863) (kco, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL : dft Continental Airlines, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/06) Original document filed in case #21 MC 97, document #822. (dle, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the above-entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendant United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                    Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. And US AIR Group d/b/a US Airways Express To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, ) Modified on 9/10/2004 (jmi, ).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to QANTAS AIRWAYS LIMITED ("QANTAS") only. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other Defendant. Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/04) (dt, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/4/2004, answer due 3/24/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served as to Thomas Berglund, president. Service was accepted by Carin Bergman. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Securitas AB. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/3/04. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nina Svensson. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Pinkerton's Inc. served on 6/4/2004, answer due 6/24/2004. Service was accepted by Nicholas Knight. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 6/1/2004, answer due 6/21/2004. Service was accepted by Indra Lall. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 6/1/2004, answer due 6/21/2004. Service was accepted by Gladys Ryan. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to Rule 41 of the F.R.C.P. this action is dismissed as to defendant Air Transport Association of America, Inc. without prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant America West Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by America West Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice of Security Equipment Manufacturer Defendants. (This document relates to 21MC97 as document #487.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/04) (pl, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Adoption Master Answer To Plaintiff's Flight 11 Amended Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Airlines. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of dopting Master Answer of Defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Filght 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by American Trans Air, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc. (ps, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services. (sac, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (laq, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (sac, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(cd, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by John L. Altieri Jr. on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority. New Address: O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P., Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, (212) 326-2000. Original document filed in case #21MC97, document #408.(dle, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                        MOTION; for an order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support; Document filed by plaintiffs. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42).. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER; that the cases listed immediately below are active cases but plaintiffs in those cases have filed VCF claims. However, these cases were not included in Appendix A to the 3/1/2004 Order. These cases also may be subject to motions to dismiss by defendants but these cases shall remain active subject to any dismissal motions. 02cv452, 02cv458, 02cv6361, 03cv7031, 02cv6364, 02cv7143, 02cv7146, 02cv7147, 02cv7148, 02cv7150, 02cv7224, 03cv7098, 03cv7638, 03cv10325, 02cv7243, 02cv7245, 03cv7075, 02cv7258, 02cv7267, 03cv7133, 02cv7271, 02cv7272, 02cv7290, 03cv6866, 02cv7608, 03cv2004, 02cv10160, 03cv6183, 03cv6801, 03cv6802, 03cv6803, 03cv6804, 03cv6805, 03cv6809, 03cv6811, 03cv6944, 03cv7022, 03cv7028, 03cv7070, 03cv7071, 03cv7076, 04cv1857, 04cv2519. The foregoing cases will be subject to the discovery and briefing schedule originally set forth in the 3/24/2004 Order as modified by Order of 4/7/2004. Accordingly, plaintiffs in the foregoing cases will provide defendants with documents responsive to Richard Williamson's 3/22/2004 letter by 4/16/2004. Thereafter, defendants will review the materials produced by plaintiffs to determine whether depositions will be necessary. If defendants determine that depositions are necessary, defendants will contact plaintiff's counsel in the individual action to obtain consent for the depositions. Defendants will then request a conference with the Court to determine whether defendants may take such depositions. Defendants shall serve and file motions to dismiss by 5/17/2004. Opposing memoranda and affidavits shall be served and filed by 5/31/2004. Reply papers shall be served and filed by 6/7/2004. Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will be held on 6/9/2004 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa, Part I on 4/9/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #332(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                            CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB c/o Lindhagensplan 70, Box 12307, SE-102 28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 983. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                              CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 983, RECEIVED ON: 3/30/04. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTIONS ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Danielle Lemack, Ronald L. Motley for Danielle Lemack, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Danielle Lemack, Robert T. Haefele for Danielle Lemack, Donald A. Migliori for Danielle Lemack, Mary F. Schiavo for Danielle Lemack admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Airlines, Inc. served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. America West served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004; American Airlines, Inc. served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004; US Airways, Inc. served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Angela Solomon. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, The Boeing Company served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Kaci Taylor. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. AMR Services Corporation served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Lisa Magdaleno, subpoena clerk. Document filed by AMR Services Corporation. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Globe Aviation Services served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Robert Gorman. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Air Transport Association served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by David Berg. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by Marfk Diffenbuagh. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Leon Ellis. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Delta Airlines served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Jenna Rowberry. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Ted Bridges. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Frontier Airlines, Inc. served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Flia Wintersmith. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 12/23/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Carla Brateng. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Northwest Airlines served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 12/22/2003, answer due 1/12/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple, designated agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. Original Document filed in 21 mc 97, Doc. #275. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 11/11/2003, answer due 12/1/2003. Service was accepted by Lowell J. Burnett, CEO. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Marsha Montgomery, authorized Agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 10/29/2003, answer due 11/18/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. US Airways, Inc. served on 11/7/2003, answer due 11/27/2003. Service was accepted by Tanika Baylor. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lynne Key. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. America West served on 11/6/2003, answer due 11/26/2003. Service was accepted by Molly Chapman, Clerk. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Huntleigh USA Corporation served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Kathy Richardson. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 11/13/2003, answer due 12/3/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Quantas Airways, Ltd. served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Anne Sulsord, authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Delta Airlines served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Vaerie Holmes, authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Globe Aviation Services served on 10/31/2003, answer due 11/20/2003. Service was accepted by J. Graham, Sr., authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Northwest Airlines served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Karen Clower, authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Transport Association served on 12/4/2003, answer due 12/24/2003. Service was accepted by Mimi Soloman, authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Maria Snow, authorized agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Carla Brateng. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 10/31/2003, answer due 11/20/2003. Service was accepted by Shirley Dillon. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Janice Baxter. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Frontier Airlines, Inc. served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Pam Trujillo. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 12/16/2003, answer due 1/5/2004. Service was accepted by Roger McLeon, CT Corp. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Services Corporation served on 10/31/2003, answer due 11/20/2003. Service was accepted by Ct Corp/Shirley Dillon. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (cd, ) Modified on 1/29/2004 (cd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Managing Agent. Document filed by Danielle Lemack. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Danielle Lemack. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 12/5/2003, answer due 2/3/2004. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against AMR Services Corporation, Air Transport Association, Alaska Airlines, Inc., America West, American Airlines, Inc., Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Frontier Airlines, Inc., Globe Aviation Services, Heimann Systems Corp., Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Invision Technologies, Inc., L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority, Northwest Airlines, Quantam Magnetics, Inc., Quantas Airways, Ltd., Securitas AB, The Boeing Company, US Airways, Inc., United Airlines, Inc..Document filed by Danielle Lemack. Related document: [1] Complaint.(pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Answer Due Date re: [6] Amended Complaint,,, as to AMR Services Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Air Transport Association answer due on 1/26/2004; Alaska Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; America West answer due on 1/26/2004; American Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Burns International Security Services Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Colgan Air, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Delta Airlines answer due on 1/26/2004; Frontier Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Globe Aviation Services answer due on 1/26/2004; Heimann Systems Corp. answer due on 1/26/2004; Huntleigh USA Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; ICTS International NV answer due on 1/26/2004; Invision Technologies, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; L-3 Communications Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems answer due on 1/26/2004; L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Massachusetts Port Authority answer due on 1/26/2004; Northwest Airlines answer due on 1/26/2004; Quantam Magnetics, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Quantas Airways, Ltd. answer due on 1/26/2004; Securitas AB answer due on 1/26/2004; The Boeing Company answer due on 1/26/2004; US Airways, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; United Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED CONSENT AND ORDER TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; that Motley Rice LLC, 28 Bridgeside Blvd., P.O. Box 1792, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465, is being substituted as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action, instead of Baum Hedlund, 12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 950, Los Angeles, CA 90025. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/31/2003) Original document filed under case no. 21 MC 97, doc. # 249.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, (This document relates to 02-3676, 8918, 03-7148, 02-7143, 5139, 03-6809, 02-8916, 7156, 7155, 03-6803, 02-7271, 03-7149, 02-2004, 03-7150, 6804, 02-7144, 03-6806, 6802, 02-7154, 6363, 7151, 7204, 7153, 7152, 03-6811, 6801, 7147, 02-458, 2802, 1727, 6365, 6364, 7150, 6378, 7149, 6379, 452, 03-029, 6808, 6810, 02-7147, 7148, 7146, 7920, 03-6944, 6800, 02-7145, 8919, 7272, 03-6807, 02-7258, 7261, 7260, 456, 7262, 1728, 03-6805, 02-6362, 7259 & 6361) pursuant to the Court's directions at the Status Conference on 9/26/03, and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), plaintiffs in each of the designated cases herein, dismiss with prejudice the "DOE" defendants. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE #21 MC 97(AKH), DOC. #199. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER; granting [2-1] motion to place on suspense docket . This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: John A. Greaves . (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 1:21-mc-97. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case accepted as related to 1:21mc97 . Notice of assignment to follow. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003, Terminated: 9/25/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by Lemack . to place on suspense docket .No Return Indicated. (gmo) Modified on 09/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484259. (gmo) Modified on 09/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly 02-cv-458 related to. (gmo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?