Securities and Exchange Commission v. Spot Tech House, Ltd et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-00632

Tags
Last Updated June 11, 2021 at 8:23 PM DT (4.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth W Donnelly
Space Samantha M Williams

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa J. Armstrong +1 202 551 4724 armstrongme@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Malhaz Pinhas Patarkazishvili, Defendant
No Logo Ran Amiran, Defendant
No Logo Spot Tech House, Ltd, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney
        MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Melissa Armstrong, Kenneth W. Donnelly, Samantha M. Williams by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Armstrong, Melissa)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/16/2021 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission. Proof of service due by 7/15/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons Spot Tech House, Ltd f/k/a Spot Option, Ltd, # (3) Summons Malhaz Pinhas Patarkazishvili a/k/a Pini Peter a/k/a Pinhas Peter, # (4) Summons Ran Amiran) (Armstrong, Melissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
            LREF

            Space Space

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 62 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?