Pacheco v. Gonzalez et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-09403-KMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzalez, Respondent
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Sullivan
Terminated 10/19/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-0025'['US Court of Appeals, 2nd Cir.']
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HABEAS, PRO-SE
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [4] Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco USCA Case Number 08-0025-pr. Petitioner, pro se, moves for leave to proceed IFP and for appointment of counsel Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it lacks an arguable basis in law or fact. See Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 7/22/2008. (nd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Jud
    Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: [6] USCA Mandate,,. (nd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number 08-0025 from the US Court of Appeals, 2nd Cir. assigned to [4] Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco. (nd)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - File
        Appeal Record Sent to USCA (File). Indexed record on Appeal Files for [4] Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 1/2/2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
          Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for [4] Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) (dt).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [4] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to District Judg
              Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: [4] Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL from [3] Judgment - Sua Sponte (Petition). Document filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to :A.U.S.A. (nd)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Appeal Remark
                  Appeal Remark as to [4] Notice of Appeal filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco. IFP REVOKED ON 11/1/2007, $455.00 APPEAL FILING FEE DUE. (nd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Petition)Court Filing
                    JUDGMENT. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed: That the petition is hereby dismissed.... a certificate of appealability will not issue.... We certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that any appeal from the Court's order would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/19/07) (laq)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Order Dismissing PetitionCourt Filing
                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL, The Clerk of Court is directed to assign a docket number ti this action. The Court dismisses the petition for the reasons set forth in this order.Accordingly, the application is dismissed. As petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a consitutional right, I decline to issue a certificate of appealability. I certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(a)(3) that any appeal form this order would not be taken in good faith.certificate of appealability will not issue.... (signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood)(laq)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                        PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Alexander Jhoanni Pacheco.(laq)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Case Designation
                          Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (laq)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?