USA v. Cesar Jaiver Vargas Sanchez and Valeria Andreina Amundarain Alvarez
Criminal Case Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-20176

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 27, 2021 at 1:06 PM DT (3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Order of Detention
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT DPPA/SDO txt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Initial Appearance (WITH OPTIONAL DPPA ORDER)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 94 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?