District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
  1. Case No. 20-1577
    Filed 4/24/2020
  2. Case No. 20-1580
    Filed 5/4/2020
United States Supreme Court

Rhee-Karn v. Lask
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 20-1580

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2021 at 7:51 PM DT (2.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Douglas R. Dollinger, Third-Party-Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Craig, Third-Party-Defendant
No Logo Margaret Rhee-karn, Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Rhee-Karn +1 212 763 5116
Space Andrea Lauren Weinberger +1 702 290 1267
No Logo Susan Chana Lask, Aka Susan Lusk, Aka Susan Lesk, Def-Third-Party-Plaintiff-Counter-Claimant - Appel

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Lask +1 917 300 1958
Nature of Suit 4195 - Contract: Product Liability
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=15-cv-9946
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=15-cv-9946
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208203337 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [95] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask, by JAC, FILED. [3073220][99] [20-1577, 20-1580]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208198708 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
    MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 04/06/2021 by CM/ECF. [3071451] [20-1577, 20-1580]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208160186 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577 Appellant-Cross-Appellee reply brief due date as 04/27/2021; FILED.[3056645] [20-1577, 20-1580]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208154792 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, informing Court of proposed due date 04/27/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF.[3054536] [20-1577, 20-1580]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208130825 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None ?
          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to accept late-filed corrected brief and supplemental appedix [76] filed by Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Appellant-Cross-Appellee must file a scheduling notification proposing a due date for the response-and-reply brief, by SLC, FILED. [3045319][87] [20-1577, 20-1580]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208126918 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None ?
            OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [76], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3043798] [20-1577, 20-1580]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208125251 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None ?
              MOTION ORDER, granting motion for a two day extension of time to respond to Appellee-Cross-Appellant's extension request [79] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask, Appellee Susan Chana Lask, FILED. [3043172][82] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208119720 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3041051] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                  CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to extend time, [75], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask and Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED.[3035511] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208103936 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                    MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 02/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3035099] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208101409 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, [74], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED.[3034109] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                        MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 02/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3034066] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208095773 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF & APPENDIX, [72], [71], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, FILED.[3031966] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                            APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-135), on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3031915] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 02/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3031910] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208095371 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                                STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn Brief & Appendix [66], [64] from the docket, FILED.[3031812] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208087645 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF & APPENDIX, [66], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED.[3028847] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208081113 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF & APPENDIX [64], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED.[3026320] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 02/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3026876] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 1/31/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 01/31/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3026272] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208080974 Filed: 1/31/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, FILED. Service date 01/31/2021 by CM/ECF.[3026270] [20-1580]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208076463 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [49] filed by Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn. Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order, by JAC, FILED. [3024567][61] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208068969 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              REPLY TO OPPOSITION [53], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by email.[3021667][57] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208068000 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by email. [3021296] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208067973 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by email. [3021287] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208064485 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [49], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 01/22/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3019945] [20-1577, 20-1580]--[Edited 01/25/2021 by BM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208063841 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 01/21/2021 by email.[3019688] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208061523 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                        MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 01/22/2021 by email.[3018778] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207994109 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          ORDER, dated 12/14/2020, dismissing cross appeal effective 01/25/2021 unless Appellee-Cross-Appellant files brief, copy to pro se, FILED.[2992858] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [33], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED.[2987344] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207959353 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[2979582] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207956516 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [30], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, FILED.[2978489] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207954419 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-326), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 11/18/2020 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[2977689] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, FILED. Service date 11/18/2020 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [2977688] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207891892 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2953932] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207874256 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        MOTION ORDER, denying motion to extend time [24] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask, Appellee Susan Chana Lask. However, a twenty-eight (28) day extension is granted. by RKW, copy to pro se, FILED. [2947268][28] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207871277 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577, Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 10/06/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2946138] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207810882 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Susan Chana Lask in 20-1577 Brief due date as 10/21/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 10/21/2020, copy to pro se, FILED.[2923363] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207789436 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notice, [16], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1577, Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, copy to pro se, FILED.[2915222] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207758093 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2903269] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, informing Court of proposed due date 10/26/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2020 by US mail.[2898332] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207744810 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by US mail.[2898327] [20-1580]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207744805 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by US mail.[2898326] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207695589 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        ORDER, dated 07/08/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/29/2020 unless Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2879618] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207695497 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          ORDER, dated 07/08/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/29/2020 unless Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn submits Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2879603] [20-1580]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207628938 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Susan Chana Lask, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2854670] [20-1580]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Susan Chana Lask, replaced by Susan Chana Lask, SUBSTITUTED.[2851448] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn, USCA receipt # 465401258786, FILED.[2847529] [20-1580]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207595088 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  CAPTION, Margaret Rhee Khan designation to Plaintiff-Counter Defendant-Cross Appellant, AMENDED.[2841856] [20-1577, 20-1580]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207594680 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2841627] [20-1580]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      NOTE: See lead case, 20-1577, containing complete set of docket entries.[2841596] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207594379 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2841585] [20-1580]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207594374 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/06/2020, RECEIVED.[2841583] [20-1580]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207594369 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/04/2020, RECEIVED.[2841581] [20-1580]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207594354 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Rhee-Karn in 20-1580, FILED. [2841575] [20-1580, 20-1577]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?