Heidi E. Glosser
Bankruptcy Case Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 20-14873-jps

Tags
Last Updated April 25, 2021 at 8:50 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glosser, Heidi E., Debtor
Office Cleveland
Filed 11/02/2020
County LAKE-OH
Terminated
Fee Paid
Debtor discharged
Origin 0
Reopened
Previous term
Converted
Debtor dismissed
Joint n
Confirmation hearing
Original chapter 7
Current chapter 7
Nature of debt consumer
Pending status Awaiting Discharge
Location of case files  
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)55) Notice Date 04/25/2021. (Admin.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
    Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)54) Notice Date 04/25/2021. (Admin.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/25/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
      Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)53) Notice Date 04/25/2021. (Admin.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ NoticeCourt Filing
        Court's Notice of Hearing - to be held telephonically (RE: related document(s)45 Motion to Dismiss Case) Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (kgaer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ NoticeCourt Filing
          Court's Notice of Hearing - to be held telephonically (RE: related document(s)40 Motion to Extend Time) Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (kgaer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ NoticeCourt Filing
            Court's Notice of Hearing - to be heard telephonically (RE: related document(s)32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at H.M. Metzenbaum - #2B Judge Price Smith Courtroom. (kgaer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Certificate of service
              Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)45 Motion to Dismiss Case, 49 Notice of Motion) Filed by Debtor Heidi Glosser. (ejone)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: 4/17/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                Notice of Filing Deficiency w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)50) Notice Date 04/16/2021. (Admin.)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                  Notice of Filing Deficiency to Debtor Heidi E. Glosser - Need Certificate of Service That Motion And Notice With Calendar Objection/Response Date Was Served Upon All Creditors; Corrective Action Required. (RE: related document(s)45 Motion to Dismiss Case, 49 Notice of Motion) (cille)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 notice of motion
                    Notice of Motion Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (RE: related document(s)45 Motion to Dismiss Case). (cille crt)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/11/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of Order on Application to Employ
                      Notice of Order on Motion for Application to Employ w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)44) Notice Date 04/11/2021. (Admin.)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/11/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                        Notice of Filing Deficiency w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)46) Notice Date 04/11/2021. (Admin.)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                          Notice of Filing Deficiency to Debtor Heidi E. Glosser - Motion to Dismiss Case Needs Notice of Motion With Calendar Date For Objection/Responses And Need Certificate of Service Indicating Name, Address of Parties Served And The Date Of Service; Corrective Action Required. (RE: related document(s)45 Motion to Dismiss Case) (cille)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Motion to Dismiss Case
                            Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser. (cille crt)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Order on Application to Employ
                              Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 28 Application to Employ Koehler Fitzgerald LLC as Counsel) Signed on 4/8/2021. (cille crt)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021 Notice of Order on Motion to Amend Motion
                                Notice of Order on Motion to Amend Motion w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)39) Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Document
                                  Document Subpoena for Rule 2004 Document Examination of Ron Marhofer Automall, Inc. Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (RE: related document(s)39 Order on Amended Motion). (Barr, Robert aty)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 notice of motion
                                    Notice of Motion Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (RE: related document(s)40 Second Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint Objecting to Discharge Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert aty)). (Barr, Robert aty)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Extend Time, Motion to
                                      Second Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint Objecting to Discharge Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert aty)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/4/2021, Entered: 4/5/2021 Order on Amended Motion
                                        Order Granting Amended Motion for Rule 2004 Exam of Ron Marhofer Automall, Inc. (Related Doc # 38) Signed on 4/4/2021. (cille crt)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021, Terminated: 4/4/2021 Amended Motion
                                          Amended Motion for Rule 2004 Exam of Ron Marhofer Automall, Inc. Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (related documents 31 Motion for Examination) (Barr, Robert aty)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 notice of motion
                                            Amended Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (RE: related document(s)32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (Salem, John aty)). (Salem, John aty)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                                              Notice of Filing Deficiency to Aty. John Salem - Insufficient Response Time From Date of Service; Corrective Action Required. (RE: related document(s)35 Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) (cille)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 notice of motion
                                                Notice of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (RE: related document(s)32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (Salem, John aty)). (Salem, John aty)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: 3/30/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                                                  Notice of Filing Deficiency to Aty. John Salem - Motion Requires a Notice With Response Date; Corrective Action Required (RE: related document(s)32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) (cille)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                                                    Notice of Filing Deficiency to Aty. John Salem - Order Needs Submitted to E-Orders (RE: related document(s)32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney) (cille)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                      Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser (Salem, John aty)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Motion for Examination
                                                        Motion for 2004 Examination of Documents of Ron Marhofer Automall, Inc. Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert aty)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Creditor Request for Notices
                                                          Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP. (Rawal, Arvind cr)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/19/2021 Notice to File Claim
                                                            Notice to File Claim w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)26) Notice Date 03/18/2021. (Admin.)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: 3/18/2021, Terminated: 4/8/2021 Application to Employ
                                                              Application to Employ Koehler Fitzgerald LLC as Counsel Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert D. Barr) (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 Chapter 7 Trustee's Initial Report - man
                                                                Trustee's Initial Report. Filed by Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: 3/16/2021 ADI BNC Notice of Assets and Request for Notice to Creditors
                                                                  BNC Notice of Assets and Request for Notice to Creditors. (ADINtcRA)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Trustee's Notice of Assets & Request for Notice to Creditors
                                                                    Trustee's Notice of Assets & Request for Notice to Creditors to File Claims Proofs of Claims due by 6/23/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/23/2021. Filed by Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: 3/15/2021 Meeting of Creditors Held.
                                                                      Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (RE: related document(s)[22] Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors) Filed by Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                        Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 3/15/2021 at 01:30 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                          Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2021, Entered: 2/15/2021 Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                            Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)20) Notice Date 02/14/2021. (Admin.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 Order on motion to extend time
                                                                              Order Granting to Extend Time Until 4/6/2021 (Related Doc # 16 Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint Objecting to Discharge) Signed on 2/12/2021. (cille crt)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Personal Financial Management Course
                                                                                Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor (related documents Meeting (Chapter 7)) (Geving, Allison prf)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/28/2021 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
                                                                                  Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/27/2021. (Admin.)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 notice of motion
                                                                                    Notice of Motion Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (RE: related document(s)16 Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint Objecting to Discharge Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert tr)). (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021, Terminated: 2/12/2021 Extend Time, Motion to
                                                                                      Motion to Extend Time to File Complaint Objecting to Discharge Filed by Trustee Robert D. Barr (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
                                                                                        Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (ADIdktclrk)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                          Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 2/19/2021 at 01:00 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                            Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 1/22/2021 at 01:30 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                              Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 1/4/2021 at 08:30 AM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: 12/7/2020 Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 12/21/2020 at 02:30 PM at Office of US Trustee, 341 meeting, 6th Floor, H.M.M.. Debtor appeared. (Barr, Robert)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions (Batch)
                                                                                                  Notice of telephonic or remote 341 meeting with instructions.. (Barr, Robert tr)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/7/2020 Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                    Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)7) Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Deficiency w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)5) Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: 11/4/2020 ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines
                                                                                                        Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines. (ADI341AA)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Amended Schedules and Summary(No Fee)
                                                                                                          Amended Amended Schedules and Summary of Schedules Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser. (Salem, John aty)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/3/2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency
                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Deficiency To Aty. John S. Salem - Incomplete Filings Due 11/16/2020: Schedule D. Blank Statement of Intent Filed, Completed Statement of Intent Due 12/2/2020. (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)) (cille)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  ADI List of Creditors Uploaded
                                                                                                              List of Creditors File Uploaded (ADILstUpd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Declaration re: Electronic Filing
                                                                                                                Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser. (Salem, John aty)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Employee Income Records
                                                                                                                  Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser. (Salem, John aty)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Certificate of Credit Counseling
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Heidi E. Glosser. (Salem, John aty)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020 Voluntary Petition-Chapter 7
                                                                                                                      Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Heidi E. Glosser (Salem, John aty)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Meeting Chapter 7
                                                                                                                        341(a) Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/07/2020 at 01:00 PM at remotely. Check case docket for procedures. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 02/05/2021. Financial Management Certificate for Debtor due by 02/05/2021. (admin, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Automatic Docket of Credit Card
                                                                                                                          Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(20-14873) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 42912375. Fee amount 335.00. (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?