District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit United States Supreme Court

Lu v. Samra, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 18-1213

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 26, 2021 at 4:57 PM DT (2.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo United States, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Campbell Lockhart
Space Steven T. Sharobem +1 617 748 3355 steven.sharobem@usdoj.gov
No Logo Friedrich Lu, Ex Rel, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Friedrich Lu
No Logo Ramandeep Samra, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa A. Tenerowicz +1 617 353 2326 +1 617 353 5529
No Logo Trustees Of Boston University, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa A. Tenerowicz +1 617 353 2326 +1 617 353 5529
No Logo Trustees Of Tufts College, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Goddard Wheatley +1 617 523 6200 +1 617 523 8130
Nature of Suit 3375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-10119-IT&caseId=0
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:17-cv-10119-IT&caseId=0
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107656071 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None ?
U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 10/13/2020. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [18-1213, 19-1381] (GB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107623372 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None ?
    U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 03/11/2020 and assigned case number 20-5228. [18-1213, 19-1381] (MNH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107533157 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None ?
      MANDATE issued. [18-1213] (GB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107526521 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
        JUDGMENT entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Affirmed. [18-1213] (GB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None ?
          CASE submitted. Panel: Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. [18-1213] (SBT)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107328945 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None ?
            RESPONSE filed by Appellees Ramandeep Samra and Trustees of Boston University to motion for summary disposition [6190394-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2018. [18-1213] (LAT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107328942 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None ?
              RESPONSE filed by Appellees Trustees of Boston University and Ramandeep Samra to motion [6190393-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2018. [18-1213] (LAT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107328534 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None ?
                ORDER entered: Upon consideration of plaintiff-appellant Friedrich Lu's motion to correct the caption to update defendant-appellee Samra's first name to Ramandeep, the motion is granted. The attached revised caption must be used on all papers filed in this case. [18-1213] (GB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                  NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [6187915-2] submitted by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. [18-1213] (ZN)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107326013 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                    RESPONSE filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College to motion for summary disposition [6190394-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/14/2018. [18-1213] (JGW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107326000 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None ?
                      RESPONSE filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College to motion to strike document [6190393-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/14/2018. [18-1213] (JGW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107325760 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                        MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107325754 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                          MOTION to strike appellees' briefs filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None ?
                            PLEADING tendered: NINE (9) Paper copies filed [6187915-2] by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. [18-1213] (LIM)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                              NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [6187829-2] submitted by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. [18-1213] (LIM)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107321614 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2018. [18-1213] (AP)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107321368 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                  CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2018. [18-1213] (AP)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107321363 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                    APPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. Certificate of service dated 07/31/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/09/2018. Reply brief due 08/14/2018 for APPELLANT Friedrich Lu. [18-1213] (AP)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107321208 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                      CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. Certificate of service dated 07/27/2018. [18-1213] (AMM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107321202 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None ?
                                        APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. Certificate of service dated 07/27/2018. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/09/2018. [18-1213] (AMM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107320305 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None ?
                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. [18-1213] (LAT)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107318894 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                            BRIEF tendered by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. [18-1213] (JGW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107318645 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                              ORDER entered: Appellee Trustees of Tufts College is ordered to file a conforming brief by August 2, 2018. The corrected brief must be served on all parties to the appeal, and the certificate of service must be updated to include the new date of service. The due date for appellant's reply brief shall run from service of the corrected brief, in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107317100 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                BRIEF tendered by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. [18-1213] (JGW)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107316111 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                  MOTION to decide appeal en banc filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107316086 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                    MOTION to take judicial notice filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107316072 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                      MOTION to correct name filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107314062 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                        ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Trustees of Boston University and Raman Samra. Brief due 07/31/2018 for appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107314024 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                          MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2018. [18-1213] (LAT)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107313970 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                            MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University. Certificate of service dated 07/16/2018. [18-1213] CLERK'S NOTE: The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, by 07/18/2018. (LAT)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107307572 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                              Appellant's supplemental to his motion to file brief late [6179173-2] filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107306365 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2018. Brief due 07/23/2018 for APPELLEES Raman Samra, Trustees of Boston University and Trustees of Tufts College. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107306357 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                  ORDER entered: Construing plaintiff-appellant Friedrich Lu's motion to file brief one day late as a motion to file appellant's opening brief instanter, that motion is allowed. Appellant's tendered brief is accepted for filing on this date. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                    APPENDIX filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. [18-1213] (AP)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107305840 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                      NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file an appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Appendix due 07/09/2018. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107305720 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                        PLEADING tendered: APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 06/22/2018. [18-1213] (AP)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107305657 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                          MOTION for leave to file brief a day late and Motion to have addendum scanned filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107293044 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                            CORRECTED ORDER* granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Brief and Appendix due 06/20/2018 for appellant Friedrich Lu. *Corrected order issued to amend the text of the order. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107293032 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                              ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Brief due 06/20/2018 for appellant Friedrich Lu. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107293002 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                MOTION to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107291293 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: As the district court recently allowed a motion to unseal all docket entries in this matter, the appellant's motion asking this court to direct the district court to do so is denied as moot. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107278308 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    NOTICE of working issues presented for review filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107278260 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      MOTION to unseal district court filings filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107278240 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        NOTICE of intention to file motion for summary disposition filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. Certificate of service was not included. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107276226 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/21/2018 for appellant Friedrich Lu. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107269926 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Trustees of Boston University. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2018. [18-1213] (LAT)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107269923 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Raman Samra and Trustees of Boston University filed by Attorney Lisa A. Tenerowicz. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2018. [18-1213] (LAT)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107269815 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Trustees of Tufts College. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2018. [18-1213] (JGW)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107269791 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Trustees of Tufts College filed by Attorney John G. Wheatley. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2018. [18-1213] (JGW)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107267311 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Friedrich Lu. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued on March 15, 2018. Forwarding address unknown. [18-1213] (AMM)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107265981 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #58) filed by Appellant Friedrich Lu. [18-1213] (GB)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?