USA v. Kerik
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:07-cr-01027-SCR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2017 at 11:27 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perry Anthony Carbone +1 914 993 1941 +1 914 993 1980 Perry.Carbone2@usdoj.gov
Space Elliott Bruce Jacobson +1 914 993 1940 +1 914 993 1980 elliott.jacobson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Bernard B. Kerik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com
Space Eric Anders Tirschwell +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 etirschwell@kramerlevin.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office White Plains
Filed 11/8/2007
County Westchester
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
Count 15-16
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2461C.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341
Offense Level 4
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7212A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 5-7
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
Count 9-14
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (183) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PROBATION FORM PETITION as to (07-Cr-1027-01) Bernard B. Kerik. On "Request For Court Actions / Direction" addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos, U.S.D.J., Part 1, from Larren P. Riley, Jr., U.S. Probation Officer, dated August 18, 2016 re: Restitution/Fine Balance With Med. Based on the aforementioned information, the Probation Department respectfully request that the releasee be permitted to complete supervised release as scheduled on October 14, 2016, since the restitution order remains imposed as a final judgment, pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 3612. Accordingly, we have provided the attached the Judicial Response form to facilitate Your Honor's response in this matter. THE COURT ORDERS: Court Orders supervision to terminate as scheduled on October 14, 2016. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/25/2016) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Criminal Case 09-CR-1071-01(SCR), Doc.#13. ***] (bw) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF MOTION denying 169 Motion for Early Termination of Probation as to Bernard B. Kerik...ENDORSEMENT..The motion is denied. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/15) (jw) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/20/2015, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Support by Bernard B. Kerik re 169 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/20/2015, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT of Bernard B. Kerik in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re 169 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/20/2015, Entered: None
          MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s . Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 159 Motion for Early Termination of Probation as to Bernard B. Kerik (1). Defendant Bernard Kerik's motion [dkt. no. 159] for early termination of Supervised Release is DENIED. He has demonstrated no extraordinary circumstances that warrant such relief. Also, he does not appear to have requested relief from his Probation Officer from any of the provisions he complains about. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated February 19, 2015 re: Replying to Government's Revised Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Early Termination of Probation (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Perry A. Carbone/Elliott B. Jacobson dated February 12, 2015 re: United States v. Kerik, 07 Cr. 1027 (LAP) Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Perry A. Carbone and Elliott B. Jacobson dated February 12, 2015 re: 159 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jacobson, Elliott) Modified on 2/17/2015 (ka). (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated February 11, 2015 re: Replying to Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Early Termination of Probation (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Bernard B. Kerik re 159 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Parlatore, Timothy) Modified on 2/11/2015 (ka). (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 159 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s . . (Jacobson, Elliott) Modified on 2/11/2015 (ka). (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Bernard B. Kerik re 159 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT of Bernard B. Kerik in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re 159 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s .. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Early Termination of Probation for Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,1s,2,2s,3,3s,4,4s,5-7,5s,6s-9s,8,9-14,10s,11s-13s,14s,15-16,15s . Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Bernard B. Kerik. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik re: Conference held on 8/19/2014 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 156 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated August 19, 2014 re: Transcript of 8/5/14 proceeding before Judge Swain (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 8/5/14 proceedings before Judge Swain)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 155 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik ( Status Conference set for 8/19/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) As counsel previously have been informed, the Court shall hold a conference in this matter on August 19, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/18/14)(jw) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated August 1, 2014 re 144 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 22, 2014 re: Partially vacate the Protective Order .. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Elliott B. Jacobson dated Aug. 1, 2014 re: 144 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 22, 2014 re: Partially vacate the Protective Order .. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated August 1, 2014 re: Responding to the Court's Order dated July 23, 2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email from AUSA Jacobson)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER denying 144 LETTER MOTION to Withdraw Document 140 MOTION for Reconsideration re 138 Order on Motion to Unseal Case as to Bernard B. Kerik (1). Kerik's motion [dkt. no. 144] to vacate partially the Protective Order is DENIED. This Order does not resolve the Government's allegation that Kerik has violated the Protective Order. The parties shall confer and report to the Court by August 1, 2014 as to how they propose to proceed, if at all, with respect to this issue. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/23/2014) (ft) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. Defendant Bernard Kerik moves [dkt. no. 144](* See Footnote 1 on Order *) to vacate partially the protective order governing this case. (See Protective Order on Consent, dated Mar. 19, 2008 [dkt. no. 28] ("Protective Order").) On May 12, 2014, the Court denied Defendant's prior request to vacate the Protective Order in its entirety [dkt. no. 138]. The instant request seeks to vacate the Protective Order only with respect to discovery materials related to Defendant's former counsel, Joseph Tacopina....[See this Order]... Accordingly, no later than July 14, 2014, the Government shall submit to the Court an ex parte sealed submission detailing its objections to Defendant's motion and attaching all discovery materials implicated by Defendant's motion. The Court will review these documents in camera prior to ruling on Defendant's motion. In the meantime, Defendant and Tacopina shall not file any more letters or submissions without the Court's permission. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/3/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated June 30, 2014 re 144 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 22, 2014 re: Partially vacate the Protective Order .. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 27, 2014 re: Responding to the letter from Judd Burstein, Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jacobson Affirmation)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Elliott B. Jacobson dated June 27, 2014 re: 144 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 22, 2014 re: Partially vacate the Protective Order .. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated June 26, 2014 re: Responding to Letter from Judd Burstein, Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Article from Boxing Scene, # 2 Exhibit B - Article from California Watch)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Perry A. Carbone and Elliott B. Jacobson dated June 24, 2014 re: United States v. Kerik, 07 Cr. 1027 (LAP) Document filed by USA. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore, Esq. dated June 22, 2014 re: Partially vacate the Protective Order . Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              LETTER by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Timothy C. Parlatore dated June 22, 2014 re: Responding to Letter from Judd Burstein, Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter to OPR)(Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 06/22/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Vacate in part the Protective Order. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Parlatore, Timothy) Modified on 6/23/2014 (ka). (Entered: 06/22/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw Document 140 MOTION for Reconsideration re 138 Order on Motion to Unseal Case, . . Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Mansolillo, Raymond) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 138 Order on Motion to Unseal Case, . Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Mansolillo, Raymond) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy Charles Parlatore appearing for Bernard B. Kerik. Appearance Type: Retained. (Parlatore, Timothy) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying 135 Motion to Unseal Case as to Bernard B. Kerik (1). Defendant's motion [dkt. no. 135] is DENIED. Defendant and his counsel shall promptly return to the Government all documents and other discovery materials they have received pursuant to the Protective Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/9/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 135 MOTION to Unseal Case Motion to Unseal and Vacate Protective Order. (Jacobson, Elliott) Modified on 5/8/2014 (ka). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Bernard B. Kerik re 135 MOTION to Unseal Case Motion to Unseal and Vacate Protective Order.. (Mansolillo, Raymond) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Unseal Case Motion to Unseal and Vacate Protective Order. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Mansolillo, Raymond) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas Hamilton Nooter appearing for Bernard B. Kerik. as Local Counsel (Nooter, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Bernard B. Kerik, to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Stephen C. Robinson no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska, from Raymond Mansolillo, atty for dft, dated 5/15/2012, re: request that the Court "so order" my inclusion as new counsel in the "Protective Order on Consent." (attached). I hereby agree to be bound by the terms and conditions of said Order or any new or modified Order imposed by this Court. -- Judge endorsed: In addition, this matter shall be reassigned to the undersigned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/16/2012)(ja) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 124 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment USCA Case Number 10-0865, 10-872. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the amended judgment entered on March 9, 2010, is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 6/20/2011. (fk) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Chief Judge Loretta A. Preska from Elliott B. Jacobson dated 5/16/2008 re: The Government writes in connection with the defendant's appeal of his conviction. The Government requests that the Court direct that the minutes in question be furnished to the Government forthwith. ENDORSED: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/8/2010)(ab) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik: It is herebt ORDERED that the Donald Kerik, Jr. and Besim Aydin are exonerated as sureties pursuant to Rule 46(g) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure from all liability on the appearance bond signed 11/10/2009. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/15/2010)(ab) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. The Defendant Bernard B. Kerik having appeared as required before the Court and having surrendered to serve his sentence on May 17, 2010, it is HEREBY ORDERED: That Donald Kerik, Jr. and Besim Aydin are exonerated as sureties pursuant to Rule 46(g) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure from all liability on the appearance bond signed November 10, 2009. That defendant Bernard B. Kerik's bail is exonerated, and the government shall release all liens and encumbrances against Mr. Kerik's Franklin Lakes home that were provided in connection with the two appearance bonds entered in this case on November 9, 2007 and November 10, 2009 and the Agreement to Forfeit Property dated November 10, 2009. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/15/2010)(ja) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              FIRST MOTION for Bond exoneration. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bachner, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                USCA MANDATE ON INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (certified copy) as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 71 Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release. USCA Case Number 09-4400. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 3/24/10. (fk) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Perry Anthony Carbone appearing for USA. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Bernard B. Kerik from 121 Judgment. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 896628. (fk) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinsion from Michael F. Bachner dated 3/9/2010...Requesting that Mr. Kerik's bail conditions be modified to allow him to travel to Washington DC for attorney visits only... ENDORSEMENT: The DC Indictment was transferred and resolved in the context of his NY plea. If Mr. Kerik wants to meet with any attorneys that must be done in New York. Application Denied. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 3/9/2010)(jty) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        AMENDED JUDGMENT #10,0041 WP as to Bernard B. Kerik (1), Count(s) 1, 14s, 15-16, 15s, 1s, 2, 2s, 3, 3s, 4, 5-7, 6s-9s, 8, 9-14, Dismissed; Count(s) 10s, 11s-13s, 4s, 5s, Imprisonment S1 07 CR 1027 - 33 months on each counts 4 and 5 to run concurrently, 33 months on count 10, to run concurrently, 48 months on each counts 11, 12 and 13, to all run concurrently, for a grand total sentence of 48 months. The court makes the following recommendations to the bureau of prisons: that the Defendant be placed at the satellite prison camp in Fairton, N.J. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau Of Prisons before 2 p.m. on May 17, 2010. S1 07 CR 1027 - 1 year on each counts 4, 5 concurrently, and 3 years on each counts, 10, 11, 12, 13. For a grand total of 3 years supervised release. Defendant will make a Assessment of $800.00, and pay restitution of the amount of $187,931.00. Correction of Sentence for Clerical Mistake. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 3/4/10) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(fk) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          JUDGMENT 10,0041 WP as to Bernard B. Kerik (1), Count(s) 1, 14s, 15-16, 15s, 1s, 2, 2s, 3, 3s, 4, 5-7, 6s-9s, 8, 9-14, Dismissed; Count(s) 10s, 11s-13s, 4s, 5s, Imprisonment S1 07 CR 1027 - 33 months on each counts 4 and 5 to run concurrently, 33 months on count 10, to run concurrently, 48 months on each counts 11, 12 and 13, to all run concurrently, for a grand total sentence of 48 months. The court makes the following recommendations to the bureau of prisons: that the Defendant be placed at the satellite prison camp in Fairton, N.J. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau Of Prisons before 2 p.m. on May 17, 2010. S1 07 CR 1027 - 1 year on each counts 4, 5 concurrently, and 3 years on each counts, 10, 11, 12, 13. For a grand total of 3 years supervised release. Defendant will make a Assessment of $800.00, and pay restitution of the amount of $187,931.00. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 2/23/2010) "clerks office has mailed copies".(Tychyn, John) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Letter by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Bernard B. Kerik dated 2/16/10. (fk) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Bernard B. Kerik. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits G-M, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 8 Exhibit Exhibits R-S, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits T-Y, # 10 Exhibit Exhibits Z-FF, # 11 Exhibit Exhibits GG-LL, # 12 Exhibit Exhibits MM-OO)(Splittgerber, Scott) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 11/10/2009 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Angela A. O'Donnell. (jma) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 12/3/09 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Albi Gorn. (fk) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (fk) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. It is hereby ordered that the transcript of September 25, 2009 at 10:05 a.m. of the above mentioned case be unsealed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 12/22/09)(fk) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. It is hereby ordered that the transcript of October 9, 2009 at 2:50 p.m. of the above mentioned case be unsealed except for the following passages: lines 20-23 on page 4; lines 4-25 on page 19; and lines 1-9 on page 20. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 12/22/09)(fk) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Eric Tirschwell in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 105 Memorandum of Law in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eric Tirschwell in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 103 Memorandum of Law in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eric Tirschwell in Opposition as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 86 MOTION in Limine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Eric Tirschwell in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 91 MOTION in Limine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (pp. 1-72), # 2 Exhibit A (pp.73-141), # 3 Exhibits B-H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for an Order Authorizing the Issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Bernard B. Kerik as to Bernard B. Kerik's Supplemental Pre-Trial Motions. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Bernard B. Kerik as to Bernard B. Kerik's Second Supplemental Pre-Trial Motions. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 91 MOTION in Limine.. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Bernard B. Kerik as to Bernard B. Kerik's Supplemental Pretrial Motions. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re 91 MOTION in Limine.. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of as to Bernard B. Kerik (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 91 MOTION in Limine.. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of as to Bernard B. Kerik (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Bernard B. Kerik re 86 MOTION in Limine.. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of as to Bernard B. Kerik (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of as to Bernard B. Kerik (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Requesting Use of a Juror Questionnaire. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of as to Bernard B. Kerik (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Proposed Examination of Jurors
                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                          Request To Charge by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Bernard B. Kerik to Government's March 30, 2009 Letter. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine. Document filed by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jma) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on October 20, 2009 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Mary M. Staten, CSR, RPR, RMR. (ll) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 9/22/2009 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Mary M. Staten. (jma) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jma) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Agreement to Forfeit Property
                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT PROPERTY by Bernard B. Kerik. (fk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Bernard B. Kerik. (fk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bernard B. Kerik (1) PRB Bond Entered as to Bernard B. Kerik in the amount of $975,000.00.. (fk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRB Bond Entered as to Bernard B. Kerik ( In addition with the previous bond filed with the Court)in amount of $ 975,000.00, with 3 FRP's secured by property to sign by close of business on 11/12/09. Home Detention with Electronic monitoring. Travel is restricted to the SDNY & EDNY. The defendant will comply with the conditions of home confinement under the strict supervision of the Pretrial Department Home Confinement shall as soon as possible or to commence on a date to be determined by the pretrial officer. During this time the defendant will remain at his/her residence at all times and witl not leave unless such leave is approved in advance by the Pretrial Department. The defendant may not leave his home to take his children to school. He may leave with prior advance approval from the Pretrialofficer, to meet with his attorneys, accountants, religious services, and for personal medical emergencies. The defendant will maintain a telephone at his/her residence without call forwarding, a modem, caller I.D., call waiting, or portable cordless telephone for the above period. At the direction of your pretrial officer, you shall wear an electronic monitoring device and follow electronic monitoring procedures specified by your pretrial officer. If sodirected, you shall pay the cost of electronic monitoring. The Defendant must legally surrender all firearms in his possession including licenses andany Police I.D.'s being held on his behalf, or a submit a written affidavit as such, stating the whereabouts or location of said documents o the U.S. Attorney's office by close of business on Nov. 12,2009. (fk) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 11/5/2009 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Albi Gorn. (jma) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Bernard B. Kerik. (fk) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Dear Judge Robinson from Justin D. Pruyne dated 11/2/2009 re:.....At the request of defense counsel, enclosed is a co a memorandum of Dr. Robert Mahler..... (jma) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Robinson from Department of Corrections Valhalla dated 10/27/2009 re:..........Imates treatment on Forensic unit...... (jma) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL of Conditions of Release by Bernard B. Kerik from 67 Order. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 700985. (jma) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Bernard B. Kerik re 69 MOTION to Revoke.. Mr. Kerik's Bail (Bachner, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Motion to Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Revoke. Document filed by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Bosworth, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jma) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF REMAND..... as to Bernard B. Kerik......and that the conditions of Supervised Release provisions are hereby revoked.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 10/20/2009)(jma) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Stephen C. Robinson from Barry H. Berke dated 09/23/2009 re:.......for the removal of entries 61 through 63 from the docket.....ENDORSED, APPICATION GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 08/25/2009)(jma) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request To Charge by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              - FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by Bernard B. Kerik re 61 MOTION in Limine.. (Berke, Barry) Modified on 10/2/2009 (gco). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eric Tirschwell in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 61 MOTION in Limine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part I, # 2 Exhibit A Part II, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  - FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Berke, Barry) Modified on 10/2/2009 (gco). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request To Charge by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (fk) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (jma) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER...Conclusion: For the reasons set forth in this Opinion and Order, the Court holds: 1. The defendant's motion to dismiss Counts One, Two, and Three for failure to state a claim for honest services fraud is denied. 2. The defendant's motion to dismiss Count One (Conspiracy) as barred by the statute of limitations is denied. 3. The defendant's motion to dismiss Count Two (Mail Fraud) as barred by the statute of limitations is denied. 4. The defendant's motion to dismiss Count Three (Wire Fraud) as barred by the statute of limitations is granted. 5. The defendant's motion to dismiss Count Twelve and question one from Count Fourteen is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, questions one and three from Count Twelve are based on fundamentally ambiguous questions and are dismissed. Question two from Count Twelve and question one from Count Fourteen may serve as predicates for the false statement charges. 6. The defendant's motion for severance is granted. Count One, Count Two, paragraph 29(a) from Count Four, Count Five, Count Twelve, Count Fourteen, and Count Fifteen may be joined. Moreover, the defendant's motion to sever Counts Fourteen and Fifteen on venue grounds is granted. The Government's motion for reconsideration of severance of Count Ten is denied. 7. The defendant's remaining requests for additional discovery are denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 5/13/09) (fk) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Barry Berke dated 5/5/09 re:...Mr. Keric's bail conditions be modified to permit him to travel to Los Angeles, California between 5/15/09 and 5/22/09 for business meetings....ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 5/13/09)(fk) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen c. Robinson from Diane Gujarati dated 5/1/09 re: Request for an extension of time until 5/20/09 to file reply. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 5/13/09)(fk) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Diane Gujarati dated 4/6/09 re: Request for an extension of time until 5/4/09 to file reply. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 5/13/09)(fk) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 12/29/2008 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Mary M. Staten. (jma) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 03/23/2009 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Albi Gorn. (jma) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Dear Judge Robinson from Elliott Jacobson dated 02/27/2009 re:.......the parties......write to jointly consent to continue to exclude time from speedy trial calculations until the next scheduled conference........ENDORSED, The time from March 3, 2009 to March 23, 2009 is excluded from the Speedy Trial calculation in the interests of justice and for the reasons set forth above. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 03/03/2009)(jma) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 2/3/09 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Angela O'Donnell. (fk) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Barry Berke dated 1/16/09 re:...request the Court's approval to file a reply memorandum of law no longer than 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/20/09)(fk) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Robin Wilcox in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik....The Times also requests that it have the opportunity to be heard prior to any future closing. Should this Court be presented with an application to close a non-grand jury related proceeding. The Times and other interested third parties shall have ample opportunity to be heard on the issue.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 8/19/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copie.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. On January 30, 2008, this Court received a letter from a news outlet requesting that "documents, transcripts and/or submissions" in connection with this case be unsealed. The letter specifically referred to a sealed conference held on December 8, 2007 to discuss a letter submitted by the Government, placed under seal and produced to the defense in redacted form. At that time a verbal request was made for unsealing the conference transcript. That request was denied. Rule 6 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure protects the secrecy of grand jury proceedings. In this case, the requested materials all relate to matters occurring before a grand jury. Their unsealing and dissemination could compromise the integrity of the grand jury proceedings by affecting witnesses, interfering with fact-finding and or damaging the reputation of subjects who have not yet been and may never be formally charged. Accordingly, the requested materials are to remain under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 2/21/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. It is hereby Ordered that the submission dated December 29, 2008, from the Court in the above mentioned case be placed under seal. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 12/29/08)(fk) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 7/9/2008. Defendant present with attorney Barry Berke and Melissa Prober, AUSA Elliott Jacobson and Perry Carbone, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb, Courtroom Deputy Brandon Skolnik. PTC Held: Defendant motions due 9/22/2008, response due 12/5/2008, reply due 1/9/09. Oral Argument set for 1/29/2009 at 4:30 p.m. Time is excluded to 1/219/2009/ Defendant bail continued. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re 36 MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Jacobson, Elliott) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 7/9/2008. Defendant present with attorney Barry Berke and Melissa Prober, AUSA Elliott Jacobson and Perry Carbone, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb, Courtroom Deputy Brandon Skolnik. Conference held: Court order that this conference and transcript be sealed. Defendant Bail continued. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Bernard B. Kerik (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s-9s, 10s, 11s-14s, 15s. (fk) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Barry Berke dated 5/21/2008 re: Request a one month adjournment of the status conference...the Government consents to our request to adjourn the conference to June 24, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. and to an exclusion of speedy trial time until that date....ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted... (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 5/22/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on December 17, 2007 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Court Reporter: Christina M. Arends-Dieck. (br)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. It is hereby ordered that the submission dated September 15, 2008, from the Government in the above mentioned case be placed under seal. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 9/22/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONSENT as to Bernard B. Kerik... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 3/19/08)(fk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Barry H. Berke dated 9/15/2008 re: Request the Court's approval to file a single omnibus motion and a single memorandum of law no longer than 85 pages...ENDORSEMENT: The defendant MUST file a single omnibus motion with a memorandum of law no longer than 60 pages. So Ordered... (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 9/19/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 3/19/2008. Defendant present with attorney Barry Berke and Eric Tirschwell, AUSA Elliott Jacobson and Perry Carbone, Agent S.A. Thomas D'Amico, Paralegal Susan Giordano, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb, Courtroom Brandon Skolnik. PTC Held: Next PTC set for 5/22/2008 at 4:30pm. Time is excluded to 5/22/2008. Defendant Bail continued. (See Transcript). (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Bernard B. Kerik re 36 MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF AND CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Barry H. Berke, Esq and Eric A. Tirschwell, Esq., of the law firm of Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, 1177 Avenue of the Americas, New NY 10036, will be substituted for Kenneth M. Breen, Esq., of the law firm of Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP, East 55th Street, NY 10022-3205, as counsel of record for Bernard B. Kerik in the above-captioned action. So ORDERED:. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 3/18/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Robin Wilcox in Support as to Bernard B. Kerik re: 36 MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H-I)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 2/27/2007 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss of Counts 1-3 and 5 as Time Barred, (2) Dismissal of Counts 1-3 For Failing to Allege the Crime of Honest Services Fraud and Unconstitutional Vagueness, (3) Dismissal of Certain False Statements Charges on Vagueness Grounds, (4) Dismissal for Multiplicity with Respect to Counts 9 and 11 and 10, 12, 13, (5) Severance for Violations of Fed. R. Crim. P. 8 and Pursuant to Rule 14, (6) Discovery, and (7) a Bill of Particulars. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. Return Date set for 1/29/2009 at 04:30 PM. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Bernard B. Kerik. Attorney Barry H Berke for Bernard B. Kerik, Eric Anders Tirschwell for Bernard B. Kerik added.. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael Scott Bosworth appearing for USA. (Bosworth, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik...Based on this conference, it is the determination of this Court that the Government's letter in any and all formats and versions, is to remain under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 2/28/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 2/27/2008. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth M. Breen, AUSA Elliott Jacobson, Agent S.A. Thomas D'Amico, Paralegal Susan Giordano, Court Reporter Albi Gorn, Courtroom Deputy Brandon Skolnik. PTC held: Court orders that Mr. Breen be removed as attorney of record from the courts doecket. Defendant will have new counsel present at the next PTC. Next PTC set for 3/21/2008 at 12pm. Time is excluded to 3/21/2008. Sefendant Bail continued. (See transcript). (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson: Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 2/21/2008. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth M. Breen, AUSA Perry Carbone, Elliott Jacobson, Agent S.A. Thomas D'Amico, Paralegal Susan Giordano, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb. PTC held: Next PTC set for 3/21/2008 at 12pm. Time is excluded to 3/21/2008. Defendant bail continued. (See transcript). (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Kenneth M. Breen dated 2/13/2008 re: Request with consent of the Government, an adjournment of the status conference currently scheduled for tomorrow to february 21 at 12:00 p.m....Endorsment: Time from January 23 to February 22 is excluded from the Speedy Trial Calculations in order to allow the defendant time to hire new counsel. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 2/13/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time between January 23 and February 22, 2008 is hereby excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 USC 3161 (h)(8)(A), in the interests of justice.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/31/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER as to Bernard B. Kerik....Mr. Breen is hereby disqualified as counsel to the Defendant, Mr. Kerik. Mr. Kerik has until 30 days from the date of this order to obtain conflict free counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/23/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Bernard B. Kerik. Attorney Kenneth M. Breen terminated. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Kenneth M. Green dated 1/15/2008 re: Request an adjournment of the Status conference currently scheduled for tomorrow until February 6 at 10:00 a.m...Endorsement: Time is excluded from January 17, 2008 to Fevruary 6, 2008 from the speedy trial calculation for the reason set forth above and in the interests of justice. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/17/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Dear Judge Robinson from Kenneth M. Breen dated 01/15/2008 re:....request an adjournment of the status conference currently scheduled for tomorrow to February 6 at 10:00am....... (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 01/15/2008)(jma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK as to Bernard B. Kerik on Oral Argument,, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/28/2007, Receipt Number 637005. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 1/10/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for James D. Wareham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. Dated 12/17/07. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Oral Argument as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 12/17/2007. Deft pres with atty Kenneth Breen and Thomas Fallati. AUSA Carbone and Jacobson pres. Court grants deft's counsel Wareham, motion for Pro Hac Vice. Court orders first part of conference transcript sealed. Oral Argument then held on Gov. motion to recuse. Decision reserved. Time is already excluded to 1/16/08. Deft bail con't.(Court Reporter Christina Arends-Dieck) (fk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik re: [8] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel.. (Carbone, Perry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Kenneth M. Breen dated 12/10/2007 re: Request Court's permission to file an oversize memorandum of lw in opposition to the gobernment's motion for disqualification of counsel...Endorsement: Plaintiff its 34 page brief. The Government may file an oversized reply brief. The government may exceed the size limits by 15 pages. So Ordered... (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 12/10/2007) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Kenneth M. Breen in Opposition as to Bernard B. Kerik re: [8] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel.. (Breen, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Bernard B. Kerik re [8] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel.. (Breen, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson:Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 12/6/2007. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth and Thomas Fallati, AUSA Perry Carbone, Elliott Jacobson, Agents SA James J. O'Conner-FBI, Court Reporter Albi Gorn, Courtroom Deputy Brandon Skolnik. PTC Held: Court Orders that Defendant's motion for Gov. to produce addition discovery is denied. Defendant is granted one day extension to response to cursio motion by 12/7/2007, Gov. to reply by 12/12/2007. Oral Arg. set for 12/17/2007 at 4;00pm. Court ordered second part of conference at side abr transcript sealed. Time is already excluded to 1/16/2008. Defendant bail continued. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Discovery. Document filed by Bernard B. Kerik. (Breen, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. Document filed by USA as to Bernard B. Kerik. (Carbone, Perry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Bernard B. Kerik addressed to Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis from Kenneth Breen dated 11/20/07 re: Request that the bond be modified to permit the filing of a mortgage in favor of the government in lieu of a confession of judgment, and that the deadline for the filing of such mortgage be extended to 11/27/07. Endorsement: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis on 11/21/07) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(fk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Bernard B. Kerik. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bernard B. Kerik (1) 500,000.00 PRB..... (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Bernard B. Kerik in amount of $ 500,000.00 PRB, Defendant all necessary paperwork by 11/14/2007.Defendant shall Surrender all firearms in his possession or constructive possession., including handguns, rifles, shotguns ammunition, permits and licenses to the FBI within 24 hours, The defendant shall have no direct or indirect contact with any government witnesses, Government shall provide a list, exception: Business related contact with current employees, Defendant shall surrender all travel documents and passports. Travel is restricted to SDNY, EDNY & NJ. Defendant reserves his right to seek modification of his condition at a later date. Routine pretrial supervision. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kenneth M. Breen appearing for Bernard B. Kerik. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1.. (Signed by Judge George A. Yanthis on 11/9/2007)(cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson :Pretrial Conference as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 11/9/2007. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth M. Breen, AUSA's Perry Carbone and Elliott Jacobson, Agents SA James J. O'Conner-FBI SA Steven Ashcrofy-IRS, SA Christopher McGlynn-IRS, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb, Courtroom Deputy Brandon Skolnik. IPTC Held: Next PTC set for 1/16/2008 at 12pm. Time is excluded to 1/16/2008. Defendant Bail continued. (See Transcript. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case as to Bernard B. Kerik ASSIGNED to Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case.. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George A. Yanthis : Plea entered by Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,2,3,5-7,8,9-14,15-16 Not Guilty. (Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb) (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George A. Yanthis :Arraignment as to Bernard B. Kerik (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5-7,8,9-14,15-16 held on 11/9/2007. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth Breen, AUSA's Perry Carbone and Elliott Jacobson, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb. Defendant enters a not guilty plea. Case assigned to Judge Robinson. Bail is set as follows: 500,000.00 PRB secured by the defendant's primary residence. Paperwork to be completed by 11/14/2007. Surrender all firearms to the FBI including ammunition and permits within 24 hours. No contact with any government witnesses, government to provide a list. Exception: Business related contact with any current employees. Surrender Passport, Routine Pretrial supervision. Travel extended to include N.J. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George A. Yanthis :Initial Appearance as to Bernard B. Kerik held on 11/9/2007. Defendant present with attorney Kenneth Breen, AUSA Perry Carbone & Elliott Jacobson, Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest of Bernard B. Kerik. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Bernard B. Kerik. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Sealed Defendant 1. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-7, 8, 9-14, 15-16. (cg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 583 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?