USA v. Todorova
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. 2:21-mj-02036-DUTY

Tags
Last Updated May 12, 2021 at 7:08 PM DT (7.5 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey B Isaacs +1 213 978 7940 +1 213 978 8112 USACAC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Mirela Todorova (1), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Balam O. Letona, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alex R Kessel +1 818 995 1422 +1 818 788 9408 kessellawfirm@gmail.com
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: 4/29/2021 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
          WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Mirela Todorova (Kessel, Alex)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
            ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Mirela Todorova, (cio)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Advisement of Defendant's Statutory & Constitutional Rights (CR-10)
              ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Mirela Todorova. (cio)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Notice Directing Defendant to Appear for Preliminary Hearing and PIA (M-60)Court Filing
                NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Mirela Todorova is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 05/10/2021 at 11:30 AM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 05/14/2021 at 11:30 A.M. before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (cio)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Initial Appearance - Local ComplaintCourt Filing
                  MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Mirela Todorova. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Alex R. Kessel for Mirela Todorova, Retained, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/10/2021 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 5/14/2021 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (cio)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)
                    REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Mirela Todorova; defendants Year of Birth: 1988; date of arrest: 4/23/2021 (cio)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Notice of Request for Detention
                      NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Mirela Todorova (cio)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 Findings of FactCourt Filing
                        FINDING RE PROBABLE CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim as to Defendant Mirela Todorova, (cio)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021 ComplaintCourt Filing
                          COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Mirela Todorova in violation of 21: 84l(a)(l), (b)(l )(C) Possession with Intent to Distribute Methylenedioxymethamphetamine ("MDMA"). Approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim as to Mirela Todorova (1). (cio)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 207 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?