Neima Benavides (PR) v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit County Court in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida, Case No. 2021-009716-CA-01

Tags
Last Updated April 27, 2021 at 11:39 PM DT (4.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BENAVIDES (PR), NEIMA, Plaintiff
No Logo LEON (ESTATE OF) (DECEASED), NAIBEL BENAVIDES, Plaintiff AKA
v.
Tesla Florida, Inc. Tesla Florida, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TELSLA FLORIDA, INC"
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 20 Day Summons Issued
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 ESummons 20 Day Issued
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/24/2021, Entered: 4/24/2021 Receipt
      "Receipt#:2600126 Amt Paid:$10.00 Name:TODD POSES 169 E FLAGLER ST STE 1600 MIAMI FL 33131-1211 Comment: Allocation Code Quantity Unit Amount 3139-Summons Issue Fee 1 $10.00 $10.00 Tender Type:E-Filing ACH Tender Amt:$10.00 Receipt Date:04/24/2021 Register#:260 Cashier:EFilingUser" 5 Event 2021-009716-CA-01
        Blank 4 Filed: 4/24/2021, Entered: 4/24/2021 Receipt
        "Receipt#:2600048 Amt Paid:$401.00 Name:TODD POSES 169 E FLAGLER ST STE 1600 MIAMI FL 33131-1211 Comment: Allocation Code Quantity Unit Amount 3100-Circuit Filing Fee 1 $401.00 $401.00 Tender Type:E-Filing ACH Tender Amt:$401.00 Receipt Date:04/24/2021 Register#:260 Cashier:EFilingUser" 4 Event 2021-009716-CA-01
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021 (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Complaint
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1,769 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?