KEYHANPOOR et al v. BLINKEN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-01182-TJK
District Judge Timothy J. Kelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 7, 2021 at 2:34 PM DT (1.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALIREZA MEHRABANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Beth Pitney +1 202 644 8600 spitney@benachcollopy.com
No Logo MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Beth Pitney +1 202 644 8600 spitney@benachcollopy.com
No Logo MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Beth Pitney +1 202 644 8600 spitney@benachcollopy.com
No Logo PARS EQUALITY CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Beth Pitney +1 202 644 8600 spitney@benachcollopy.com
No Logo SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by benachcollopy.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Beth Pitney +1 202 644 8600 spitney@benachcollopy.com
v.
No Logo Blinken, Antony, Defendant
Officially listed as "ANTONY BLINKEN"
No Logo DAVID M. SATTERFIELD, Defendant
No Logo IAN G. BROWNLEE, Defendant
No Logo JULIE M. STUFFT, Defendant
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/30/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags MANDAMUS,TYPE-E
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: None Motion for Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, # (2) Exhibit USPS delivery confirmation)(Pitney, Sarah)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/17/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, # (2) Exhibit USPS delivery confirmation)(Pitney, Sarah)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 5/17/2021; IAN G. BROWNLEE served on 5/17/2021; DAVID M. SATTERFIELD served on 5/17/2021; JULIE M. STUFFT served on 5/17/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/17/2021 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit USPS certified mail receipts, # (2) Exhibit USPS delivery confirmation)(Pitney, Sarah)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' [7] [8] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' [7] [8] Motions are GRANTED. Attorneys Scott A. Emerick and Paris Etemadi Scott are hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/05/2021. (lctjk3)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paris Etemadi Scott, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8421811. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, ALIREZA MEHRABANI, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, PARS EQUALITY CENTER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Pitney, Sarah)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: 5/4/2021, Terminated: 5/5/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott A. Emerick, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8421790. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, ALIREZA MEHRABANI, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, PARS EQUALITY CENTER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Pitney, Sarah)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                      STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/03/2021. (lctjk3)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' [2][3] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Civil Rule 83.2(d) requires attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice to include "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Attorneys Scott Allenson Emerick and Paris Etemadi Scott each represent that they are "in good standing with all states, courts, and bars" to which they are admitted but do not certify whether they have ever been disciplined by any bar. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the [2] [3] Motions are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 05/03/2021. (lctjk3)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                          SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY J. BLINKEN, IAN G. BROWNLEE, DAVID M. SATTERFIELD, JULIE M. STUFFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(adh, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Cover Sheet
                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET by PARS EQUALITY CENTER, MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, ALIREZA MEHRABANI re [1] Complaint,, filed by PARS EQUALITY CENTER, MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, ALIREZA MEHRABANI. Related document: [1] Complaint,, filed by ALIREZA MEHRABANI, MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, PARS EQUALITY CENTER, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI.(Pitney, Sarah)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/3/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paris Etemadi Scott, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8412813. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, ALIREZA MEHRABANI, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, PARS EQUALITY CENTER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Pitney, Sarah)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021, Terminated: 5/3/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Scott Allenson Emerick, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8412800. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, ALIREZA MEHRABANI, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, PARS EQUALITY CENTER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Pitney, Sarah)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: 4/30/2021 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8412681) filed by PARS EQUALITY CENTER, MOHSEN KEYHANPOOR, SHAGHAYEGH KEYHANPOOR, MOHAMMADSADEGH MEHRABANI ARDEKANI, ALIREZA MEHRABANI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons Summons - Blinken, # (3) Summons Summons - Brownlee, # (4) Summons Summons - DOS, # (5) Summons Summons - Garland, # (6) Summons Summons - Phillips, # (7) Summons Summons - Satterfield, # (8) Summons Summons - Stufft, # (9) Exhibit Exh. 1, # (10) Exhibit Exh. 2, # (11) Exhibit Exh. 3, # (12) Exhibit Exh. 4)(Pitney, Sarah)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                    Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Notice of QC- New Case
                                                      NOTICE OF ERROR re [1] Complaint; emailed to spitney@benachcollopy.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 494 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?