Horton v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2021-00018280-CU-CO-NC

Tags
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 5:00 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Horton, Jennifer, Plaintiff
No Logo Horton, Zeb, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla, Inc; DBA : Tesla Motors, Inc."
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Horton, Jennifer; Horton, Zeb. Refers to: Tesla, Inc
    Blank 7 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None
    Case initiation form printed.
      Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None
      Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.
        Blank 5 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None
        Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None
          Summons issued.
            Blank 3 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None
            Original Summons filed by Horton, Zeb; Horton, Jennifer. Refers to: Tesla, Inc
              Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None
              Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Horton, Zeb; Horton, Jennifer. Refers to: Tesla, Inc
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None
                Complaint filed by Horton, Zeb; Horton, Jennifer. Refers to: Tesla, Inc

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 43 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?