Creditors Adjustment Bureau I v. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20080875

Tags
Last Updated May 1, 2021 at 1:16 PM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc., Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Freed, Kenneth J, Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Collections
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conf Continuance 06/17/2021 09:30 AM D- 512 (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
    Hearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 06/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 512
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
      Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Granted (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None ?
          Reply in Support of Its Motion to Set Aside Default Filed (9 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None ?
            Opposition to Mtn to Set Aside Default Filed (21 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Hearing Confirmed for 04/08/2021 01:30 PM D- 512
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Filed (24 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - (64 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Compliance Hearing 06/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 512 (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Entered
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Filed (3 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc. (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Complaint - Collections Filed (9 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?